Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Julie S Sneed
Referred: Daniel C Irick
Case #: 6:24-cv-02144
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Nov 22, 2024
Terminated:Jan 30, 2025
Case in other court:IN THE CIRCUIT COURT OF THE 9th JUDICIAL CIRCUIT, 2024-CA-008090-0
Last checked: Monday Jan 06, 2025 4:12 AM EST
Defendant
Federal Insurance Company
Represented By
Thomas A. Keller
Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig LLP
contact info
Melissa Marie Rodriguez
Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Eric Bonenberger
Represented By
Tyven Zalloum
Cohen Law Group
contact info
Plaintiff
Asra Khan
Represented By
Tyven Zalloum
Cohen Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, January 30, 2025
16 16 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Thu 01/30 12:12 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JDR)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 01/30 9:19 AM
ORDER dismissing case. The court has been notified by the mediator's notice of settlement (Dkt. 14 ) that this case has settled. Accordingly, pursuant to Local Rule 3.09, this case is DISMISSED without prejudice and subject to the right of the parties, within sixty days of the date of this order, to submit a stipulated form of final order or judgment should they so choose or for any party to move to reopen the action, upon good cause shown. After that sixty-day period, the dismissal shall be with prejudice. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate any pending motions and deadlines and to close this case. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on 1/30/2025. (AJL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of settlement Wed 01/29 1:10 PM
NOTICE of settlement by Pamela I. Perry (Perry, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
13 13 order Case Management Scheduling Order Mon 01/13 3:32 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/2/2025. Joinder of Parties due by 2/2/2025. Discovery due by 11/3/2025 Dispositive motions due by 12/1/2025 Pretrial statement due by 3/30/2026 All other motions due by 3/26/2026 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 9/2/2025 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 10/6/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2026 at 02:00 PM in Orlando Courtroom 6 C before Judge Julie S. Sneed Jury Trial set for 5/4/2026 at 09:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 6 C before Judge Julie S. Sneed. Conduct mediation hearing by 10/17/2025. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on 1/13/2025. (GNB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
12 12 misc Case Management Report Tue 12/31 12:30 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Rodriguez, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Mon 12/30 6:45 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on before Pamela I. Perry. (Perry, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
10 10 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 12/10 3:53 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Federal Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb Limited (NYSE: CB) for Federal Insurance Company. (Keller, Thomas)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of a Related Action Tue 12/10 1:27 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Eric Bonenberger, Asra Khan. Related case(s): No (Zalloum, Tyven)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Tue 12/10 10:12 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Eric Bonenberger, Asra Khan. (Zalloum, Tyven)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
7 7 order Standing Order Fri 12/06 3:53 PM
ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/2/2020. (TNP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of appearance Tue 11/26 11:05 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tyven Zalloum on behalf of Eric Bonenberger, Asra Khan (Zalloum, Tyven)
Related: [-]
5 5 15 pgs order Order Tue 11/26 8:28 AM
INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Julie S. Sneed on 11/26/2024. (GNB)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Mon 11/25 1:02 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Thomas A. Keller on behalf of Federal Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: Thomas A. Keller. (Keller, Thomas)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 11/25 11:03 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 11/25 9:54 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Julie S. Sneed and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:24-cv-2144-JSS-DCI. (RLK)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
1 1 8 pgs notice Notice of Removal Fri 11/22 5:48 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the 9th Judicial Circuit, case number 2024-CA-008090-0 filed in State Court on 9-11-24. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-22753023 filed by Federal Insurance Company.(Keller, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs State Court COMPLAINT,
Att: 2 State Court ANSWER,
Att: 3 State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 4 Composite Exhibit 1,
Att: 5 Exhibit 2,
Att: 6 Exhibit 3,
Att: 7 Exhibit 4,
Att: 8 Exhibit 5,
Att: 9 Exhibit 6,
Att: 10 Exhibit 7,
Att: 11 Exhibit 8,
Att: 12 Exhibit 9,
Att: 13 Civil Cover Sheet