Massachusetts District Court
Judge:William G Young
Case #: 1:24-cv-12927
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Nov 25, 2024
Terminated:Mar 25, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Jan 11, 2025 6:13 AM EST
Defendant
U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Defendant
US Department of Homeland Security
Plaintiff
Swamidoss Joseph Ravichandran
Represented By
Nneka Oni Jackson
The Law Offices Of Nneka Jackson
contact info
Jennifer Carmen Bade
Bade Law Group, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 03/25 12:04 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Swamidoss Joseph Ravichandran (Jackson, Nneka)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/19 4:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Sady on behalf of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, US Department of Homeland Security (Sady, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/22 4:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nneka Oni Jackson on behalf of Swamidoss Joseph Ravichandran (Jackson, Nneka)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
8 8 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Fri 01/10 10:30 AM
Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Nneka Oni Jackson. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must have an individual PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of Massachusetts. To register for a PACER account, go the Pacer website at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/register-account. You must put the docket number under ADDITIONAL FILER INFORMATION on your form when registering or it will be rejected. Pro Hac Vice Admission Request Instructions [LINK:https://www.mad.uscourts.gov/caseinfo/nextgen-pro-hac-vice.htm] . A Notice of Appearance must be entered on the docket by the newly admitted attorney. (JEG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/18 5:17 PM
First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Nneka Oni Jackson Filing fee: $ 125, receipt number AMADC-10754887 by Swamidoss Joseph Ravichandran.(Bade, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 11/26 10:05 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Barbosa, Nilsa)
Related: [-]
5 5 order General Order 19-02 Tue 11/26 9:40 AM
General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c). (McDonagh, Christina)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
4 4 notice Notice for Social Security and Immigration Cases Mon 11/25 2:54 PM
Online access to documents in this case is limited to counsel of record only. All documents are available for review in the Office of the Clerk. Counsel of record: please note that you will need to log into CM/ECF to access any documents in this case. (Paine, Matthew)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Case Assignment Mon 11/25 1:17 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Horvath, Courtney)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice - Other Mon 11/25 12:45 PM
NOTICE by Swamidoss Joseph Ravichandran ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format a Local Category Form. The form can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents- Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet. (Barbosa, Nilsa)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/25 11:44 AM
WRIT OF MANDAMUS AND COMPLAINT SWAMIDOSS JOSEPH RAVICHANDRAN against U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (USCIS), U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (DHS) Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10713719 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Swamidoss Joseph Ravichandran.(Bade, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit writ exhibits