Florida Middle District Court
Case #: 8:24-mj-02807
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2024
Last checked: Friday Nov 22, 2024 2:17 AM EST
Defendant
Jonathan Ortega-Martinez (1)
Represented By
Douglas Jordan Stamm
Federal Public Defender - Middle District Of Florida
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Diego Fontes Novaes
Us Attorney'S Office - Flm
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/22/2024 3:10 AM EST
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
1 1 33 pgs COMPLAINT as to Jonathan Ortega-Martinez (1). (AMS)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 11/20/2024 as to Jonathan Ortega-Martinez. (MCB)
Related: [-]