Original Case: 1:24-cv-00479

D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cvus-05263
Typecivil us / united states
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2024
Terminated:Mar 19, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Mar 20, 2025 5:16 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
Merrick B. Garland, Attorney General of the United States
Represented By
Jane M. Lyons
U.S. Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
John G. Roberts, Jr., Chief Justice
Represented By
Jane M. Lyons
U.S. Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
Secretary General of the United Nations
Defendant - Appellee
Registrar Peace Palace Carnegie Pleinz
Defendant - Appellee
Pamela Bondi, Attorney General of the United States
Represented By
Jane M. Lyons
U.S. Attorney's Office
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Christina Clement, also known as HH Empress Queen Christina Locs is Our Artifact of Faith
Represented By
Christina Clement
contact info

GPO Mar 19 2025
PER CURIAM JUDGMENT [2106476] filed (without memorandum) that the motions to expedite, including the alternative request for mandamus relief, be dismissed as moot [2097759-2], [2097759-3]. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the motion for an injunction be denied [2096440-2]. It is FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the district court’s October 28, 2024 order dismissing without prejudice appellant’s claims and the district court’s November 12, 2024 minute order denying reconsideration be affirmed. (SEE JUDGMENT FOR DETAILS) withholding issuance of the mandate. Before Judges: Childs, Pan and Garcia. [24-5263]

Docket last updated: 03/20/2025 5:16 AM EDT
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
US CIVIL CASE docketed. 24-5263
Related: [-]
CERTIFIED AND FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [2085797] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.70210350000199473672] of order [2085786-4]. Certified Mail Receipt due 12/20/2024 from Christina Clement. 24-5263
Related: [-]
11 pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [2085782] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:24-cv-00479-RC filed by Christina Clement. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 24-5263 24-5263
Related: [-]
CLERK'S ORDER [2085785] filed directing party to file motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis or payment of docketing fee. APPELLANT payment of docketing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis in district court due 12/20/2024. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. 24-5263
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Order Sent
Att: 2 7 pgs form(s) sent
2 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [2085786] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 01/09/2025. APPENDIX due 01/09/2025. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. 24-5263
Related: [-]