Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Richard W Story
Case #: 2:24-cv-00280
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 05, 2025 5:21 AM EST
Defendant
Benjamin C. Toombs
Represented By
Elizabeth Griffin
Freeman, Mathis, & Gary
contact info
David Alan Cole
Freeman Mathis & Gary, Llp -Atl
contact info
Plaintiff
America's Home Place, Inc.
Represented By
Casey Malloy
Kay Griffin Evans PLLC
contact info
Daniel C. Headrick
Kay Griffin Evans, PLLC
contact info
Benjamin Goldammer
Kay Griffin Evans, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
31 31 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 04/24 12:02 PM
ORDER granting30 Defendant's Motion to Stay Pending Resolution of Criminal Proceedings. This civil action, including all discovery and related deadlines, is stayed until further order of the Court, pending resolution of the related criminal proceedings involving Defendant. The parties shall promptly notify the Court upon the final resolution of the criminal matter. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 04/24/2025. (ddm)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Fri 04/18 3:41 PM
DOCKET ORDER granting29 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Nathan Thomas Lee for America's Home Place, Inc. Attorney Daniel C. Headrick terminated. Entered by Judge Richard W. Story on 04/18/2025. (sk)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
30 30 motion Stay Mon 04/14 5:19 PM
MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Criminal Proceedings with Brief In Support by Benjamin C. Toombs.(Cole, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Incident/Investigation Report,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Sheriff's Office Booking Report,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Sample News Article
Thursday, April 10, 2025
29 29 motion Substitute Attorney Thu 04/10 11:53 AM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney Nathan Lee for Daniel C. Headrick as local counsel by America's Home Place, Inc. (Goldammer, Benjamin) Modified on 4/10/2025 to identify attorneys (sk)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
28 28 discov Certificate of Service Fri 03/28 4:40 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Benjamin C. Toombs.(Cole, David)
Related: [-]
27 27 discov Certificate of Service Fri 03/28 4:38 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Interrogatories to Plaintiff by Benjamin C. Toombs.(Cole, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
26 26 order Scheduling Order Thu 02/27 9:53 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER approving24 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan.The parties agree to the four-month discovery track. Discovery ends on 6/26/2025. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 02/26/2025. (sk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
25 25 discov Certificate of Service Wed 02/26 4:24 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Disclosures by Benjamin C. Toombs.(Cole, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
24 24 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Tue 02/25 4:48 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by America's Home Place, Inc.. (Goldammer, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
23 23 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/27 4:43 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief and Damages by Benjamin C. Toombs. Discovery ends on 6/26/2025.(Cole, David)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 01/27 4:27 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Benjamin C. Toombs. (Cole, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
21 21 discov Certificate of Service Mon 12/30 4:27 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents by Benjamin C. Toombs.(Cole, David)
Related: [-]
20 20 discov Certificate of Service Mon 12/30 4:26 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Interrogatories by Benjamin C. Toombs.(Cole, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
19 19 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/04 12:36 PM
ORDER approving17 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Casey Malloy for America's Home Place, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 12/04/2024. (sk)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 12/04 12:37 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Casey Malloy forAmerica's Home Place, Inc. re19 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (sk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Tue 12/03 3:45 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:17 APPLICATION for Admission of Casey R. Malloy Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13886880). Attorney Casey Malloy added appearing on behalf of America's Home Place, Inc. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (esr)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
18 18 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Expedite Order on Motion for TRO Mon 12/02 4:08 PM
ORDER: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(d), Toombs waives service of a summons and the complaint and shall file and serve an answer or a motion under Rule 12 on or before January 27, 2024. Until further order of this Court or the dismissal or other final disposition of this case, Mr. Toombs shall not, either directly or indirectly through others, without prior written consent ofAHP: (a) use or disclose any of AHP's Confidential or Trade Secret Information as defined in the Employment Agreement; (b) use or disclose any of AHP's copyright-protected information; and (c) use or disclose any of AHP's other data or documents. Toombs shall return any information described in Paragraph 2 that is within his possession to AHP through his counsel within 7 days of entry of this Order. Mr. Toombs shall permanently delete all copies of such information, and certify in writing to AHP that such deletion has occurred. No further expedited discovery shall be allowed except for good cause shown. AHP's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc.2 ) and Motion for Expedited Discovery (Doc.6 ) are hereby denied as moot and the hearing presently set for 1:30 p.m. on December 3, 2024, is cancelled. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 12/02/2024. (rsg)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/02 2:17 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Casey R. Malloy Pro Hac Vice.by America's Home Place, Inc.. (Headrick, Daniel)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/02 1:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Griffin on behalf of Benjamin C. Toombs (Griffin, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/02 1:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Alan Cole on behalf of Benjamin C. Toombs (Cole, David)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Proposed Consent Order Mon 12/02 10:16 AM
Proposed CONSENT ORDER re:2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. (Headrick, Daniel)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 12/02 4:10 PM
Set Deadlines: Benjamin C. Toombs answer due 1/27/2025. (rsg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
13 13 service Return of Service Executed Tue 11/26 10:42 AM
Return of Service Executed by America's Home Place, Inc.. Benjamin C. Toombs served on 11/23/2024, answer due 12/16/2024. (Headrick, Daniel)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Tue 11/26 11:28 AM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re:2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Motion Hearing RESCHEDULED for 12/3/2024 at 01:30 PM in GAINESVILLE Courtroom 303 before Judge Richard W. Story. (Counsel directed to notify if agreement reached and no hearing necessary) (sk)
Related: [-]
misc Return of Application for Admission PHV Tue 11/26 11:36 AM
RETURN of10 APPLICATION for Admission of Casey R. Malloy Pro Hac Vice to attorney for correction. Reason for return: Local counsel's address on application does not match address on file with the court. These address must match. Please correct and resubmit. (jas)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
12 12 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/25 12:02 PM
ORDER approving7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Viceof Benjamin E. Goldammer. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 11/25/2024. (sk)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs order Order Allowing Audio/Visual Equipment in the Courtroom Mon 11/25 11:55 AM
ORDER ALLOWING AUDIO/VISUAL EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM on Tuesday, November 26, 2024 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 11/25/2024. (sk)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/25 10:42 AM
APPLICATION for Admission of Casey R. Malloy Pro Hac Vice.by America's Home Place, Inc.. (Headrick, Daniel)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Filing Mon 11/25 10:12 AM
COURT NOTICE OF FILING: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
Related: [-]
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Mon 11/25 10:03 AM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:7 APPLICATION for Admission of Benjamin E. Goldammer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13886877). Attorney Benjamin Goldammer added appearing on behalf of America's Home Place, Inc. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (esr)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Mon 11/25 10:05 AM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re:2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Motion Hearing set for 11/26/2024 at 02:00 PM in GAINESVILLE Courtroom 303 before Judge Richard W. Story. (sk)
Related: [-]
misc Return of Application for Admission PHV Mon 11/25 10:18 AM
RETURN of8 APPLICATION for Admission of Casey R. Malloy Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13886880) to attorney for correction. Reason for Return: Format of application is incorrect. Please use the application on the courts website to ensure correct formatting. Please correct and resubmit. (esr)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 11/25 12:03 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Attorney Benjamin E. Goldammer for America's Home Place, Inc. re12 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (sk)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
8 8 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/22 7:06 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Casey R. Malloy Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13886880).by America's Home Place, Inc.. (Headrick, Daniel) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/22 7:05 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Benjamin E. Goldammer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13886877).by America's Home Place, Inc.. (Headrick, Daniel) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Expedite Fri 11/22 12:45 PM
MOTION to Expedite Discovery with Brief In Support by America's Home Place, Inc..(Headrick, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief MOL ISO Mtn Expedited Discovery
5 5 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 11/22 12:35 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by America's Home Place, Inc.. (Headrick, Daniel)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate of Compliance Fri 11/22 11:52 AM
CERTIFICATE of Compliance re2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Efforts to Provide Notice)(Headrick, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Email to Defendant
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 11/22 10:35 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Benjamin C. Toombs. (rsg)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Fri 11/22 10:33 AM
Submission of2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, to District Judge Richard W. Story. (rsg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
2 2 motion Temporary Restraining Order Fri 11/22 10:33 AM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order with Brief In Support by America's Home Place, Inc..(rsg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
1 1 31 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 11/22 10:31 AM
COMPLAINT filed by America's Home Place, Inc.. (Filing fee $405.00, receipt number AGANDC-13883432)(rsg) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Trade Secrets and Confidential Information Appendix,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Brown Haven's Website re Mr. White,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - LTR to Mr. Toombs,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - LTR to Brown Haven,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet