Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-03080
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 24, 2024 1:25 AM CST
Defendant
Israel Aguilar Macias (1)
Represented By
Diana S. Aguilar
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joshua Jerome Garland
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Feb 26 2025
FINDINGS OF FACT AND RECOMMENDATION on felony guilty plea before the United States Magistrate Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Israel Aguilar Macias. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (am3)
GPO Mar 20 2025
ORDER accepting re 22 Findings of Fact on Plea as to Israel Aguilar Macias. Guilty plea accepted. Signed by District Judge Ernest Gonzalez. (am3)

Docket last updated: 11/24/2024 2:18 AM CST
Thursday, October 31, 2024
Arrest of Israel Aguilar Macias (mgc) [2:24-mj-03226-MHW]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
ARREST Warrant Returned Executed on 10/31/24 as to Israel Aguilar Macias. (mgc) [2:24-mj-03226-MHW]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters as to Israel Aguilar Macias. (mgc) [2:24-mj-03226-MHW]
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Matthew H. Watters as to Israel Aguilar Macias. (mgc) [2:24-mj-03226-MHW]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to USA as to Israel Aguilar Macias. (drda) [2:24-mj-03226-MHW]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Israel Aguilar Macias (1); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond as to Israel Aguilar Macias (1).By Judge Matthew H. Watters. (drda) [2:24-mj-03226-MHW]
Related: [-]
3 3 Proceedings held before Judge Matthew H. Watters:Initial Appearance as to Israel Aguilar Macias held on 11/4/2024 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 11/7/2024 9:00AM before Judge Matthew H. Watters, Interpreter NOT required as to Israel Aguilar Macias (Court Reporter FTR GOLD - C. LEVRIE.) (drda) [2:24-mj-03226-MHW]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Diana S. Aguilar for Israel Aguilar Macias appointed. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters. (ccl) [2:24-mj-03226-MHW]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
5 5 MOTION to Continue by Israel Aguilar Macias. (Aguilar, Diana) [2:24-mj-03226-MHW]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER GRANTING5 Motion to Continue as to Israel Aguilar Macias (1) Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing RESET for 11/18/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Matthew H. Watters,. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters. (ccl) [2:24-mj-03226-MHW]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
7 7 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Israel Aguilar Macias (Aguilar, Diana) [2:24-mj-03226-MHW]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER OF DETENTION: Bond set to No Bond as to Israel Aguilar Macias. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters. (r013) [2:24-mj-03226-MHW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
9 9 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Israel Aguilar Macias (1) count(s) 1. (bot4)
Related: [-] dacted Version
11 11 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Israel Aguilar Macias (bot4)
Related: [-]