Oklahoma Northern District Court
Case #: 4:24-cr-00365
Case Filed:Nov 19, 2024
Last checked: Friday Nov 22, 2024 1:23 AM CST
Defendant
Anthony Clay Russell (1)
Represented By
Alex Bramblett
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Whitney R Mauldin
Federal Public Defender'S Office (tulsa)
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Adam David McConney
Doj-Usao
contact info
John E Brasher
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/22/2024 2:33 AM CST
Friday, October 25, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT approved by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman by USA as to Anthony Clay Russell (1) (cjb, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00672-SH]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
3 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum for forthwith by USA as to Anthony Clay Russell (McConney, Adam) [4:24-mj-00672-SH]
Related: [-]
4 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Adam David McConney on behalf of USA (McConney, Adam) [4:24-mj-00672-SH]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman granting Related [+] as to Anthony Clay Russell (dlg, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00672-SH]
Related: [-] 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum for forthwith
6 6 WRIT of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum/Testificandum Issued by Court Clerk for the appearance of Anthony Clay Russell forthwith as to Anthony Clay Russell (dlg, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00672-SH]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
7 7 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Anthony Clay Russell (McConney, Adam) [4:24-mj-00672-SH]
Related: [-]
8 8 MOTION for Hearing Related [+] by USA as to Anthony Clay Russell (McConney, Adam) [4:24-mj-00672-SH]
Related: [-] 7 MOTION for Detention
9 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE (FPD) by Alex Bramblett on behalf of Anthony Clay Russell [Note: Attorney Alex Bramblett added to party Anthony Clay Russell(pty:dft).] (Bramblett, Alex) [4:24-mj-00672-SH]
Related: [-]
10 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John E Brasher on behalf of USA [Note: Attorney John E Brasher added to party USA(pty:pla).] (Brasher, John) [4:24-mj-00672-SH]
Related: [-]
11 11 MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Magistrate Judge Christine D Little: Initial Appearance held on 10/29/2024 , appointing FPD attorney Whitney R Mauldin,Alex Bramblett for Anthony Clay Russell, ruling on motion(s)/document(s): #8 granted, setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Detention Hearing set for 11/1/2024 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne, Preliminary Hearing set for 11/1/2024 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne), ordering defendant be detained as to Anthony Clay Russell Related [+] (Court Reporter: C1) (lmt, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00672-SH]
Related: [-] 8 MOTION for Hearing
12 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Christine D Little , appointing FPD attorney as to Anthony Clay Russell (lmt, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00672-SH]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Christine D Little re Brady as to Anthony Clay Russell (lmt, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00672-SH]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Christine D Little , ordering defendant be detained as to Anthony Clay Russell (lmt, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00672-SH]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
15 15 MOTION for Protective Order by USA as to Anthony Clay Russell (McConney, Adam) [4:24-mj-00672-SH]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
16 16 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman (protective) , ruling on motion(s)/document(s): #15 granted Related [+] as to Anthony Clay Russell (dlg, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00672-SH]
Related: [-] 15 MOTION for Protective Order
Friday, November 01, 2024
17 17 WARRANT Returned Executed as to Anthony Clay Russell (dlg, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00672-SH]
Related: [-]
18 18 MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne: Detention Hearing held on 11/1/2024 , Preliminary Examination held on 11/1/2024 , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Detention Hearing set for 11/4/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne, Preliminary Hearing set for 11/4/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne), ordering defendant be detained as to Anthony Clay Russell (Court Reporter: C1) (tjc, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00672-SH]
Related: [-]
19 19 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne Due to court schedule the continued Preliminary and Detention Hearing is reset to Monday, November 4, 2024 at 11:00 a.m. (TIME CHANGE ONLY) , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Detention Hearing set for 11/4/2024 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne, Preliminary Hearing set for 11/4/2024 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne) as to Anthony Clay Russell (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sdc, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00672-SH]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
20 20 MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne: Detention Hearing held on 11/4/2024 , Preliminary Examination held on 11/4/2024 , ruling on motion(s)/document(s): #7 granted, striking/terminating deadline(s)/hearing(s), ordering defendant be detained as to Anthony Clay Russell Related [+] (Court Reporter: C1) (sdc, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00672-SH]
Related: [-] 7 MOTION for Detention
21 21 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne , ordering defendant be detained as to Anthony Clay Russell (sdc, Dpty Clk) [4:24-mj-00672-SH]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
22 22 DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET(S) by USA as to Anthony Clay Russell (pll, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
23 23 INDICTMENT by USA as to Anthony Clay Russell (1) count(s) 1, 2 (pll, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
24 24 SEALED UNREDACTED VERSION of Dkt #23 per FRCrP 49.1(f) (pll, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]