Oregon District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00432
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Nov 21, 2024 11:21 PM PST
Defendant
Lance Gregory Fluker (1)
Represented By
Mark Patrick Ahlemeyer
Federal Public Defender For The District Of Oregon
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Eliza Carmen Rodriguez
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/22/2024 12:17 AM PST
Sunday, October 27, 2024
1 1 Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo as to Lance Gregory Fluker (1). (dino) [3:24-mj-00237]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Criminal Complaint
Friday, November 01, 2024
3 3 Minutes of Proceedings: First Appearance on Complaint held before Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman as to Lance Gregory Fluker (USM #55054-065) on 11/1/2024. ORDER appointing counsel: Mark P. Ahlemeyer for Lance Gregory Fluker. Defendant advised of rights, waived reading of the complaint, and waived preliminary hearing. Defendant proceeds as named. Brady Disclosure Order: Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the government is advised of its obligations under Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. See attached order. Defendant does not request release and is detained for risk of non-appearance and as a danger to the community. Defendant may seek review of detention at a later date. Arraignment is set for 11/26/2024 at 1:30 PM in Portland before the duty magistrate judge. Counsel for the defendant is encouraged to discuss with the defendant the option to waive arraignment in accordance with Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 10(b). Any waiver of arraignment should be filed with the Court once the defendant has been charged by Indictment or Information and ahead of the scheduled arraignment date. Counsel Present for the Government: Eliza Carmen Rodriguez. Counsel Present for Defendant: Mark P. Ahlemeyer. Restraint Order: NR. (Tape #FTR-13B) (gw) [3:24-mj-00237]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Defendant Lance Gregory Fluker (USM #55054-065). Signed on 11/1/2024 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw) [3:24-mj-00237]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
5 5 Indictment Related [+] as to Lance Gregory Fluker (1) Count(s): 1-3: Bank Robbery (sb)
Related: [-] dacted
6 6 Indictment Unredacted Version Filed Under Seal as to Defendant Lance Gregory Fluker. (sb)
Related: [-]
8 8 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Adrienne Nelson. (sb)
Related: [-]