Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert W Schroeder, III
Case #: 5:24-cv-00170
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Nov 25, 2024
Last checked: Saturday May 24, 2025 4:13 AM CDT
Defendant
Advance Auto Parts, Inc.
Represented By
Nicholas G Papastavros
Dla Piper Llp - Boston
contact info
Defendant
Advance Stores Company, Inc.
Represented By
Nicholas G Papastavros
Dla Piper Llp - Boston
contact info
Plaintiff
Fall Line Patents, LLC
Represented By
Matthew J Antonelli
Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP
contact info
Rehan Mohammed Safiullah
Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP
contact info
Larry Dean Thompson, Jr
Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP
contact info
Zachariah Harrington
Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
22 22 2 pgs order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Wed 04/02 4:23 PM
ORDER Setting Hearing on Motions: (12 in 5:24-cv-00167-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, (13 in 5:24-cv-00170-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6), (19 in 5:24-cv-00172-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss, (21 in 5:24-cv-00174-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, (17 in 5:24-cv-00182-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss. Motions Hearing set for 5/7/2025 at 02:00 PM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 4/2/2025. Associated Cases: 5:24-cv-00167-RWS, 5:24-cv-00170-RWS, 5:24-cv-00172-RWS, 5:24-cv-00174-RWS, 5:24-cv-00182-RWS (slo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
21 21 respm Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion Thu 03/13 1:13 PM
SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response re13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Fall Line Patents, LLC . (Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
20 20 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 03/12 4:09 PM
ORDER Before the Court is Plaintiff Fall Line Patents, LLC and Defendants Chili's, Inc. and Brinker International, Inc.'s (collectively "Chili's") Joint Motion to Dismiss the Chili's Defendants Only. Docket No. 56 . In the joint motion, Plaintiff and Chili's seek to dismiss with prejudice all claims against each other with each party bearing its own attorneys' fees and costs. Id. After review, the joint motion (Docket No. 56 ) is GRANTED. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that all claims made by Plaintiff and Chili's against each other in the above-captioned actions are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/12/2025. Associated Cases: 5:24-cv-00167-RWS, 5:24-cv-00089-RWS, 5:24-cv-00090-RWS, 5:24-cv-00091-RWS, 5:24-cv-00092-RWS, 5:24-cv-00094-RWS, 5:24-cv-00095-RWS, 5:24-cv-00096-RWS, 5:24-cv-00169-RWS, 5:24-cv-00170-RWS, 5:24-cv-00172-RWS, 5:24-cv-00173-RWS, 5:24-cv-00174-RWS, 5:24-cv-00175-RWS, 5:24-cv-00176-RWS, 5:24-cv-00177-RWS, 5:24-cv-00178-RWS, 5:24-cv-00179-RWS, 5:24-cv-00180-RWS, 5:24-cv-00181-RWS, 5:24-cv-00182-RWS(psm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
19 19 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 03/06 5:12 PM
REPLY to Response re13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Advance Auto Parts, Inc., Advance Stores Company, Inc. .(Papastavros, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Papastavros Decl.,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 02/26 2:45 PM
ORDER granting17 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6). It is ORDERED that the deadline for Defendants to file a reply to their motion to dismiss is extended to March 6, 2025. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 2/26/2025. (slo)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 02/24 3:13 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Advance Auto Parts, Inc., Advance Stores Company, Inc..(Papastavros, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, February 20, 2025
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 02/20 4:00 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re13 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Fall Line Patents, LLC .(Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
15 15 4 pgs order Order Wed 02/12 3:52 PM
CONSOLIDATION ORDER. The Court ORDERS that the above-styled cases are consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action (5:24-cv 00167) shall serve as the lead case for the consolidated issues. All future pretrial filings, other than venue motions,shall be filed in the lead case. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 2/12/2025. (slo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference Tue 02/11 6:23 PM
NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Fall Line Patents, LLC (Safiullah, Rehan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
13 13 motion Dismiss Thu 02/06 7:06 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Advance Auto Parts, Inc., Advance Stores Company, Inc..(Papastavros, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
12 12 text Clerk's Entry re Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Wed 12/18 11:37 AM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted. Advance Auto Parts, Inc. answer is now due 2/6/2025; Advance Stores Company, Inc. answer is now due 2/6/2025. (slo)
Related: [-]
11 11 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Wed 12/18 10:58 AM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by Advance Auto Parts, Inc., Advance Stores Company, Inc.. Summons originally served on 12/2/2024. Agreed new answer date is 2/6/2025.(Papastavros, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 12/12 10:36 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fall Line Patents, LLC. Advance Stores Company, Inc. served on 12/2/2024. (Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 12/12 10:35 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fall Line Patents, LLC. Advance Auto Parts, Inc. served on 12/2/2024. (Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Mon 12/02 2:56 PM
NOTICE of Related Cases by Fall Line Patents, LLC (Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
7 7 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Wed 11/27 11:27 AM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Fall Line Patents, LLC (Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 11/26 5:44 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rehan Mohammed Safiullah on behalf of Fall Line Patents, LLC (Safiullah, Rehan)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 11/26 5:29 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zachariah Harrington on behalf of Fall Line Patents, LLC (Harrington, Zachariah)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 11/26 5:11 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Larry Dean Thompson, Jr on behalf of Fall Line Patents, LLC (Thompson, Larry)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 11/26 3:35 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Advance Auto Parts, Inc., Advance Stores Company, Inc.(slo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons-Advance Stores Company Inc.
Monday, November 25, 2024
2 2 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Mon 11/25 2:12 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 11/25 2:11 PM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Advance Auto Parts, Inc., Advance Stores Company, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10516554.), filed by Fall Line Patents, LLC.(Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 11/25 3:12 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (slo)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Mon 11/25 3:12 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (slo)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Mon 11/25 3:13 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury. (slo)
Related: [-]