Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:24-mj-03442
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2024
Last checked: Friday Nov 22, 2024 1:27 AM CST
Defendant
Elmer Adonay Turcios-Gutierrez (1)
Represented By
Juan Neri, III
Office Of Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA


Docket last updated: 11/22/2024 2:26 AM CST
Sunday, November 17, 2024
Arrest of Elmer Adonay Turcios-Gutierrez (ccl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
ARREST Warrant Returned Executed on 11/17/2024 as to Elmer Adonay Turcios-Gutierrez. (ccl)
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to USA as to Elmer Adonay Turcios-Gutierrez. (drda)
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Elmer Adonay Turcios-Gutierrez (1); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond as to Elmer Adonay Turcios-Gutierrez (1).By Judge Matthew H. Watters. (drda)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters as to Elmer Adonay Turcios-Gutierrez. (ccl)
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Matthew H. Watters as to Elmer Adonay Turcios-Gutierrez. (ccl)
Related: [-]
3 3 Proceedings held before Judge Matthew H. Watters:Initial Appearance as to Elmer Adonay Turcios-Gutierrez held on 11/20/2024 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 11/25/2024 9:00AM before Judge Matthew H. Watters, SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Elmer Adonay Turcios-Gutierrez (Court Reporter FTR GOLD - C. LEVRIE.) (drda)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Juan Neri, III for Elmer Adonay Turcios-Gutierrez. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters. (mg3)
Related: [-]