Georgia Middle District Court
Case #: 5:24-cr-00065
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 23, 2024 2:19 AM EST
Defendant
JAMES MICHAEL WALKER (1)
Plaintiff
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
ROBERT D MCCULLERS
United States Attorney Office
contact info

GPO Dec 18 2024
ORDER granting 17 Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice. This case is continued to the March term of court in the MACON DIVISION as to JAMES MICHAEL WALKER (1). Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL on 12/18/2024. (rka)

Docket last updated: 11/23/2024 10:55 AM EST
Thursday, November 21, 2024
1 1 3 pgs INDICTMENT as to JAMES MICHAEL WALKER (1) count(s) 1. (rka)
Related: [-]