Original Case: 0:21-cv-62115

Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-prici-13813
Typeprivate civil / federal question
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2024
Last checked: Friday Nov 22, 2024 3:29 AM EST
Defendant - Appellee
DIAZ, ANSELMO, & ASSOCIATES, P.A.
Represented By
Christopher J. Stearns
Johnson Anselmo Murdoch Burke Piper & Hochman, PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
SANDY HARRIGAN
Represented By
Shanna Marie Wall
Eiss Massillon, PL
contact info
Charles Eiss
Law Offices of Charles Eiss, PL
contact info
Nhu Quynh Cao
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/22/2024 3:29 AM EST
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Sandy Harrigan on 11/19/2024. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 12/09/2024 as to Appellant Sandy Harrigan. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 12/19/2024 as to Appellee Diaz, Anselmo, & Associates, P.A..
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs CIVIL - Notice of Docketing
Att: 2 3 pgs Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal
Att: 3 1 pgs USDC Judgment DE #85
Att: 4 1 pgs USDC Order DE #84