Maine District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00134
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 23, 2024 2:32 AM EST
Defendant
ANTHONY LOBOR (1)
Represented By
GRAINNE DUNNE
Hallett, Whipple & Weyrens, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
NICHOLAS S. HEIMBACH
Doj-Usao
contact info
SHIRA FURMAN
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/23/2024 11:04 AM EST
Monday, October 07, 2024
1 1 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to ANTHONY LOBOR (clp) [2:24-mj-00308-KFW]
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER granting1 Motion to Seal Case as to ANTHONY LOBOR (1) By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (clp) [2:24-mj-00308-KFW]
Related: [-]
3 3 SEALED COMPLAINT (Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF) as to ANTHONY LOBOR (1). (clp) [2:24-mj-00308-KFW]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Complaint
4 4 SYNOPSIS as to ANTHONY LOBOR (clp) [2:24-mj-00308-KFW]
Related: [-]
5 5 Arrest Warrant Issued by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF as to ANTHONY LOBOR. Warrant provided to U.S. Marshals Service. (clp) [2:24-mj-00308-KFW]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
COMPLAINT UNSEALED as to ANTHONY LOBOR (mtm) [2:24-mj-00308-KFW]
Related: [-]
6 6 AMENDED SYNOPSIS as to ANTHONY LOBOR (mtm) [2:24-mj-00308-KFW]
Related: [-]
7 7 MOTION to Unseal Complaint by USA as to ANTHONY LOBOR (clp) [2:24-mj-00308-KFW]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER granting7 Motion Unseal Case as to ANTHONY LOBOR (1) By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (mtm) [2:24-mj-00308-KFW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
9 9 NOTICE OF HEARING as to ANTHONY LOBOR: Initial Appearance & Attorney Appointment Hearing set for 10/15/2024 at 10:00 AM in Portland Courtroom 1 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (clp) [2:24-mj-00308-KFW]
Related: [-]
10 10 (Access to document is restricted to USA and applicable defendant only) Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Prosequendum Issued on October 9, 2024 for ANTHONY LOBOR to appear on October 15, 2024 by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF (clp) [2:24-mj-00308-KFW]
Related: [-]
11 11 MOTION for Detention by USA as to ANTHONY LOBOR Responses due by 10/30/2024. (FURMAN, SHIRA) [2:24-mj-00308-KFW]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
CJA 20 Appointment of Attorney GRAINNE DUNNE for ANTHONY LOBOR. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (nrg) [2:24-mj-00308-KFW]
Related: [-]
12 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF: Initial Appearance held as to ANTHONY LOBOR. Attorney Appointment Hearing held as to ANTHONY LOBOR; GRAINNE DUNNE appointed. Preliminary Hearing Waived as to ANTHONY LOBOR. Defendant ordered temporarily detained and remanded to custody. (Court Reporter: Michelle Feliccitti) (nrg) [2:24-mj-00308-KFW]
Related: [-]
13 13 Financial Affidavit by ANTHONY LOBOR (Access to document is restricted to USA and applicable defendant only) (nrg) [2:24-mj-00308-KFW]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORAL ORDER approving13 Financial Affidavit as to ANTHONY LOBOR (1) By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (nrg) [2:24-mj-00308-KFW]
Related: [-]
15 15 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by ANTHONY LOBOR (nrg) [2:24-mj-00308-KFW]
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER as to ANTHONY LOBOR: Pursuant to the Due Process Protection Act, Pub.L.No. 116-182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21,2020) and Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is reminded of its obligation to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant, that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland 383 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. So Ordered. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (nrg) [2:24-mj-00308-KFW]
Related: [-]
17 17 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to ANTHONY LOBOR Detention Hearing set for 10/18/2024 10:00 AM in Portland Courtroom 3 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (nrg) [2:24-mj-00308-KFW]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
18 18 Pretrial Services Report as to ANTHONY LOBOR filed by U.S. Probation. (Access to document is restricted to USA and applicable defendant only)(METCALFE, JENNIFER) [2:24-mj-00308-KFW]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Conditions
19 19 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Detention Hearing by ANTHONY LOBOR Responses due by 11/7/2024. (DUNNE, GRAINNE) [2:24-mj-00308-KFW]
Related: [-]
20 20 ORDER granting19 Motion to Continue Detention Hearing as to ANTHONY LOBOR (1) By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (nrg) [2:24-mj-00308-KFW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
21 21 NOTICE OF HEARING as to ANTHONY LOBOR: Continued Detention Hearing set for 10/28/2024 02:00 PM in Portland Courtroom 3 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (nrg) [2:24-mj-00308-KFW]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
22 22 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Detention Hearing by ANTHONY LOBOR Responses due by 11/15/2024. (DUNNE, GRAINNE) [2:24-mj-00308-KFW]
Related: [-]
23 23 ORDER granting22 Unopposed Motion to Continue Detention Hearing as to ANTHONY LOBOR (1) By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (nrg) [2:24-mj-00308-KFW]
Related: [-]
24 24 NOTICE as to ANTHONY LOBOR: Detention Hearing set for October 28, 2024, has been continued and will be rescheduled by the clerk's office. (nrg) [2:24-mj-00308-KFW]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
25 25 NOTICE OF HEARING as to ANTHONY LOBOR Detention Hearing set for 11/5/2024 03:00 PM in Portland Courtroom 3 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (nrg) [2:24-mj-00308-KFW]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
26 26 (Access to document is restricted to USA and applicable defendant only) Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued on 11/4/2024 for ANTHONY LOBOR as to ANTHONY LOBOR to appear on 11/5/2024 by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF (nrg) [2:24-mj-00308-KFW]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
27 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF: Detention Hearing Waived as to ANTHONY LOBOR. Defendant is ordered conditionally detained and remanded to custody. (Court Reporter: Lori Dunbar) (nrg) [2:24-mj-00308-KFW]
Related: [-]
28 28 CONDITIONAL ORDER of Detention as to ANTHONY LOBOR (1) By MAGISTRATE JUDGE KAREN FRINK WOLF. (nrg) [2:24-mj-00308-KFW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
29 29 INDICTMENT as to ANTHONY LOBOR (1) count(s) 1, 2. (clp)
Related: [-]
30 30 SYNOPSIS as to ANTHONY LOBOR (clp) (Main Document 30 replaced on 11/21/2024 as previous upload only contained page 1) (clp)
Related: [-]