Texas Western District Court
Case #: 5:24-cr-00581
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 24, 2024 1:39 AM CST
Defendant
Jose Alredo Campos-Lara (1)
Represented By
Mario A. Trevino
Mario A. Trevino
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Anne Marie Cordova
Doj-Usao
contact info

GPO Jan 23 2025
FINDINGS OF FACT AND RECOMMENDATION on felony guilty plea before the United States Magistrate Judge as to Jose Alredo Campos-Lara. Signed by Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (mgr)
GPO Jan 29 2025
ORDER accepting re 22 Findings of Fact on Plea as to Jose Alredo Campos-Lara. Guilty plea accepted. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (mgr)

Docket last updated: 11/24/2024 2:45 AM CST
Monday, November 04, 2024
Arrest of Jose Alfredo Campos-Lara (vs1) [5:24-mj-01539-RBF]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer as to Jose Alfredo Campos-Lara. (vs1) [5:24-mj-01539-RBF]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Jose Alfredo Campos-Lara. (vs1) [5:24-mj-01539-RBF]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard B. Farrer:Initial Appearance as to Jose Alfredo Campos-Lara held on 11/5/2024. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Jose Alfredo Campos-Lara (Court Reporter FTR GOLD.) (rqr) [5:24-mj-01539-RBF]
Related: [-]
4 4 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jose Alfredo Campos-Lara (SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002). (rqr) [5:24-mj-01539-RBF]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Mario A. Trevino for Jose Alfredo Campos-Lara appointed. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (rqr) [5:24-mj-01539-RBF]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: as to Jose Alfredo Campos-Lara. Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 11/8/2024 10:00 AM before Judge Richard B. Farrer.. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (rqr) [5:24-mj-01539-RBF]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
7 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard B. Farrer:Detention Hearing as to Jose Alfredo Campos-Lara held on 11/8/2024. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) Preliminary Hearing as to Jose Alfredo Campos-Lara held on 11/8/2024. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Jose Alfredo Campos-Lara (Court Reporter FTR GOLD.) (rqr) [5:24-mj-01539-RBF]
Related: [-]
8 8 Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Jose Alfredo Campos-Lara. Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (rqr) [5:24-mj-01539-RBF]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER GRANTING2 Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond. as to Jose Alfredo Campos-Lara (1). Signed by Judge Richard B. Farrer. (rqr) [5:24-mj-01539-RBF]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
True Name of Defendant as to Jose Alredo Campos-Lara. True name of defendant is: Jose Alredo Campos-Lara, as reflected on the indictment. (rqr) [5:24-mj-01539-RBF]
Related: [-]
10 10 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Jose Alredo Campos-Lara (1) count(s) 1. (bot4)
Related: [-] dacted Version
12 12 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Jose Alredo Campos-Lara (bot4)
Related: [-]