Kentucky Eastern District Court
Case #: 6:24-cr-00070
Case Filed:Oct 24, 2024
Last checked: Friday Dec 13, 2024 4:53 AM EST
Defendant
Kathy Baird (3)
Represented By
Hailey Scoville Bonham
Scoville-Bonham & Riley, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Jonathan Blevins (1)
Represented By
Christy J. Love
Love Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Jeffery Gray (4)
Represented By
Kathryn Ann Walton
Kathryn A. Walton PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Randy Lester (2)
Represented By
Gregory A. Ousley
Ousley & Wiese, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
William Samuel Dotson, AUSA
U.S. Attorney'S Office - London
contact info

GPO Mar 19 2025
ORDER as to Randy Lester re 94 Recommendation of Acceptance of Guilty Plea: 1. The Court ADOPTS DE94, ACCEPTS Dft's guilty plea, and ADJUDGES Dft guilty of Count One of the Indictment; 2. The Court will issue a separate sentencing order. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 3/19/2025. (APR) cc: COR,USM,USP
GPO Mar 21 2025
ORDER as to Jeffery Gray re 99 Recommendation of Acceptance of Guilty Plea: The Court ADOPTS DE99, ACCEPTS Dft's guilty plea, and ADJUDGES Dft guilty of Count One of the Indictment; 2. The Court will issue a separate sentencing order. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 3/21/2025. (APR) cc: COR,USM,USP
GPO Apr 08 2025
ORDER as to Jonathan Blevins re 122 Recommendation of Acceptance of Guilty Plea: 1. The Court ADOPTS DE122, ACCEPTS Dft's guilty plea, and ADJUDGES Dft guilty of Count One of the Indictment; 2. The Court provisionally FINDS that the property identified in the Indictment's Forfeiture Allegations, DE7 at 2-3 (the firearms and ammunition), is forfeitable. Dft has an interest in said property, and the Court preliminarily ADJUDGES Dft's interest in such property FORFEITED; and 3. The Court will issue a separate sentencing order. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 4/8/2025. (APR)cc: COR,USM,USP. Modified text on 4/8/2025 (APR).
GPO Apr 22 2025
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Kathy Baird: 1) Court ADOPTS 127, ACCEPTS Dft's GP and ADJUDGES Dft guilty of Count 1 of the Indictment; 2) Court will issue a separate sentencing order. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 4/22/25. (MRS) cc: COR,USM,USP

Docket last updated: 01/16/2025 1:17 PM EST
Monday, September 30, 2024
Conflict Check run. (MM) [6:24-mj-06100-HAI]
Related: [-]
CJA Case Assignment by Clerk: APPOINTED CJA Attorney Christy J. Love for Jonathan Blevins. cc: COR, USP, USM (MM) [6:24-mj-06100-HAI]
Related: [-]
CLERK'S VIRTUAL NOTICE re: HEARING SCHEDULE as to Jonathan Blevins cc: COR, USM, USP INITIAL APPEARANCE set for 10/1/2024 at 03:30 PM in LONDON before Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram.(MM) [6:24-mj-06100-HAI]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Jonathan Blevins (MM) [6:24-mj-06100-HAI]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jonathan Blevins (1). (MM) [6:24-mj-06100-HAI]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of ATF Special Agent Todd E. Tremaine
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
ORAL MOTION for Detention by USA as to Jonathan Blevins. (APR) [6:24-mj-06100-HAI]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION for General Continuance of Detention Hearing as to Jonathan Blevins. (APR) [6:24-mj-06100-HAI]
Related: [-]
CJA Appointment of Attorney for Jonathan Blevins. The Clerk ENTERED the representation and appointment in the eVoucher system for Christy J. Love. (APR) [6:24-mj-06100-HAI]
Related: [-]
4 4 ARREST WARRANT Returned Executed on 9/30/2024 in case as to Jonathan Blevins. (APR) [6:24-mj-06100-HAI]
Related: [-]
5 5 MINUTE ENTRY FOR INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Jonathan Blevins held on 10/1/2024 before Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram: Christy Love appeared as APPOINTED CJA counsel of record. Dft, after being sworn, competently, knowingly, voluntarily and intelligently waived his right to a preliminary hearing. US made an oral motion for detention of Dft, and counsel for Dft requested a continuance of the detention hearing. US' oral motion for detention is GRANTED, w/o prejudice of the Dft's right to have a full de novo hearing. Dft's oral motion for a general continuance is GRANTED. The court reminds the government of its obligations under Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963). The government is ordered to comply w/ Brady and its progeny. The Court appoints Christy Love as counsel for Dft under the CJA. Dft advised of Constitutional Rights, pursuant to Rule 5(d). Dft advised of the nature of charges and possible penalties. USPO directed to prepare and circulate the Pretrial Services Report to counsel via email. Dft remanded to USM custody. (Tape #KYED-LON_6-24-MJ-6100-1-HAI_20241001_151917.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram. (APR) cc: COR,USM,USP [6:24-mj-06100-HAI]
Related: [-]
6 6 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jonathan Blevins (APR) [6:24-mj-06100-HAI]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
Case sealed as to Jonathan Blevins, Randy Lester, Kathy Baird, Jeffery Gray (KJA)
Related: [-]
7 7 4 pgs INDICTMENT returned in open court as to Jonathan Blevins (1) count(s) 1, 2, Randy Lester (2) count(s) 1, Kathy Baird (3) count(s) 1, Jeffery Gray (4) count(s) 1. **FORFEITURE ALLEGATIONS not counted statistically or listed on docket sheet. (KJA)
Related: [-]
8 8 SEALED UNREDACTED Indictment re7 Indictment by USA as to Jonathan Blevins, Randy Lester, Kathy Baird, Jeffery Gray (KJA)
Related: [-]
9 9 SEALED MOTION to Seal Case filed by USA re Jonathan Blevins, Randy Lester, Kathy Baird, Jeffery Gray. (KJA)
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER: granting9 Motion to Seal Case as to Jonathan Blevins (1), Randy Lester (2), Kathy Baird (3), Jeffery Gray (4). service via U.S. Mail to filing attorney only . Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 10/24/2024. (KJA)
Related: [-]
11 11 MOTION for Arrest Warrant by USA as to Randy Lester, Kathy Baird, Jeffery Gray. Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram. (KJA)
Related: [-]
16 16 MOTION for Arraignment by USA as to Jonathan Blevins. Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram. (KJA)
Related: [-]
17 17 ORDER: granting16 Motion for Arraignment as to Jonathan Blevins (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 10/24/2024. (KJA) cc: COR service via U.S. mail filing attorney
Related: [-]
18 18 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by USA as to Randy Lester. Motions referred to Hanly A. Ingram. (KJA)
Related: [-]
19 19 ORDER: granting18 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum as to Randy Lester (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 10/24/2024. (KJA)cc: COR,USM,USP
Related: [-]
21 21 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER as to Jonathan Blevins, Randy Lester, Kathy Baird, Jeffery Gray: 1. Mag Judge determine any pre-trial matter that does not dispose of a charge or defense; 2. Mag Judge make recommended disposition concerning any pretrial matter that disposes of a charge or defense, including but not limited to any motion specifically listed in Rule 59(b); 3. Court excepts from this referral, and retains for initial referral, any Motions to Alter the Trial Date and motions in limine . Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 06/18/2018. (KJA)cc: COR,USM,USP
Related: [-]