Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Melissa Damian
Referred: Alicia O Valle
Case #: 0:24-cv-62232
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Nov 22, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 06, 2025 3:50 AM EST
Defendant
The Lampo Group, LLC
Plaintiff
BretMichael Hood
Represented By
Andrew John Shamis
Shamis & Gentile P.A.
contact info
Scott Adam Edelsberg
Edelsberg Law PA
contact info
Garrett O. Berg
Shamis , Gentile, P.A.
contact info
Christopher Eric Berman
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, March 17, 2025
20 20 1 pgs order Order Scheduling Mediation Mon 03/17 11:02 AM
ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION before Mediator Rodney A. Max. Mediation Hearing set for 7/30/2025 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 3/17/2025. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
19 19 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Fri 03/14 2:21 PM
NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Rodney Max, BretMichael Hood as Mediator.(Shamis, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, March 13, 2025
18 18 11 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective/Confidentiality Order Thu 03/13 4:36 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 3/13/2025. See attached document for full details. (sd01)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
17 17 motion Protective/Confidentiality Order Wed 03/12 12:10 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Confidentiality and Protective Order by BretMichael Hood.(Shamis, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
16 16 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 02/25 4:11 PM
ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Mediation Deadline 8/25/2025, Jury Trial set for 1/26/2026 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Melissa Damian, Calendar Call set for 1/21/2026 01:30 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Melissa Damian.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 8/25/2025.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 2/25/2025. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
15 15 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 02/18 8:07 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by The Lampo Group, LLC. (Carlton, Clay)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
14 14 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Mon 02/10 3:20 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by BretMichael Hood (Shamis, Andrew)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Compliance Mon 02/10 3:17 PM
NOTICE of Compliance Certificate of Interested Parties by The Lampo Group, LLC re10 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report (Carlton, Clay)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal Tue 02/04 1:37 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Lampo Group, LLC, filed by BretMichael Hood.(Shamis, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
11 11 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 01/31 12:03 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by BretMichael Hood (Shamis, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
10 10 1 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Thu 01/30 2:29 PM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report due by 2/10/2025 Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 1/29/2025. See attached document for full details. (ar24)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
9 9 minutes Status Conference Wed 01/29 3:32 PM
PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Melissa Damian: Status Conference held on 1/29/2025. Total time in court: 10 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Garrett O. Berg and Clay Matthew Carlton. Court Reporter: Shamelle (Shelly) Kelley, 305-523-5637 / Shamelle_Kelley@flsd.uscourts.gov. (oco)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
8 8 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 01/27 7:58 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Lampo Group, LLC identifying Corporate Parent The Lampo Trust, Corporate Parent David L. Ramsey, III 2015 Children's Trust for The Lampo Group, LLC (Carlton, Clay)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/27 7:51 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by The Lampo Group, LLC. Attorney Clay Matthew Carlton added to party The Lampo Group, LLC(pty:dft). (Carlton, Clay)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Order Setting/Resetting/Cancelling Hearing ~Util - Terminate Hearings Mon 01/27 9:06 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER Resetting Hearing. It is hereby ORDERED that the Status Conference presently set for 1/28/2025 is reset for 1/29/2025 at 3:00 PM via Zoom before Judge Melissa Damian. The parties shall be prepared to address any pending motions and scheduling matters. The Court will provide the Zoom meeting information to all counsel of record prior to the hearing. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 1/27/2025. (oco)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order Setting Status Conference Thu 01/02 4:34 PM
ORDER Setting Status Conference: Status Conference set for 1/28/2025 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Melissa Damian. Signed by Judge Melissa Damian on 1/2/2025. See attached document for full details. (ar24)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 12/02 10:54 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BretMichael Hood. The Lampo Group, LLC waiver sent on 11/26/2024, response/answer due 1/27/2025. (Shamis, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 11/25 9:46 AM
Summons Issued as to The Lampo Group, LLC. (ar24)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 11/25 9:40 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Melissa Damian. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ar24)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 11/22 5:06 PM
COMPLAINT against The Lampo Group, LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18006377, filed by BretMichael Hood.(Shamis, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s) Summons for The Lampo Group LLC