Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-03084
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 24, 2024 1:26 AM CST
Defendant
Isidro Sanchez Mendoza, Jr., (1)
Represented By
Priscilla Puente-Chacon
Law Office Of Puente-Chacon, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Nallely Duarte
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/24/2024 2:20 AM CST
Friday, October 25, 2024
Arrest of Isidro Sanchez Mendoza (ccl) [2:24-mj-03162-MHW]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
ARREST Warrant Returned Executed on 10/25/2024 as to Isidro Sanchez Mendoza. (ccl) [2:24-mj-03162-MHW]
Related: [-]
True Name of Defendant as to Isidro Sanchez Mendoza. True name of defendant is: Isidro Sanchez Mendoza, Jr. (ccl) [2:24-mj-03162-MHW]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Isidro Sanchez Mendoza, Jr. (ccl) [2:24-mj-03162-MHW]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Isidro Sanchez Mendoza Jr., (1); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond as to Isidro Sanchez Mendoza Jr., (1) by Judge Matthew H. Watters. (ccl) [2:24-mj-03162-MHW]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters as to Isidro Sanchez Mendoza. (ccl) [2:24-mj-03162-MHW]
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Matthew H. Watters as to Isidro Sanchez Mendoza. (ccl) [2:24-mj-03162-MHW]
Related: [-]
3 3 Proceedings held before Judge Matthew H. Watters:Initial Appearance as to Isidro Sanchez Mendoza, Jr held on 10/28/2024 ( Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 10/31/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Matthew H. Watters,), Spanish Language Interpreter NOT required as to Isidro Sanchez Mendoza, Jr (Court Reporter FTR Gold-C. Levrie.) (ccl) [2:24-mj-03162-MHW]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
ORAL MOTION to Continue by Isidro Sanchez Mendoza, Jr. (ccl) [2:24-mj-03162-MHW]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Isidro Sanchez Mendoza Jr., (1)by Judge Matthew H. Watters. (ccl) [2:24-mj-03162-MHW]
Related: [-]
4 4 Proceedings held before Judge Matthew H. Watters:Attorney Status Hearing as to Isidro Sanchez Mendoza, Jr held on 10/31/2024 ( Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing RESET for 11/4/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Matthew H. Watters,); Court appoints CJA. (Court Reporter FTR Gold-C. Levrie.) (ccl) [2:24-mj-03162-MHW]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Priscilla Puente-Chacon for Isidro Sanchez Mendoza, Jr appointed. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters. (vjp) [2:24-mj-03162-MHW]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
6 6 MOTION to Continue by Isidro Sanchez Mendoza, Jr. (Puente-Chacon, Priscilla) [2:24-mj-03162-MHW]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER GRANTING6 Motion to Continue as to Isidro Sanchez Mendoza Jr., (1) Detention Hearing and Preliminary Hearing RESET for 11/7/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Matthew H. Watters,. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters. (mgc) [2:24-mj-03162-MHW]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
8 8 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Isidro Sanchez Mendoza, Jr (Puente-Chacon, Priscilla) [2:24-mj-03162-MHW]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER OF DETENTION: Bond set to No Bond as to Isidro Sanchez Mendoza, Jr. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters. (r013) [2:24-mj-03162-MHW]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
10 10 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Isidro Sanchez Mendoza, Jr (1) count(s) 1, 2. (bot4)
Related: [-] dacted Version
12 12 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Isidro Sanchez Mendoza, Jr (bot4)
Related: [-]