West Virginia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David L Bissett
Case #: 2:24-bk-00598
Case Filed:Nov 22, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Mar 24, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$50,000,001 to $100 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Century Mining LLC
PO Box 279
Volga, WV 26238-0279
Represented By
Joe M. Supple
Supple Law Office, PLLC
contact info
David B. Salzman
Campbell & Levine, LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
2025 United States Courthouse 300 Virginia Street East
Charleston, WV 25301


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
716 716 utility Supplement to Document Mon 05/05 1:09 PM
Supplement to Document (Supplement to MorrisAnderson & Associates, Ltd.'s Third Monthly Application for Allowance of Compensation for Services Rendered and for Reimbursement of Expenses as Financial Advisor and Chief Restructuring Officer to the Debtor) Filed by David B. Salzman on behalf of Century Mining LLC Related [+]. (Salzman, David)
Related: [-] 674 Application for Compensation
Friday, May 02, 2025
715 715 motion Compensation Fri 05/02 4:04 PM
Amended Application for Compensation for Stephen L. Thompson, Creditor Comm. Aty, Period: 3/1/2025 to 3/31/2025, Fees: $10,050.00, Expenses: $0.00. with Certificate of Service Filed by Stephen L. Thompson (Thompson, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
714 714 misc Certificate of No Objection Thu 05/01 4:57 PM
Certificate of No Objection RE:675 Application for Compensation (Certificate of No Objection RE: Supple Law Office, PLLCs Third Monthly Application for Allowance of Compensation for Services Rendered and for Reimbursement of Expenses as Local Counsel to the Debtor) Filed by David B. Salzman on behalf of Century Mining LLC Related [+]. (Salzman, David)
Related: [-] 675 Application for Compensation
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
713 713 misc Certificate of Service Wed 04/30 3:53 PM
Certificate of Service RE: the Notice of Filing and Service of the Debtor's First Ordinary Course Professional Quarterly Statement Filed by David B. Salzman on behalf of Century Mining LLC Related [+]. (Salzman, David)
Related: [-] 712 Notice filed by Debtor Century Mining LLC
712 712 misc Notice Wed 04/30 3:06 PM
Notice of Filing and Service of the Debtor's First Ordinary Course Professional Quarterly Statement Filed by David B. Salzman on behalf of Century Mining LLC Related [+]. (Salzman, David)
Related: [-] 362 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Att: 1 Exhibit A
711 711 misc Certificate of No Objection Wed 04/30 11:47 AM
Certificate of No Objection RE:673 Application for Compensation (Certificate of No Objection RE: Campbell & Levine, LLC's Third Monthly Application for Allowance of Compensation for Services Rendered and for Reimbursement of Expenses as Counsel to the Debtor) Filed by David B. Salzman on behalf of Century Mining LLC Related [+]. (Salzman, David)
Related: [-] 673 Application for Compensation
court BNC ADI Returned Mail Wed 04/30 7:00 PM
Returned Mail: Mail originally sent on 03/08/2025 returned as undeliverable. Could not mail Form negntc to: CSX N/A 166519 200 Neville Road Unit 7 Pittsburgh, PA 15225-1620. (ADIrm adi)
Related: [-]
court BNC ADI Returned Mail Wed 04/30 7:00 PM
Returned Mail: Mail originally sent on 03/30/2025 returned as undeliverable. Could not mail Form negntc to: AJI Marketing and Sales, LLC 600 Steamboat Road Greenwich, CT 06830-7181. (ADIrm adi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
710 710 motion Compensation Tue 04/29 4:01 PM
Fourth Application for Compensation for Stephen L. Thompson, Creditor Comm. Aty, Period: 3/1/2025 to 3/31/2025, Fees: $10,000.00, Expenses: $0.00. with Certificate of Service Filed by Stephen L. Thompson (Thompson, Stephen)
Related: [-]
709 709 misc Notice Tue 04/29 9:11 AM
Notice of Further Extension of Milestones Related to Effective Date of Plan and the Rights Offering Filed by David B. Salzman on behalf of Century Mining LLC Related [+]. (Salzman, David)
Related: [-] 239 Order on Motion to Use Cash Collateral
708 708 misc Amended Document Tue 04/29 9:07 AM
Amended document(s) , Certificate of No Objection RE:707 Certificate of No Objection filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee Filed by Elizabeth Kavitz on behalf of United States Trustee Related [+]. (Kavitz, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 707 Certificate of No Objection filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee
court BNC ADI Returned Mail Tue 04/29 7:00 PM
Returned Mail: Mail originally sent on 03/26/2025 returned as undeliverable. Could not mail Form pdfdoc to: CSX N/A 166519 200 Neville Road Unit 7 Pittsburgh, PA 15225-1620. (ADIrm adi)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
707 707 misc Certificate of No Objection Mon 04/28 3:14 PM
Certificate of No Objection RE:673 Application for Compensation Filed by Elizabeth Kavitz on behalf of United States Trustee Related [+]. (Kavitz, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 673 Application for Compensation
706 706 misc Notice of Change of Address Mon 04/28 11:18 AM
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Northco Corporation . (trs)
Related: [-]
court BNC ADI Returned Mail Mon 04/28 7:00 PM
Returned Mail: Mail originally sent on 03/26/2025 returned as undeliverable. Could not mail Form pdfdoc to: CSX N/A 166519 200 Neville Road Unit 7 Pittsburgh, PA 15225-1620. (ADIrm adi)
Related: [-]