Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert W Schroeder, III
Case #: 5:24-cv-00172
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Nov 25, 2024
Last checked: Saturday May 24, 2025 4:13 AM CDT
Defendant
ALDI (Texas) L.L.C.
Represented By
Michael Charles Smith
Scheef & Stone, Llp - Marshall
contact info
Chunhsi Andy Mu
Banner & Witcoff, Ltd
contact info
J Thad Heartfield
The Heartfield Law Firm
contact info
John R Hutchins
Banner & Witcoff, Ltd
contact info
Paul T Qualey
Banner & Witcoff, Ltd
contact info
Defendant
ALDI Inc.
Represented By
Michael Charles Smith
Scheef & Stone, Llp - Marshall
contact info
Chunhsi Andy Mu
Banner & Witcoff, Ltd
contact info
John R Hutchins
Banner & Witcoff, Ltd
contact info
Paul T Qualey
Banner & Witcoff, Ltd
contact info
Plaintiff
Fall Line Patents, LLC
Represented By
Matthew J Antonelli
Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP
contact info
Zachariah Harrington
Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP
contact info
Larry Dean Thompson, Jr
Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP
contact info
Rehan Mohammed Safiullah
Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
30 30 motion Change Venue Wed 04/02 4:46 PM
OPPOSED MOTION to Change Venue by ALDI Inc., ALDI (Texas) L.L.C..(Hutchins, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14,
Att: 15 Proposed Order Granting Motion
29 29 2 pgs order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Wed 04/02 4:23 PM
ORDER Setting Hearing on Motions: (12 in 5:24-cv-00167-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, (13 in 5:24-cv-00170-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6), (19 in 5:24-cv-00172-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss, (21 in 5:24-cv-00174-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, (17 in 5:24-cv-00182-RWS) MOTION to Dismiss. Motions Hearing set for 5/7/2025 at 02:00 PM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 4/2/2025. Associated Cases: 5:24-cv-00167-RWS, 5:24-cv-00170-RWS, 5:24-cv-00172-RWS, 5:24-cv-00174-RWS, 5:24-cv-00182-RWS (slo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
28 28 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 03/12 4:09 PM
ORDER Before the Court is Plaintiff Fall Line Patents, LLC and Defendants Chili's, Inc. and Brinker International, Inc.'s (collectively "Chili's") Joint Motion to Dismiss the Chili's Defendants Only. Docket No. 56 . In the joint motion, Plaintiff and Chili's seek to dismiss with prejudice all claims against each other with each party bearing its own attorneys' fees and costs. Id. After review, the joint motion (Docket No. 56 ) is GRANTED. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that all claims made by Plaintiff and Chili's against each other in the above-captioned actions are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/12/2025. Associated Cases: 5:24-cv-00167-RWS, 5:24-cv-00089-RWS, 5:24-cv-00090-RWS, 5:24-cv-00091-RWS, 5:24-cv-00092-RWS, 5:24-cv-00094-RWS, 5:24-cv-00095-RWS, 5:24-cv-00096-RWS, 5:24-cv-00169-RWS, 5:24-cv-00170-RWS, 5:24-cv-00172-RWS, 5:24-cv-00173-RWS, 5:24-cv-00174-RWS, 5:24-cv-00175-RWS, 5:24-cv-00176-RWS, 5:24-cv-00177-RWS, 5:24-cv-00178-RWS, 5:24-cv-00179-RWS, 5:24-cv-00180-RWS, 5:24-cv-00181-RWS, 5:24-cv-00182-RWS(psm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
27 27 respm Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion Thu 03/06 4:52 PM
SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response re19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Fall Line Patents, LLC . (Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
26 26 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 02/27 4:41 PM
REPLY to Response re19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ALDI Inc., ALDI (Texas) L.L.C. . (Hutchins, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
25 25 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 02/20 4:03 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re19 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Fall Line Patents, LLC .(Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
24 24 4 pgs order Order Wed 02/12 3:52 PM
CONSOLIDATION ORDER. The Court ORDERS that the above-styled cases are consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action (5:24-cv 00167) shall serve as the lead case for the consolidated issues. All future pretrial filings, other than venue motions,shall be filed in the lead case. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 2/12/2025. (slo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
23 23 notice Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference Tue 02/11 6:25 PM
NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Fall Line Patents, LLC (Safiullah, Rehan)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/11 5:36 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Chunhsi Andy Mu on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-10671393. (Mu, Chunhsi)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/11 3:22 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Paul T Qualey on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-10670858. (Qualey, Paul)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/11 3:16 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by John R Hutchins on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-10670789. (Hutchins, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
19 19 motion Dismiss Mon 02/10 3:07 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by ALDI Inc., ALDI (Texas) L.L.C..(Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
18 18 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Mon 02/10 2:57 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by ALDI (Texas) L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent Aldi Inc. for ALDI (Texas) L.L.C.. (Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Mon 02/10 2:52 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by ALDI Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ALDI Sud KG for ALDI Inc.. (Smith, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 02/06 12:09 PM
ORDER granting15 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Original Complaint. ALDI (Texas) L.L.C. answer due 2/10/2025; ALDI Inc. answer due 2/10/2025. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 2/6/2025. (slo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 02/05 4:12 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Original Complaint by ALDI Inc., ALDI (Texas) L.L.C..(Heartfield, J)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
14 14 text Clerk's Entry re Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Wed 12/18 4:47 PM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted. ALDI (Texas) L.L.C. answer is now due 2/6/2025. (slo)
Related: [-]
13 13 text Clerk's Entry re Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Wed 12/18 4:46 PM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted. ALDI Inc. answer is now due 2/6/2025. (slo)
Related: [-]
12 12 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Wed 12/18 4:28 PM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by ALDI (Texas) L.L.C.. Summons originally served on 12/23/2024. Agreed new answer date is 02/06/2025.(Heartfield, J)
Related: [-]
11 11 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Wed 12/18 4:26 PM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by ALDI Inc.. Summons originally served on 12/23/2024. Agreed new answer date is 02/06/2025.(Heartfield, J)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 12/12 10:51 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fall Line Patents, LLC. ALDI Inc. served on 12/2/2024. (Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 12/12 10:50 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fall Line Patents, LLC. ALDI (Texas) L.L.C. served on 12/2/2024. (Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Mon 12/02 2:57 PM
NOTICE of Related Cases by Fall Line Patents, LLC (Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
7 7 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Wed 11/27 11:29 AM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Fall Line Patents, LLC (Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 11/26 5:45 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rehan Mohammed Safiullah on behalf of Fall Line Patents, LLC (Safiullah, Rehan)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 11/26 5:30 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zachariah Harrington on behalf of Fall Line Patents, LLC (Harrington, Zachariah)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 11/26 5:12 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Larry Dean Thompson, Jr on behalf of Fall Line Patents, LLC (Thompson, Larry)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 11/26 3:39 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to ALDI (Texas) L.L.C., ALDI Inc..(slo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons-ALDI (Texas) LLC
Monday, November 25, 2024
2 2 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Mon 11/25 2:25 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 11/25 2:24 PM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against ALDI (Texas) L.L.C., ALDI Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10516662.), filed by Fall Line Patents, LLC.(Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 11/25 3:29 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (slo)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Mon 11/25 3:30 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (slo)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Mon 11/25 3:30 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury. (slo)
Related: [-]