Pennsylvania Western District Court
Case #: 2:24-mj-01794
Case Filed:Oct 25, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 24, 2024 2:55 AM EST
Defendant
MOHAMAD HAMAD (1)
Represented By
Yemi Olaiya
Office Of The Federal Public Defender For The Western Distri
contact info
Defendant
TALYA A LUBIT (2)
Represented By
Frank C. Walker
Frank Walker Law
contact info
William C. Kaczynski
William C. Kaczynski, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Carolyn J. Bloch
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/24/2024 4:19 AM EST
Friday, October 25, 2024
Judge update in case as to MOHAMAD HAMAD. Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly added. (rtm)
Related: [-]
Judge update in case as to TALYA A LUBIT. Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly added. (rtm)
Related: [-]
1 1 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to MOHAMAD HAMAD, TALYA A LUBIT. (Bloch, Carolyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
2 2 COMPLAINT (Bloch, Carolyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
3 3 MOTION for Arrest Warrant by USA as to MOHAMAD HAMAD, TALYA A LUBIT. (Bloch, Carolyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Proposed Warrant HAMAD, Defendant 1,
Att: 3 Proposed Warrant LUBIT, Defendant 2
4 4 Errata re2 Complaint, Affidavit by USA as to MOHAMAD HAMAD, TALYA A LUBIT Reason for correction: Errata to Affidavit only. Minor clarifying edits made to page 12, paragraph d and page 15, footnote 4. (Bloch, Carolyn)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER granting1 Motion to Seal Case as to MOHAMAD HAMAD (1), TALYA A LUBIT (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 10/25/2024. (mpg)
Related: [-]
6 6 SIGNED COMPLAINT as to MOHAMAD HAMAD, TALYA A LUBIT. (mpg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 SIGNED Affidavit
7 7 ORDER granting3 Motion for Warrant as to MOHAMAD HAMAD (1), TALYA A LUBIT (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 10/25/2024. (mpg)
Related: [-]