Connecticut Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Albert S Dabrowski
Case #: 2:08-bk-21418
Case Filed:Jul 25, 2008
Discharged:Apr 08, 2010
Terminated:Apr 21, 2010
Creditor
Bristol, City of
Creditor
First Bristol Federal Credit Union
Creditor
GE Money Bank
Creditor
Middlebury Equity Partners, LLC
Debtor
Mary Ellen Zoppo
Debtor
Michael Carmen Zoppo
Trustee
Molly T. Whiton
Trustee
Thomas C. Boscarino
U.S. Trustee
U. S. Trustee

GPO Mar 25 2009
Memorandum Order Signed on 3/25/2009 Granting (RE: 34 Motion to Determine Claim Status filed by Creditor Middlebury Equity Partners, LLC). (Leible, Beverly)
GPO Apr 30 2009
Memorandum Order Denying Signed on 4/30/2009 (RE: 59 Motion To Stay Pending Appeal filed by Debtor Michael Carmen Zoppo, Debtor Mary Ellen Zoppo). (Blanchard, Christine)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.