Kentucky Eastern District Court
Judge:Hanly A Ingram
Referred: Hanly A Ingram
Case #: 6:24-cv-00170
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101et seq. - Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Nov 22, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday May 21, 2025 4:26 AM EDT
Defendant
Shanker, LLC
Represented By
Matthew David Ellison
Fowler Bell PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Maria Evens
Represented By
Larry Corban Polk
Thompson Legal LLC
contact info
Robert L. Thompson
Thompson Legal LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
John Doe Corporation
Terminated: 01/24/2025
Defendant
Super 8 by Wyndham Somerset
Terminated: 01/24/2025
Defendant
Wyndham Hotel Management, Inc.
Terminated: 01/24/2025


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, May 23, 2025
23 23 notice Notice of Filing Fri 05/23 1:29 PM
NOTICE OF FILING by Shanker, LLC(Ellison, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Subpoena to be served upon Jaye Ambe Somerset, Inc dba Red Roof Inn of Somerset
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
utility File Submitted Wed 05/14 11:16 AM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram for review:22 Answer to Second Amended Complaint (APR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
22 22 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 05/13 2:00 PM
ANSWER to21 Amended Complaint by Shanker, LLC.(Ellison, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
21 21 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 04/30 2:38 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Shanker, LLC, filed by Maria Evens. Filed pursuant to20 Order. (APR)
Related: [-]
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Wed 04/30 2:33 PM
ORDER: granting17 Motion to Amend/Correct. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file the proposed amended complaint (D.E.17 -2) as its own docket entry. Defendant SHALL respond on or before May 14, 2025, as required by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 4/30/2025. (APR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
19 19 respm Response to Motion Tue 04/29 11:25 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re17 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Maria Evens filed by Shanker, LLC. (Ellison, Matthew)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Submitted Tue 04/29 11:48 AM
***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram for review: re17 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Maria Evens (APR)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order Fri 04/25 1:17 PM
ORDER re17 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Maria Evens: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Defendant SHALL RESPOND to the motion (D.E.17 ) on or before April 30, 2025. The response shall address whether Defendant consents to the amendment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 4/25/2025. (APR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
17 17 motion Amend/Correct Tue 04/22 2:53 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct by Maria Evens(Polk, Larry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Attachment Second Amended Complaint
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
16 16 order Scheduling Order Deadline Wed 03/26 2:49 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: 1. The parties shall exchange initial Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by 4/21/2025 . 2. The parties shall have until 5/31/2025 to join additional parties. The parties shall have until 6/30/2025 to amend their pleadings. 3. All fact discovery shall be completed on or before 12/31/2025 . All expert discovery shall be completed by 5/15/2026 . 4. NLT 1/31/2026 , Plaintiffs disclose expert witnesses. These disclosures need not be filed in the Court record. Defendants shall do same by 3/15/2026 . 5. NLT 6/14/2026 , counsel for the parties shall file all dispositive motions. Response and Response and reply time shall be governed by local rule. 6. TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE set for 8/15/2025 at 11:00 AM , The call will be off the record and for counsel only. The call will be held over Microsoft Teams and the phone number and conference ID will be provided closer to the date of the meeting. 7. The Court declines at this time to schedule a pretrial conference, trial, or deadlines for related filings. 8. Modification of this schedule is disfavored and will only occur under Rule 16 and/or Rule 6. 9. Other than the agreed-upon discovery limits within the parties' Rule 26(f) report, the default limits within the discovery rules apply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 3/26/2025. (APR)
Related: [-]
misc Conflict Check Wed 03/26 2:32 PM
Conflict Check run. (APR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Tue 03/25 11:41 AM
ORDER: The parties consent to having a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings. See DE13 . Thus, the Court ORDERS that this case be referred to United States Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram for all purposes, to conduct all proceedings, and, as warranted, to order the entry of a final judgment. Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 03/25/2025.(KJA)
Related: [-]
utility File Submitted Tue 03/25 11:43 AM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Hanly A. Ingram for review:14 Order, Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (KJA)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
13 13 notice Other Notice Mon 03/24 2:10 PM
NOTICE by Shanker, LLC, Maria Evens CONSENT AND REFERENCE OF A CIVIL ACTION TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Ellison, Matthew) Modified text and added filer on 3/24/2025 (APR)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 03/24 1:57 PM
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Ellison, Matthew)
Related: [-]
utility File Submitted Mon 03/24 3:15 PM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Robert E. Wier for review:13 Notice by Shanker, LLC, Maria Evens CONSENT AND REFERENCE OF A CIVIL ACTION TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE (APR)
Related: [-]
utility File Submitted Mon 03/24 3:15 PM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram for review:12 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (APR)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
11 11 2 pgs order Order For Meeting and Report Fri 02/21 1:40 PM
ORDER FOR MEETING & REPORT: (1) W/in 21 days , the parties, by counsel, shall meet, either in person or by telephone, to consider the topics Rule 26(f)(2) mandates. (2) W/in 14 days of the meeting, the parties shall file a joint status report containing: a - e. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram on 2/21/2025.(APR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
notice Notice of Docket Modification Fri 02/21 11:33 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re10 Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 ; Error: incorrect filing date; Entry by docket clerk; Correction: Modified date filed from 2/21/2025 to 2/20/2025; No action required from counsel. cc: COR (APR)
Related: [-]
utility File Submitted Fri 02/21 11:34 AM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram for review:9 Answer to Amended Complaint (APR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
10 10 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Fri 02/21 11:30 AM
FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shanker, LLC. Filed as attachment to Answer at DE9 . (APR) Modified filing date on 2/21/2025 (APR)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 02/20 3:49 PM
ANSWER to5 Amended Complaint by Shanker, LLC.(Ellison, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment 7.1 Disclosure Statement
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued/Reissued Wed 01/29 3:48 PM
Summons Issued as to Shanker, LLC and returned to counsel electronically for service. (APR)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Filing Wed 01/29 12:38 PM
NOTICE OF FILING by Maria Evens(Thompson, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
misc Clerk's Note Tue 01/28 3:29 PM
Clerk's Note: The Clerk notes an Amended Complaint was filed; however, a summons was not provided to the Clerk for issuance. If you desire summons to be issued, the forms are available on the Courts website, www.kyed.uscourts.gov. A summons may be issued by presenting the prepared summons to the Clerk for issuance on paper or by electronically filing a Notice of Filing with the prepared summons as an attachment within 7 calendar days . (APR)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
6 6 respoth Notice of Appearance Mon 01/27 11:47 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maria Evens. (Thompson, Robert)
Related: [-]
utility File Submitted Mon 01/27 12:07 PM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge Hanly A. Ingram for review:5 Amended Complaint (APR)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 01/24 9:49 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Maria Evens.(Thompson, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
4 4 order REW Standing Case Management and Referral Order Mon 11/25 10:09 AM
STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT AND REFERRAL ORDER: 1. At the outset, the Court reminds the parties that, under Rule 1, they share with the Court the duty to construe, administer, and employ the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of this action; 2. Pursuant to 28:636(b)(1) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court refers this case to the appropriate United States Magistrate Judge for this Division; 3. Unless otherwise ordered, the Court retains for decision any motion dispositive of a claim or defense (as well as motions regulating the trial proof, including Daubert and motions in limine); 4. Concurrent with the filing of any Rule 12 motion, the moving party may file, as a separate motion, any request for a discovery stay pending resolution. The Court refers consideration of any such motion to the assigned Magistrate Judge; 5. Discovery Disputes shall be resolved as defined within this order; The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to enter this Standing Order in the undersigned's civil cases excepting Social Security, pro se, and prisoner post-conviction matters at case opening (or as the Court otherwise directs). Signed by Judge Robert E. Wier on 11/13/2019.(JCP)
Related: [-]
misc Conflict Check Mon 11/25 10:07 AM
Conflict Check run. (JCP)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued/Reissued Mon 11/25 10:06 AM
Summons Issued as to Super 8 by Wyndham Somerset, Wyndham Hotel Management, Inc. and returned to counsel electronically for service. (JCP)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 11/25 10:00 AM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $405; receipt number AKYEDC-5978849), filed by Maria Evens.(JCP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Super 8 by Wyndham Somerset,
Att: 3 Summons Wyndham Hotel Managment, Inc.,
Att: 4 Summons John Doe Corp.