Texas Western District Court
Case #: 5:24-cr-00575
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 24, 2024 1:37 AM CST
Defendant
Gabriel Sanchez-Ramirez (1)
Represented By
Alfredo R. Villarreal
Federal Public Defender, Txw
contact info
Duty Pub. Defender-San Antonio
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Sade Bogart
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/24/2024 2:40 AM CST
Thursday, October 24, 2024
Arrest of Gabriel Sanchez-Ramirez (vs1) [5:24-mj-01484-HJB]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad as to Gabriel Sanchez-Ramirez. (vs1) [5:24-mj-01484-HJB]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Gabriel Sanchez-Ramirez. (vs1) [5:24-mj-01484-HJB]
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Henry J. Bemporad:Initial Appearance as to Gabriel Sanchez-Ramirez held on 10/24/2024. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Gabriel Sanchez-Ramirez (Court Reporter FTR GOLD.) (rqr) [5:24-mj-01484-HJB]
Related: [-]
4 4 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Gabriel Sanchez-Ramirez (SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002). (rqr) [5:24-mj-01484-HJB]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Duty Pub. Defender-San Antonio for Gabriel Sanchez-Ramirez. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (rqr) [5:24-mj-01484-HJB]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: as to Gabriel Sanchez-Ramirez. Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 10/29/2024 11:00 AM before Judge U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (rqr) [5:24-mj-01484-HJB]
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Alfredo R. Villarreal appearing for Gabriel Sanchez-Ramirez . Attorney Alfredo R. Villarreal added to party Gabriel Sanchez-Ramirez(pty:dft) (Villarreal, Alfredo) [5:24-mj-01484-HJB]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
8 8 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Gabriel Sanchez-Ramirez (Villarreal, Alfredo) [5:24-mj-01484-HJB]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER OF DETENTION: Bond set to No Bond as to Gabriel Sanchez-Ramirez. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (r013) [5:24-mj-01484-HJB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
10 10 1 pgs INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Gabriel Sanchez-Ramirez (1) count(s) 1. (bot4)
Related: [-] dacted Version
12 12 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Gabriel Sanchez-Ramirez (bot4)
Related: [-]