California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:M Elaine Hammond
Case #: 5:24-bk-51777
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Apr 11, 2025
Claims Deadline:Jun 05, 2025

Debtor
Shangri-La Industries LLC
601 S Figueroa St Ste 1950
Los Angeles, CA 90017-3983
Represented By
James R. Selth
Weintraub Zolkin Talerico & Selth LLP
contact info
David Brett Zolkin
Weintraub Zolkin Talerico & Selth LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Fred Hjelmeset
P.O.Box 4188
Mountain View, CA 94040
Represented By
Brent D. Meyer
Meyer Law Group, LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee / SJ
U.S. Federal Bldg. 280 S 1st St. #268
San Jose, CA 95113


Docket last updated: 05/03/2025 6:46 AM PDT
Thursday, November 21, 2024
crditcrd none Thu 11/21 4:56 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 24-51777 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00). Receipt number A33548880, amount $ 338.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Thu 11/21 4:54 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $338. Filed by Shangri-La Industries LLC. Incomplete Filings due by 12/5/2024. Order Meeting of Creditors due by 12/5/2024. (Zolkin, David)
Related: [-]