New York Southern District Court
Judge:Edgardo Ramos
Case #: 1:24-cv-08956
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Nov 22, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 06, 2025 3:51 AM EST
Defendant
11 Kitchen Inc.
Represented By
Stephen D Hans
Stephen D. Hans & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Erik Cheah
Represented By
Stephen D Hans
Stephen D. Hans & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Li Ying Zhang
Represented By
Valeria Fernandez
Bell Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Kyle Pulis
Bell Law Group PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Wed 04/30 12:14 PM
SUBSEQUENT MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 6/18/2025 at 11:30 AM in telephone or video conference.(sni)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
14 14 order Memo Endorsement Mon 04/21 11:11 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:13 Status Report filed by Li Ying Zhang ENDORSEMENT The parties are directed to file a status letter by May 30. 2025. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/21/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
13 13 misc Status Report Fri 04/18 12:46 PM
STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Li Ying Zhang..(Fernandez, Valeria)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
12 12 order Memo Endorsement Wed 03/19 3:46 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:11 Status Report filed by Li Ying Zhang ENDORSEMENT The parties are directed to file a status letter by April 18, 2025. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/19/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
11 11 misc Status Report Tue 03/18 12:47 PM
STATUS REPORT. / Joint mediation report Document filed by Li Ying Zhang..(Pulis, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
adr Mediation Conference Not Held Mon 03/03 11:50 AM
MEDIATION CONFERENCE NOT HELD Mediation Conference scheduled for 03/26/2025 will not be held. Mediation Status due by 3/18/2025.(sni)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Tue 01/21 3:52 PM
FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 3/26/2025 at 10:30 AM in telephone or video conference.(sni)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Thu 01/02 10:07 AM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 2/3/2025.(sge)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 12/12 4:51 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Erik Cheah served on 12/6/2024, answer due 12/27/2024. Service was accepted by "Jane Doe" - Manager, a person of suitable age and discretion.. Service was made by Mail and served personally. Document filed by Li Ying Zhang..(Fernandez, Valeria)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
9 9 order Mediation Referral Order for Cases Filed Under the Fair Labor Standards Act Thu 12/05 4:47 PM
MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 12/19/2024. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 12/10/2019) (rpr)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 12/05 9:10 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 11 Kitchen Inc., Erik Cheah..(Hans, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 12/04 5:01 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by 11 Kitchen Inc., Erik Cheah..(Hans, Stephen)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/04 4:00 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen D Hans on behalf of 11 Kitchen Inc., Erik Cheah..(Hans, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 11/25 3:02 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 11 Kitchen Inc., Erik Cheah..(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 11/25 1:18 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 11/25 1:26 PM
Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 11/25 1:27 PM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/22 3:31 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kyle Pulis on behalf of Li Ying Zhang..(Pulis, Kyle)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 11/22 3:30 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 11 KITCHEN INC, d/b/a WOK WOK SE ASIAN RESTAURANT and ERIK CHEAH, Individually,, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Li Ying Zhang..(Fernandez, Valeria)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 11/22 3:28 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Fernandez, Valeria)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 11/22 3:27 PM
COMPLAINT against 11 Kitchen Inc., Erik Cheah. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30227209)Document filed by Li Ying Zhang..(Fernandez, Valeria)
Related: [-]