Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Alfredo R Perez
Case #: 4:24-bk-90586
Case Filed:Nov 22, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Mar 11, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors25,001-50,000
Est. Assets$1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Est. Liabilities $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Standard Functional Foods Group, LLC
3333 Finley Rd Ste 800
Downers Grove, IL 60515-1298
Debtor
HFS Matterhorn Topco, Inc
3333 Finley Rd Ste 800
Downers Grove, IL 60515-1298
Debtor
Toll Packaging Services LLC
3333 Finley Rd Ste 800
Downers Grove, IL 60515-1298
Debtor
Ryt-way Midco, LLC
3333 Finley Rd Ste 800
Downers Grove, IL 60515-1298
Debtor
Ryt-way Industries, LLC
3333 Finley Rd Ste 800
Downers Grove, IL 60515-1298
Debtor
Quality Baker Products LLC

,
Debtor
Peacock Foods LLC
3333 Finley Rd Ste 800
Downers Grove, IL 60515-1298
Debtor
HFS Sub, LLC
3333 Finley Rd Ste 800
Downers Grove, IL 60515-1298
Debtor
Hearthside Financing Company, Inc.

,
Debtor
Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC

,
Debtor
Hearthside Finance Company, Inc.
3333 Finley Rd Ste 800
Downers Grove, IL 60515-1298
Debtor
Hearthside Holdco, LLC
3333 Finley Rd Ste 800
Downers Grove, IL 60515-1298
Debtor
Hearthside USA - CPG Partners, LLC
3333 Finley Rd Ste 800
Downers Grove, IL 60515-1298
Debtor
Hearthside USA - Corporate, Inc.
3333 Finley Rd Ste 800
Downers Grove, IL 60515-1298
Debtor
Hearthside USA - Produce & Foodservice, LLC
3333 Finley Rd Ste 800
Downers Grove, IL 60515-1298
Debtor
Hearthside USA, LLC
3333 Finley Rd Ste 800
Downers Grove, IL 60515-1298
Debtor
Interbake Foods, LLC
3333 Finley Rd Ste 800
Downers Grove, IL 60515-1298
Debtor
H-Food Holdings, LLC
3333 Finley Road Suite 800
Downers Grove, IL 60515
Represented By
Michael Shane Johnson
Porter Hedges LLP
contact info
John F Higgins, IV
Porter Hedges LLP
contact info
Debtor
Matterhorn Buyer, LLC
3333 Finley Rd Ste 800
Downers Grove, IL 60515-1298
Debtor
Matterhorn Intermediate, LLC
3333 Finley Rd Ste 800
Downers Grove, IL 60515-1298
Debtor
Matterhorn Parent, LLC
3333 Finley Rd Ste 800
Downers Grove, IL 60515-1298
Debtor
Matterhorn Sub LLC

,
Debtor
Oak State Products, LLC
3333 Finley Rd Ste 800
Downers Grove, IL 60515-1298
Debtor
Peacock Engineering Company II, LLC
3333 Finley Rd Ste 800
Downers Grove, IL 60515-1298
Last checked: Monday Mar 10, 2025 1:26 PM CDT
Creditor
Symrise, Inc.
Represented By
David N Crapo
Gibbons P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Hanchett Paper Company d/b/a Shorr Packaging Corp.
Represented By
Stephen Jacob Humeniuk
Troutman Pepper Locke LLP
contact info
Creditor
Hilmar Cheese Company, Inc.
Represented By
Donald James Pool
Fennemore Craig, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Idaho Power Company
Jed Manwaring 251 E. Front St., Ste. 300
Boise, ID 83701
Represented By
Weldon Leslie Moore, III
Sussman & Moore, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Jimbo's Jumbos, Inc.
J. Michael Fields, Ward and Smith, P.A. Post Office Box 8088
Greenville, NC 27835
Represented By
James Michael Fields
Ward And Smith, P.A.
contact info
Creditor
La Porte Independent School District
Represented By
Melissa E Valdez
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott
contact info
Creditor
Mars Petcare US, Inc.
Represented By
Elisa M. Hyder
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Creditor
Ohio Power Company
2258 Wheatlands Drive
Manakin-Sabot, VA 23103
Represented By
Weldon Leslie Moore, III
Sussman & Moore, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Premier Trailers, LLC d/b/a Premier Trailer Leasing
Represented By
Mark Alan Platt
Frost Brown Todd LLC
contact info
Creditor
Primient
Represented By
Ismail Amin
Talg, Ltd.
contact info
Creditor
STORE Master Funding XXXII, LLC
Represented By
Joel Frederic Newell
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Creditor
Schreiber Foods Inc.
Attn: Audrey L. Hornisher 901 Main Street, Suite 6000
Dallas, TX 75202
Represented By
Audrey Lorene Hornisher
Clark Hill Strasburger
contact info
Creditor
Severn Peanut Company, Inc.
J. Michael Fields, Ward and Smith, P.A. Post Office Box 8088
Greenville, NC 27835
Represented By
James Michael Fields
Ward And Smith, P.A.
contact info
Creditor
Kerry Inc.
Represented By
Matt Micheli
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Creditor
TN Dept of Revenue
Bankruptcy Division P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202
Represented By
Stephen R. Butler
Office Of The Tennessee Attorney General
contact info
Creditor
Thrive Freeze Dry
Represented By
Scott E Blakeley
Blakeley Lc
contact info
Creditor
U.S. Bank Trust Company, National Association
Greenberg Traurig, LLP 1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 6700
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
David Robert Eastlake
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Represented By
Brett D Goodman
Arentfox Schiff LLP
contact info
Creditor
XTRA Lease LLC
Represented By
Christopher J Lawhorn
Bryan Cave LLP
contact info
Nathan R Wallace
Carmody Macdonald PC
contact info
Creditor
CRG Financial LLC
84 Herbert Avenue Building B Suite 202
Closter, NJ 07624
Creditor
Central States Pension Fund
8647 W. Higgins Road - 8th Floor
Chicago, IL 60631
Represented By
Anthony E Napoli
Central States Funds Law Department
contact info
Creditor
GPT Elk Grove LLC
Represented By
Michelle E Shriro
Singer & Levick PC
contact info
Creditor
Marathon Health, Inc.
Creditor
Cavanna Packaging USA Inc.
3400 Corporate Way Suite F
Duluth, GA 30096
Represented By
Clayton Alan Smith
Miller Martin PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Duke Realty Limited Partnership
Represented By
Kristen L Perry
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Creditor
Prologis-Illinois, LLC
Represented By
Kristen L Perry
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Creditor
Frito-Lay, Inc.; Quaker Manufacturing, LLC; Golden Grain Company; PepsiCo Foods Canada; PepsiCo Canada ULC; SVC Manufacturing, Inc.; and Pepsi Logistics Company, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph Frank
Burke, Warren, Mackay & Serritella, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Flour Power (Multi) LLC
Represented By
Alan Lipkin
Chaffetz Lindsey LLP
contact info
Paul D Moak
Reed Smith
contact info
Creditor
Flour Power (IL) LLC
Represented By
Alan Lipkin
Chaffetz Lindsey LLP
contact info
Paul D Moak
Reed Smith
contact info
Creditor
Flour Power (ID) LLC
Represented By
Alan Lipkin
Chaffetz Lindsey LLP
contact info
Paul D Moak
Reed Smith
contact info
Creditor
Flower Power (UT) LLC
Represented By
Alan Lipkin
Chaffetz Lindsey LLP
contact info
Paul D Moak
Reed Smith
contact info
Creditor
Flynn Burner Corporation
1401 McKinney Street, Suite 1900
Houston, TX 77010
Represented By
Zachary S McKay
Jackson Walker LLP
contact info
Creditor
FR Massachusetts 7, LLC
Sirlin Lesser & Benson, P.C. 123 South Broad Street, Suite 2100
Philadelphia, PA 19109
Creditor
ESM Products LLC
1130 Carolina Dr., #A
West Chicago, IL 60185
Creditor
Diversified Waste Solutions
ATTN: John Lipinsky 2300 Cabot Drive Suite 500
Lisle, IL 60532
Represented By
Matthew W. Bourda
Jones Murray LLP
contact info
Creditor
Constellation NewEnergy Gas Division, LLC
2258 Wheatlands Drive
Manakin-Sabot, VA 23103
Represented By
Weldon Leslie Moore, III
Sussman & Moore, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Central Michigan Building Services
985 E.Main St.
Ionia, MI 48846
Represented By
Perry G. Pastula
Dunn, Schouten & Snoap, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
CarbonBetter, LLC
Represented By
Steven J Mitby
Mitby Pacholder Johnson PLLC
contact info
Michael Keith Barnhart
Mitby Pacholder Johnson PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Cache Creek Foods, LLC
J. Michael Fields, Ward and Smith, P.A. Post Office Box 8088
Greenville, NC 27835
Represented By
James Michael Fields
Ward And Smith, P.A.
contact info
Creditor
Bryce Corporation
Represented By
Elaina S. Al-Nimri
Bass, Berry & Sims PLC
contact info
Creditor
Blue Yonder, Inc.
15059 N. Scottsdale Road Suite 400
Scottsdale, AZ 85254
Represented By
Mark A. Salzberg
Squire Patton Boggs (us) LLP
contact info
Greg R Wehrer
Squire Patton Boggs (us) LLP
contact info
Creditor
Ad Hoc Group of Senior Unsecured Noteholders
Represented By
Charles Martin Persons
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Creditor
Ad Hoc Group of Second Lien Claimants
Represented By
Jason S Brookner
Gray Reed & Mcgraw LLP
contact info
Creditor
AEP Energy, Inc.
2258 Wheatlands Drive
Manakin-Sabot, VA 23103
Represented By
Weldon Leslie Moore, III
Sussman & Moore, LLP
contact info
Creditor Committee
Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Charles R Gibbs
Mcdermott Will & Emery LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Officer Special Committee
Represented By
Kiran K Vakamudi
Vinson & Elkins
contact info
Interested Party
TR Capital Management LLC
Interested Party
Mondelez Global LLC
905 West Fulton Market Suite 200
Chicago, IL 60607
Represented By
S. Lee Whitesell
Hogan Lovells
contact info
Interested Party
Ad Hoc Group of Lenders to H-Food Holdings, LLC
Howley Law PLLC 700 Louisiana Street Suite 4545
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
Thomas A Howley
Howley Law PLLC
contact info
Interested Party
CB Metafora Aggregator, LLC and Hudson Post Credit Opportunities Aggregator, LLC, and Charlesbank Capital Partners, LLC
Represented By
Brian E Schartz
Kirkland And Ellis LLP
contact info
Interested Party
CB Metafora Aggregator, LLC and Hudson Post Credit Opportunities Aggregator, LLC
Represented By
Brian E Schartz
Kirkland And Ellis LLP
contact info
Interested Party
General Mills, Inc.
Represented By
Thomas G. Haskins
Barnes And Thornburg LLP
contact info
Interested Party
GFF, Inc
Represented By
Byron Z Moldo
Ervin Cohen And Jessup
contact info
Other Prof.
Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC
(f/k/a Prime Clerk LLC) 1 World Trade Center 31st Floor
New York, NY 10007
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
Susan B Hersh
Doj-Ust
contact info
Jayson B. Ruff
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 47 seconds ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
736 736 misc Affidavit Fri 05/02 12:44 PM
Affidavit Re: of Eladio Perez Regarding Notice of Combined Third Monthly Fee Statement of Deloitte Tax LLP for Compensation of Services Rendered as Tax Advisory Services to the Debtors for the Period from February 1, 2025 through March 11, 2025 . Related [+]. Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC (Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 728 Notice
Thursday, May 01, 2025
735 735 misc Affidavit Thu 05/01 4:27 PM
Affidavit Re: of Ishrat Khan Regarding Order (A) Approving (I) Omnibus Claims Objections Procedures, (II) the Form of Objection Notice, and (III) Filing of Substantive Omnibus Claims Objections, (B) Waiving the Requirement of Bankruptcy Rule 3007(e)(6), and (C) Granting Related Relief . Related [+]. Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC (Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 698 Generic Order
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
734 734 motion Sec 503(b) Claim Wed 04/30 11:29 AM
Motion for Sec 503(b) Claim Filed by Creditor Multivac, Inc. (Million, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (proposed order)
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
733 733 cmp Complaint [system event] Tue 04/29 3:50 PM
Adversary case 25-03316 Nature of Suit: (91 (Declaratory judgment)) Complaint - Complaint for Declaratory and Other Relief by Hearthside Food Solutions, LLC, MP Midco Holdings, LLC against LOF 3333, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (Higgins, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet
732 732 motion Administrative Expenses Tue 04/29 11:51 AM
Application for Administrative Expenses Pursuant to 11.U.S.C. Section 503(b)(1) . Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Creditor Bakery Equipment & Controls, Inc. (Rubin, Howard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A _ Invoice
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Application for Allowance and Payment of Administrative Expenses
731 731 misc Affidavit Tue 04/29 8:33 AM
Affidavit Re: of Ishrat Khan Regarding Notice of Withdrawal of Motion of Debtors Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 1121(d) to Extend Exclusive Period and The Reorganized Debtors' First Omnibus Objection to Certain Proofs of Claim (Amended Claims and Duplicate Claims) . Related [+]. Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC (Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 689 Notice,690 Objection to Claim
730 730 misc Affidavit Tue 04/29 8:28 AM
Affidavit Re: of Alain B. Francoeur Regarding Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order (A) Approving (I) Omnibus Claims Objections Procedures, (II) the Form of Objection Notice, and (III) Filing of Substantive Omnibus Claims Objections, (B) Waiving the Requirement of Bankruptcy Rule 3007(e)(6), and (C) Granting Related Relief . Related [+]. Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC (Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 673 Generic Motion
Friday, April 25, 2025
729 729 misc Affidavit Fri 04/25 1:34 PM
Affidavit Re: of Engels Medina Regarding Stipulation and Agreed Order Between Mondelez Global LLC and the Reorganized Debtors Resolving Motion of Mondelez Global LLC for Authority to Perform Setoffs and/or Recoupments . Related [+]. Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC (Steele, Benjamin)
Related: [-] 691 Stipulation