Michigan Western District Court
Judge:Hala Y Jarbou
Referred: Phillip J Green
Case #: 1:24-cv-01253
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Nov 22, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 06, 2025 3:42 AM EST
defendant
Ann Embree
Represented By
Jeffrey Alexander Bove
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc (mi)
contact info
Mami Kato
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc (mi)
contact info
defendant
Tyler Hamersma
Represented By
Joseph Abraham Starr
Starr Butler & Stoner, PLLC
contact info
Zeth David Hearld
Starr Butler & Stoner, PLLC
contact info
defendant
John Konynenbelt
Represented By
Jeffrey Alexander Bove
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc (mi)
contact info
Mami Kato
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc (mi)
contact info
defendant
Casey Lowery
Represented By
Jeffrey Alexander Bove
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc (mi)
contact info
Mami Kato
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc (mi)
contact info
defendant
John Lowery
Represented By
Jeffrey Alexander Bove
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc (mi)
contact info
Mami Kato
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc (mi)
contact info
defendant
Lowery Corporation
Represented By
Jeffrey Alexander Bove
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc (mi)
contact info
Mami Kato
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc (mi)
contact info
defendant
Kirk Morgan
Represented By
Jeffrey Alexander Bove
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc (mi)
contact info
Mami Kato
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc (mi)
contact info
defendant
Jared Wike
Represented By
Jeffrey Alexander Bove
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc (mi)
contact info
Mami Kato
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc (mi)
contact info
defendant
Charlie Keesee
Represented By
Jeffrey Alexander Bove
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc (mi)
contact info
Mami Kato
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc (mi)
contact info
defendant
Kyle Macintosh
Represented By
Joseph Abraham Starr
Starr Butler & Stoner, PLLC
contact info
Zeth David Hearld
Starr Butler & Stoner, PLLC
contact info
defendant
Unknown Part(y)(ies)
plaintiff
Jordan Diffenderfer
Represented By
Paul Joseph Dillon
Dillon & Dillon, PLC
contact info
plaintiff
Tyler Kippe
Represented By
Paul Joseph Dillon
Dillon & Dillon, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
adr Facilitative Mediation - Fee Received Mon 05/05 3:04 PM
VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 500542216 as to all defendants (jmw)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
adr Facilitative Mediation - Fee Received Tue 04/29 10:12 AM
VFM FEE RECEIVED in the amount of $25.00, check number 9169 as to all defendants (jmw)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
23 23 adr Facilitative Mediation - Notice of Appointment of Facilitative Mediator Mon 04/21 3:44 PM
NOTICE of appointment of Facilitative Mediator Susan Hartmus Hiser; plaintiff VFM fee to be submitted by 4/28/2025 defendant VFM fee to be submitted by 4/28/2025 (kmd)
Related: [-]
22 22 adr Facilitative Mediation - Notice of Selection of Facilitative Mediator Mon 04/21 12:11 PM
SELECTION of Susan Hiser as facilitative mediator by plaintiff Jordan Diffenderfer (Dillon, Paul)
Related: [-]
utility Copies Mailed Mon 04/21 3:54 PM
Copy of Facilitative Mediation - Notice of Appointment of Facilitative Mediator23 sent via email to Facilitative Mediator Susan Hartmus Hiser (kmd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
21 21 service Proof of Service Tue 04/15 2:39 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Tyler Hamersma, Kyle Macintosh for Initial Disclosures (Hearld, Zeth)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Proof of Service Tue 04/15 1:58 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Jared Wike, Lowery Corporation, John Lowery, Casey Lowery, John Konynenbelt, Charlie Keesee, Ann Embree, Kirk Morgan for Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(A)(1) Disclosures (Bove, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
19 19 order Case Management Order Tue 04/01 7:35 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery and ADR to be completed by 9/5/2025; dispositive motions due by 10/6/2025; settlement conference set for 4/9/2026 at 10:30 AM at 499 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; final pretrial conference set for 5/12/2026 at 10:00 AM at 128 Federal Building, Lansing, MI before Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; jury trial set for 6/15/2026 at 9:00 AM at 128 Federal Building, Lansing, MI before Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
18 18 notice Attorney Substitution Thu 03/13 3:00 PM
ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION adding attorney Donald C. Bulea in the place of Mami Kato (Bulea, Donald) Modified text on 3/13/2025 (pjw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
17 17 misc Joint Status Report (Rule 16) Wed 03/05 5:12 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT (Bove, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
16 16 order Notice of Impending Dismissal Tue 02/04 8:29 PM
NOTICE OF IMPENDING DISMISSAL as to defendants John Does 1-10 for failure to serve; proofs of service to be submitted by 2/20/2025 or the case will be dismissed as to John Does 1-10; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
Related: [-]
15 15 4 pgs order Order Regarding Preparation of Joint Status Report Tue 02/04 8:10 PM
ORDER regarding preparation of joint status report: joint status report due by 3/5/2025; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/21 6:14 PM
ANSWER to complaint1 with affirmative defenses by Jared Wike, Lowery Corporation, John Lowery, Casey Lowery, John Konynenbelt, Charlie Keesee, Ann Embree, Kirk Morgan (Kato, Mami)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/21 4:22 PM
ANSWER to complaint1 with affirmative defenses and Limited Reliance Upon and Objection to Jury Demand by Tyler Hamersma, Kyle Macintosh (Hearld, Zeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
notice Attorney Appearance Thu 12/19 11:55 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jeffrey Alexander Bove on behalf of defendants Jared Wike, Lowery Corporation, John Lowery, Casey Lowery, John Konynenbelt, Charlie Keesee, Ann Embree, Kirk Morgan (Bove, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
notice Attorney Appearance Tue 12/17 4:01 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Joseph Abraham Starr on behalf of defendants Tyler Hamersma, Kyle Macintosh (Starr, Joseph)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Tue 12/17 4:02 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Zeth David Hearld on behalf of defendants Tyler Hamersma, Kyle Macintosh (Hearld, Zeth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
12 12 service Summons Issued Tue 11/26 2:50 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Tyler Hamersma, Kyle Macintosh (jjm)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Proposed Summons (to be issued) Tue 11/26 2:20 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re1 (Dillon, Paul)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
10 10 misc Notice Regarding Assignment of Case Mon 11/25 11:00 AM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Hala Y. Jarbou; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee (pjw)
Related: [-]
service Summons Not Issued Mon 11/25 11:03 AM
SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Tyler Hamersma, Kyle Macintosh, Jared Wike, Unknown Part(y)(ies), Lowery Corporation, John Lowery, Casey Lowery, John Konynenbelt, Charlie Keesee, Ann Embree, Kirk Morgan (none provided, fee due and some waivers of service have been e-filed) (pjw)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment Mon 11/25 3:51 PM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff Jordan Diffenderfer in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7551846 (Dillon, Paul)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 11/22 5:18 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Charlie Keessee as to Charlie Keessee waiver sent on 11/22/2024, answer due 1/21/2025 (Kato, Mami)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 11/22 5:16 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jared Wike as to Jared Wike waiver sent on 11/22/2024, answer due 1/21/2025 (Kato, Mami)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 11/22 5:15 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Ann Embree as to Ann Embree waiver sent on 11/22/2024, answer due 1/21/2025 (Kato, Mami)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 11/22 5:07 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by John Konynenbelt as to John Konynenbelt waiver sent on 11/22/2024, answer due 1/21/2025 (Kato, Mami)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 11/22 5:06 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Kirk Morgan as to Kirk Morgan waiver sent on 11/22/2024, answer due 1/21/2025 (Kato, Mami)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 11/22 5:04 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Casey Lowery as to Casey Lowery waiver sent on 11/22/2024, answer due 1/21/2025 (Kato, Mami)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 11/22 5:01 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by John Lowery as to John Lowery waiver sent on 11/22/2024, answer due 1/21/2025 (Kato, Mami)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 11/22 4:58 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Lowery Corporation as to Lowery Corporation waiver sent on 11/22/2024, answer due 1/21/2025 (Kato, Mami)
Related: [-]
1 1 61 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 11/22 3:43 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against John and Jane Doe 1-10, Ann Embree, Tyler Hamersma, Charlie Keessee, John Konynenbelt, Casey Lowery, John Lowery, Lowery Corporation, Kyle MacIntosh, Kirk Morgan, Jared Wike filed by Tyler Kippe, Jordan Diffenderfer (Dillon, Paul)
Related: [-]
notice Attorney Appearance Fri 11/22 4:41 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Mami Kato on behalf of defendants Jared Wike, Lowery Corporation, John Lowery, Casey Lowery, John Konynenbelt, Charlie Keessee, Ann Embree, Kirk Morgan (Kato, Mami)
Related: [-]