California Central District Court
Judge:Stephen V Wilson
Referred: Alka Sagar
Case #: 2:24-cv-10133
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Nov 22, 2024
Terminated:Apr 24, 2025
Last checked: Monday Jan 06, 2025 1:09 AM PST
Defendant
Armen Sargsyan
Defendant
Burkwitz Solutions Inc.
Defendant
Simon Mikail
Plaintiff
Epson America, Inc.
Represented By
Richard H Doss
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart And Sullivan LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Epson Portland Inc.
Represented By
Richard H Doss
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart And Sullivan LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Seiko Epson Corporation
Represented By
Richard H Doss
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart And Sullivan LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
34 34 misc Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120) Thu 04/24 2:47 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (aco)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Judgment
33 33 judgmentCV Judgment - Consent Thu 04/24 2:44 PM
FINAL CONSENT JUDGMENT AS TO BURKWITZ SOLUTIONS, INC. by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. IT IS HEREBY FOUND, ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED THAT: This Consent Judgment shall finally conclude and dispose of all claims and counterclaims of Plaintiffs against Defendant and Defendant against Plaintiffs with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys fees. Final Judgment shall be entered hereto, forthwith, without further notice. The Clerk is directed to enter this Final Consent Judgment forthwith. (See document for further details). (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (aco)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
32 32 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Wed 04/23 10:02 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Epson America, Inc., Epson Portland Inc., Seiko Epson Corporation, re Stipulation for Judgment31 , Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))30 served on 04/23/25. (Doss, Richard)
Related: [-]
31 31 stip Judgment Wed 04/23 9:34 PM
STIPULATION for Judgment as to Burkwitz Solutions, Inc. filed by plaintiff Epson America, Inc., Epson Portland Inc., Seiko Epson Corporation.(Doss, Richard)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) Wed 04/23 9:15 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by plaintiff Seiko Epson Corporation, Epson Portland Inc., Epson America, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Simon Mikail, Armen Sargsyan. (Doss, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
29 29 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 04/08 11:25 AM
IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Court will give Plaintiffs 15 more days to file a motion for default or settle the case. If Plaintiffs fail to do so by that date, the Court will dismiss the case. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
28 28 misc Response Fri 03/28 9:14 AM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Epson America, Inc., Epson Portland Inc., Seiko Epson Corporationto Text Only Scheduling Notice, 27(Doss, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Richard H. Doss In Support of Plaintiffs' Response to OSC Re Dismissal For Lack of Prosecution (ECF No. 27)
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
27 27 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 02/26 3:31 PM
IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs to Order to Show Cause26 - The OSC is extended by thirty days, to and including March 28, 2025. The parties shall either settle, and file notice, thereon; or plaintiff shall move for default judgment. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
26 26 misc Response Fri 02/21 7:46 AM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Seiko Epson Corporation, Epson America, Inc., Epson Portland Inc.to Order to Show Cause,,19 , Text Only Scheduling Notice, 23(Doss, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Richard H. Doss In Support of Plaintiffs' Response To OSC Re Dismissal For Lack of Prosecution (ECF Nos. 19,23)
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
25 25 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Wed 01/29 2:51 PM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Simon Mikail (bm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
24 24 motion Clerk to Enter Default Tue 01/28 4:03 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Simon Mikail filed by Plaintiff Seiko Epson Corporation, Epson Portland Inc., Epson America, Inc.. (Doss, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Richard H. Doss In Support of Request For Entry of Default of Defendant Simon Mikhail Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 55(a)
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
23 23 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 01/22 10:53 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE-IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Court, having read and considered plaintiff's response to the Order to Show Cause, extends the OSC to February 21, 2025. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
22 22 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Tue 01/21 12:18 PM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Burkwitz Solutions Inc., Armen Sargsyan (bm)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
21 21 misc Response Fri 01/17 3:02 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Seiko Epson Corporation, Epson America, Inc., Epson Portland Inc.to Order to Show Cause,,19 (Doss, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Richard H. Doss In Support of Plaintiffs Response to OSC Re Dismissal For Lack of Prosecution (ECF No. 19)
20 20 motion Clerk to Enter Default Fri 01/17 2:46 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Burkwitz Solutions Inc., Armen Sargsyan filed by Plaintiff Seiko Epson Corporation, Epson Portland Inc., Epson America, Inc.. (Doss, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Richard H. Doss In Support of Request For Entry of Default of Defendants Burkwitz Solutions, Inc. and Armen Sargsyan Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 55(a)
Friday, January 10, 2025
19 19 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 01/13 8:40 AM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The file in this case lacks the papers that would show it is being timely prosecuted, as reflected below. Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, hereby orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing no later than January 17, 2025 why this action should not be dismissed as to all remaining defendants for lack of prosecution. (See document for further details). (aco)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
18 18 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 12/30 2:05 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Seiko Epson Corporation, Epson Portland Inc., Epson America, Inc., upon Defendant Simon Mikail served on 12/19/2024, answer due 1/9/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Simon Mikail, Chief Financial Officer, Secretary, and a Director of Burkwitz Solutions in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy (Doss, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
17 17 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 12/13 12:27 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Seiko Epson Corporation, Epson Portland Inc., Epson America, Inc., upon Defendant Armen Sargsyan served on 12/11/2024, answer due 1/2/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Armen Sargsyan Chief Executive Officer and a Director of Burkwitz Solutions, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Doss, Richard)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 12/13 12:09 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Seiko Epson Corporation, Epson Portland Inc., Epson America, Inc., upon Defendant Burkwitz Solutions Inc. served on 12/11/2024, answer due 1/2/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Armen Sargsyan - Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Doss, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
15 15 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 12/05 4:21 PM
NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The courtesy copy requirement is suspended until further notice. All proceedings are held in person. Requests for remote appearances must be filed a week prior to the proceeding. Requests are made in a pleading format, with a declaration stating the good cause why the attorney cannot appear in-person. (pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
14 14 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 11/25 10:02 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 as to Defendant Simon Mikail. (sh)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 11/25 10:01 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 as to Defendant Burkwitz Solutions Inc.. (sh)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 11/25 9:54 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 as to Defendant Armen Sargsyan. (sh)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 11/25 9:45 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
10 10 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 11/25 9:45 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 11/25 9:44 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (sh)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
8 8 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 11/22 3:29 PM
Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Seiko Epson Corporation, a Japan corporation, Epson America, Inc., a California corporation, EPSON PORTLAND INC., an Oregon corporation, (Doss, Richard)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120) Fri 11/22 3:27 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Seiko Epson Corporation, a Japan corporation, Epson America, Inc., a California corporation, EPSON PORTLAND INC., an Oregon corporation. (Doss, Richard)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 11/22 3:24 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiffs Seiko Epson Corporation, a Japan corporation, Epson America, Inc., a California corporation, EPSON PORTLAND INC., an Oregon corporation (Doss, Richard)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs notice Summons Request Fri 11/22 3:23 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Plaintiffs Seiko Epson Corporation, a Japan corporation, Epson America, Inc., a California corporation, EPSON PORTLAND INC., an Oregon corporation. (Doss, Richard)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs notice Summons Request Fri 11/22 3:22 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Plaintiffs Seiko Epson Corporation, a Japan corporation, Epson America, Inc., a California corporation, EPSON PORTLAND INC., an Oregon corporation. (Doss, Richard)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs notice Summons Request Fri 11/22 3:21 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Plaintiffs Seiko Epson Corporation, a Japan corporation, Epson America, Inc., a California corporation, EPSON PORTLAND INC., an Oregon corporation. (Doss, Richard)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 11/22 3:19 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Seiko Epson Corporation, a Japan corporation, Epson America, Inc., a California corporation, EPSON PORTLAND INC., an Oregon corporation. (Doss, Richard)
Related: [-]
1 1 140 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 11/22 3:17 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38639269 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiffs Seiko Epson Corporation, a Japan corporation, EPSON PORTLAND INC., an Oregon corporation, Epson America, Inc., a California corporation. (Attorney Richard H Doss added to party Seiko Epson Corporation, a Japan corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Richard H Doss added to party Epson America, Inc., a California corporation (pty:pla), Attorney Richard H Doss added to party EPSON PORTLAND INC., an Oregon corporation(pty:pla))(Doss, Richard)
Related: [-]