Texas Western District Court
Case #: 6:24-cr-00256
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 24, 2024 1:22 AM CST
Defendant
Luis Antonio Cuellar-Figueroa (1)
Represented By
Darren Obenoskey
Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Gregory S. Gloff
Assistant United States Attorney
contact info

GPO Dec 17 2024
FINDINGS OF FACT AND RECOMMENDATION on felony guilty plea before the United States Magistrate Judge as to Luis Antonio Cuellar-Figueroa. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (lad)
GPO Jan 03 2025
ORDER accepting re 22 Findings of Fact on Plea as to Luis Antonio Cuellar-Figueroa. Guilty plea accepted as to count 1. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)

Docket last updated: 11/24/2024 2:12 AM CST
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
Arrest of Luis Antonio Cuellar-Figueroa. (cap) [6:24-mj-00247-JCM]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske as to Luis Antonio Cuellar-Figueroa (1). (lad) [6:24-mj-00247-JCM]
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske as to Luis Antonio Cuellar-Figueroa. (lad) [6:24-mj-00247-JCM]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Initial Appearance as to Luis Antonio Cuellar-Figueroa held on 11/15/2024. Preliminary Hearing set for 11/21/2024 10:00 AM before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Defendant requests appointment of counsel. Defendant HAS completed the CJA23 financial affidavit and the Court will appoint counsel because: The defendant is indigent at this time. Attorney Darren Obenoskey for Luis Antonio Cuellar-Figueroa added. SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Luis Antonio Cuellar-Figueroa. Due Process Protections Act Warning given in Open Court as to Luis Antonio Cuellar-Figueroa. Order of Detention Pending Trial Issued. Court Advises defendant of right to notify consulate. Defendant wants the Consulate notified. Court requests that the U.S. Attorney's office notify the MEXICAN Consulate on the Defendant's behalf. ACTIVE IMMIGRATION DETAINER. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter FTR.) (cap) [6:24-mj-00247-JCM]
Related: [-]
4 4 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Luis Antonio Cuellar-Figueroa (SEALED pursuant to E- Government Act of 2002). (cap) [6:24-mj-00247-JCM]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Darren Obenoskey for Luis Antonio Cuellar-Figueroa appointed. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (cap) [6:24-mj-00247-JCM]
Related: [-]
6 6 Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Luis Antonio Cuellar-Figueroa. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (cap) [6:24-mj-00247-JCM]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER OF DETENTION: Bond set to No Bond as to Luis Antonio Cuellar-Figueroa. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (cap) [6:24-mj-00247-JCM]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY HEARING as to Luis Antonio Cuellar-Figueroa. Preliminary Hearing set for 11/21/2024 10:00 AM before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (cap) [6:24-mj-00247-JCM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
9 9 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 11/13/2024 as to Luis Antonio Cuellar-Figueroa. (cap) [6:24-mj-00247-JCM]
Related: [-]
10 10 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing by Luis Antonio Cuellar-Figueroa (Obenoskey, Darren) [6:24-mj-00247-JCM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
11 11 ORDER CANCELLING PRELIMINARY HEARING as to Luis Antonio Cuellar-Figueroa. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (lad) [6:24-mj-00247-JCM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
12 12 Information filed as to Luis Antonio Cuellar-Figueroa (1) count(s) 1. (cav)
Related: [-]
13 13 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Luis Antonio Cuellar-Figueroa (cav)
Related: [-]
14 14 WAIVER of Minimum Time to Trial by Luis Antonio Cuellar-Figueroa (cav)
Related: [-]