|
|
CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (cfe, COURT STAFF) [5:24-mj-71486-MAG]
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
COMPLAINT as to Todd Baldwin (1). (cfe, COURT STAFF) [5:24-mj-71486-MAG]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Penalty Sheet
|
|
|
Set Hearing as to Defendant Todd Baldwin.
Initial Appearance set for 10/28/2024 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. (amk, COURT STAFF) [5:24-mj-71486-MAG]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Per4 : Set Hearing as to Defendant Todd Baldwin:
Preliminary Hearing set for 11/15/2024 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. (cfe, COURT STAFF) [5:24-mj-71486-MAG]
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
Minute Entry
for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi: Initial Appearance & Detention Hearing as to Todd Baldwin held on 10/28/2024. The defendant's mother Karen Sue Baldwin appeared (potential co-signer/custodian) via teleconference and was sworn. The defendant's aunt, Kristin Lax (potential custodian) present and sworn. Karen Baldwin authorized court to sign bond on herbehalf. DPPA Advised. Preliminary hearing set for 11/15/2024 at 1:00 p.m. before SvK. The Court directs entry of the following Order : Pursuant to the Due Process Protection Act, the Court advised government counsel of the government's disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland and its progeny, and that the failure to do so in a timely manner may result in dismissal of the indictment or information, dismissal of individual charges, exclusion of government evidence or witnesses, or any other remedy that is just under the circumstances. Further Detention Hearing set for 10/30/2024 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Plaintiff's Attorney:Marissa Harris.
Defendant's Attorney:Christopher Cannon.
Pretrial Officer:Anthony Granados.
Liberty: 1:07-1:15pm, 1:31-2:35pm (1 Hr. and 12 mins). Defendant Present:Yes.
Defendant in Custody: Yes. (cfe, COURT STAFF) [5:24-mj-71486-MAG]
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
ORDER Setting Conditions of Release $100,000 UNSECURED BOND Entered as to Todd Baldwin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 10/28/24. (cfe, COURT STAFF) [5:24-mj-71486-MAG]
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
Minute Entry
for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi:
Status Re: Conditions of Release and Further Detention Hearing as to Todd Baldwin held on 10/30/2024. The Defendant's brother Gregory Baldwin appeared via teleconference and was sworn. The Court will add Gregory Baldwin asa custodian in lieu of Karen Baldwin. The Court to issue an order amending conditions of release. The government shall file UNDER SEAL list the of the names of the victims to be associated with the order of conditions of release. Preliminary Hearing set for 11/15/2024 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Plaintiff's Attorney:Marissa Harris.
Defendant's Attorney:Christopher Cannon.
Pretrial Officer: Shafia Khanoon.
Liberty: 1:17-1:46 P.M. (29 mins).Defendant Present:Yes.
Defendant in Custody: No. (cfe, COURT STAFF) [5:24-mj-71486-MAG]
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
Sealed Document. No NEF issued.
Court staff has served a copy of the document to the applicable party by First Class Mail or to a secured email account. (cfe, COURT STAFF) [5:24-mj-71486-MAG]
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
Sealed Document. No NEF issued.
Court staff has served a copy of the document to the applicable party by First Class Mail or to a secured email account. (cfe, COURT STAFF) [5:24-mj-71486-MAG]
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
Sealed Document. No NEF issued.
Court staff has served a copy of the document to the applicable party by First Class Mail or to a secured email account. (cfe, COURT STAFF) [5:24-mj-71486-MAG]
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10-28-24, 10-30-24 before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi by USA for Recorded Proceeding - San Jose (Harris, Marissa) Transcriber - Tara Jauregui, email: echoreporting@yahoo.com Modified on 11/4/2024 (sp, COURT STAFF). [5:24-mj-71486-MAG]
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue Hearing and Exclude Time From November 13, 2024 to December 13, 2024 as to Todd Baldwin filed by USA. (Harris, Marissa) Modified on 11/14/2024 (cfe, COURT STAFF). [5:24-mj-71486-MAG]
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
ORDER GRANTING 12 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING AND EXCLUDE TIME FROM NOVEMBER 13, 2024 TO DECEMBER 13, 2024.
Status Conference on Preliminary Examination set for 11/15/2024 is continued to 12/13/2024 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 11/14/2024. (jhf, COURT STAFF) [5:24-mj-71486-MAG]
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Protective Order as to Todd Baldwin filed by USA. (Harris, Marissa) Modified on 11/19/2024 (cfe, COURT STAFF). [5:24-mj-71486-MAG]
Related: [-]
|
15
|
|
15
NO Bail Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 10/28/24 as to Todd Baldwin. (cfe, COURT STAFF) [5:24-mj-71486-MAG]
Related: [-]
|
16
|
|
16
FELONY INFORMATION as to Todd Baldwin (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3-4. (cfe, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Penalty Sheet,
|
| |
Att: 2
Criminal Cover Sheet
|