Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Marcia Morales Howard
Referred: Laura Lothman Lambert
Case #: 3:24-cv-01212
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Case Filed:Nov 22, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday May 21, 2025 4:44 AM EDT
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Kyesha Mapp
United State'S Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Caleb Collins
Defendant
Sheriff Scotty Rhoden
in his official capaicty as Sheriff of Baker County, Florida Baker County Sheriff's Office 1 Sheriff's Office Drive
MACCLENNY, FL 32063
Plaintiff
Guillermo Antonio De Leon Serrabi
Represented By
Amy Godshall
Aclu Foundation Of Florida, Inc.
contact info
Amien Gnolou Kacou
American Civil Liberties Union Of Florida
contact info
Daniel B. Tilley
Aclu Foundation Of Florida, Inc.
contact info
Katherine Blankenship
Sanctuary Of The South, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
17 17 service Summons issued Tue 05/20 8:11 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Caleb Collins, Scotty Rhoden. (BD)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 19, 2025
16 16 24 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Mon 05/19 7:14 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States of America, Scotty Rhoden, Caleb Collins with Jury Demand. filed by Guillermo Antonio De Leon Serrabi.(Kacou, Amien)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Tue 05/13 1:58 PM
ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot doc. 13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff filed his response, doc. 14 , on the same date he filed his extension request. Therefore, the motion is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert on 5/13/2025. (SS)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
14 14 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 05/12 11:35 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Guillermo Antonio De Leon Serrabi.(Kacou, Amien)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Mon 05/12 11:56 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Guillermo Antonio De Leon Serrabi. (Kacou, Amien)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
12 12 motion Stay Discovery Fri 05/09 3:24 PM
MOTION to Stay Discovery by United States of America. (Mapp, Kyesha)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
11 11 motion Dismiss / Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 04/28 11:57 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by United States of America.(Mapp, Kyesha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Intergovernmental Services Agreement
Monday, March 31, 2025
10 10 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 03/31 2:02 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting doc. 9 Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to the complaint, doc. 1 , by April 28, 2025; the parties shall file their case management report by May 8, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert on 3/31/2025. (SS)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Fri 03/28 4:30 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by United States of America. (Mapp, Kyesha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
8 8 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 01/28 1:21 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting doc. 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and File Case Management Report. Defendant shall respond to the complaint, doc. 1 , on or before March 28, 2025; the parties shall file their case management report on or before April 8, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert on 1/28/2025. (NMK)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Mon 01/27 5:53 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by United States of America. (Mapp, Kyesha)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
6 6 service Summons returned executed as to USA Fri 12/06 4:31 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Guillermo Antonio De Leon Serrabi. United States of America served on 11/27/2024, answer due 1/27/2025. (Kacou, Amien)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 11/26 8:12 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JW)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
4 4 service Summons issued as to USA Mon 11/25 3:07 PM
SUMMONS issued as to U.S. Attorney. (LNR)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 11/25 3:01 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LNR)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 11/25 10:21 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Marcia Morales Howard and Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. New case number: 3:24-cv-01212-MMH-LLL. (JOS)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
1 1 21 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 11/22 5:14 PM
COMPLAINT against United States of America with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22753034) filed by Guillermo Antonio De Leon Serrabi.(Kacou, Amien)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons