Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-04448
Case Filed:Oct 25, 2024
Terminated:Nov 20, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 24, 2024 2:05 AM CST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Patricia Aguayo
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Wilver Noe Gonzalez De Ramos (1)
Terminated: 11/20/2024
Represented By
Andrew Lafayette Steed
Federal Public Defender
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/24/2024 3:35 AM CST
Thursday, October 24, 2024
Arrest of Wilver Noe Gonzalez De Ramos (ll)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: NO BOND SET as to Wilver Noe Gonzalez De Ramos by Judge Anne T. Berton. (ll)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton as to Wilver Noe Gonzalez De Ramos. (ll)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Wilver Noe Gonzalez De Ramos. (ll)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton. (ll)
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Anne T. Berton:Initial Appearance in person as to Wilver Noe Gonzalez De Ramos held on 10/25/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter required (L. Quevedo) as to Wilver Noe Gonzalez De Ramos (Court Reporter ERO.) (ll)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER SETTING HEARING IN PERSON as to Wilver Noe Gonzalez De Ramos, (Detention Hearing set for 10/30/2024 02:00 PM in El Paso before Judge Anne T. Berton, Preliminary Hearing set for 10/30/2024 02:00 PM in El Paso before Judge Anne T. Berton), Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Wilver Noe Gonzalez De Ramos. Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton. (ll)
Related: [-]