Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert W Schroeder, III
Case #: 5:24-cv-00168
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Nov 25, 2024
Last checked: Saturday May 24, 2025 4:12 AM CDT
Counter Claimant
Fossil Group, Inc.
Represented By
Neil J McNabnay
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Sarika Naresh Patel
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Ricardo Joel Bonilla
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Counter Defendant
Andra Group, LP
Represented By
Karl Anthony Rupp
Sorey & Hoover LLP
contact info
Nicholas Andrew Wyss
Nix Patterson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Fossil Group, Inc.
Represented By
Neil J McNabnay
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Sarika Naresh Patel
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Ricardo Joel Bonilla
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Plaintiff
Andra Group, LP
Represented By
Karl Anthony Rupp
Sorey & Hoover LLP
contact info
Nicholas Andrew Wyss
Nix Patterson LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
20 20 respm Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion Wed 02/26 11:54 AM
SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response re11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Andra Group, LP . (Rupp, Karl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
19 19 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 02/19 4:10 PM
REPLY to Response re11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Fossil Group, Inc. . (Bonilla, Ricardo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 02/13 10:16 AM
ORDER Before the Court is Defendant's unopposed motion for an extension of time to file its reply in support of its motion to dismiss (Docket No.11 ). Docket No.17 . After review, it is ORDERED that the motion (Docket No.17 ) is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant's deadline to file its reply in support of its motion to dismiss is extended to Wednesday, February 19, 2025. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 2/13/2025. (psm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 02/11 4:56 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Fossil Group, Inc..(Bonilla, Ricardo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, February 10, 2025
16 16 answer Answer to Counterclaim Mon 02/10 11:49 AM
ANSWER to12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Andra Group, LP.(Rupp, Karl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
15 15 respm Response to Motion Wed 02/05 3:30 PM
RESPONSE re11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Andra Group, LP .(Rupp, Karl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, January 30, 2025
14 14 3 pgs order Order Thu 01/30 2:04 PM
CONSOLIDATION ORDER. It is ORDERED that the above-styled cases are consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action (5:24-cv-00131) shall serve as the lead case for the consolidated issues. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 1/30/2025. (slo)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Thu 01/30 3:23 PM
*All future pretrial filings, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the lead case. (Case No. 5:24-CV-131)* (slo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
13 13 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Wed 01/22 5:17 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Fossil Group, Inc. (Bonilla, Ricardo)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Wed 01/22 5:16 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and , COUNTERCLAIM against Andra Group, LP by Fossil Group, Inc..(Bonilla, Ricardo)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Dismiss Wed 01/22 5:15 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Fossil Group, Inc..(Bonilla, Ricardo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
10 10 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 01/22 5:00 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sarika Naresh Patel on behalf of Fossil Group, Inc. (Patel, Sarika)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 01/22 4:57 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ricardo Joel Bonilla on behalf of Fossil Group, Inc. (Bonilla, Ricardo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
8 8 text Clerk's Entry re Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Thu 12/05 11:09 AM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted. Fossil Group, Inc. answer is now due 1/22/2025. (Text entry only, no document attached.)(slo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
7 7 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Wed 12/04 4:12 PM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by Fossil Group, Inc.. Summons originally served on 12/02/2024. Agreed new answer date is 01/22/2025.(McNabnay, Neil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 12/03 4:11 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andra Group, LP. Fossil Group, Inc. served on 12/2/2024. (Rupp, Karl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 11/26 4:05 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas Andrew Wyss on behalf of Andra Group, LP (Wyss, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 11/26 3:16 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Fossil Group, Inc. (slo)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Tue 11/26 10:12 AM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Andra Group, LP (Rupp, Karl)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
2 2 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Mon 11/25 2:02 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rupp, Karl)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 11/25 2:00 PM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Fossil Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10516483.), filed by Andra Group, LP.(Rupp, Karl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - '498 Patent,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Garlick Report,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Claim Chart
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 11/25 2:50 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (slo)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Mon 11/25 2:50 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (slo)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Mon 11/25 2:51 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury. (slo)
Related: [-]