Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert W Schroeder, III
Case #: 5:24-cv-00173
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Nov 25, 2024
Last checked: Saturday May 24, 2025 4:14 AM CDT
Counter Claimant
AutoZone, Inc.
Represented By
Jennifer Haltom Doan
Haltom & Doan
contact info
Haleigh Ann Hashem
Haltom & Doan
contact info
Counter Defendant
Fall Line Patents, LLC
Represented By
Zachariah Harrington
Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP
contact info
Larry Dean Thompson, Jr
Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP
contact info
Rehan Mohammed Safiullah
Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP
contact info
Matthew J Antonelli
Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP
contact info
Defendant
AutoZone, Inc.
Represented By
Jennifer Haltom Doan
Haltom & Doan
contact info
Haleigh Ann Hashem
Haltom & Doan
contact info
Plaintiff
Fall Line Patents, LLC
Represented By
Zachariah Harrington
Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP
contact info
Larry Dean Thompson, Jr
Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP
contact info
Rehan Mohammed Safiullah
Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP
contact info
Matthew J Antonelli
Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
18 18 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 03/12 4:09 PM
ORDER Before the Court is Plaintiff Fall Line Patents, LLC and Defendants Chili's, Inc. and Brinker International, Inc.'s (collectively "Chili's") Joint Motion to Dismiss the Chili's Defendants Only. Docket No. 56 . In the joint motion, Plaintiff and Chili's seek to dismiss with prejudice all claims against each other with each party bearing its own attorneys' fees and costs. Id. After review, the joint motion (Docket No. 56 ) is GRANTED. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that all claims made by Plaintiff and Chili's against each other in the above-captioned actions are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/12/2025. Associated Cases: 5:24-cv-00167-RWS, 5:24-cv-00089-RWS, 5:24-cv-00090-RWS, 5:24-cv-00091-RWS, 5:24-cv-00092-RWS, 5:24-cv-00094-RWS, 5:24-cv-00095-RWS, 5:24-cv-00096-RWS, 5:24-cv-00169-RWS, 5:24-cv-00170-RWS, 5:24-cv-00172-RWS, 5:24-cv-00173-RWS, 5:24-cv-00174-RWS, 5:24-cv-00175-RWS, 5:24-cv-00176-RWS, 5:24-cv-00177-RWS, 5:24-cv-00178-RWS, 5:24-cv-00179-RWS, 5:24-cv-00180-RWS, 5:24-cv-00181-RWS, 5:24-cv-00182-RWS(psm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
17 17 4 pgs order Order Wed 02/12 3:52 PM
CONSOLIDATION ORDER. The Court ORDERS that the above-styled cases are consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action (5:24-cv 00167) shall serve as the lead case for the consolidated issues. All future pretrial filings, other than venue motions,shall be filed in the lead case. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 2/12/2025. (slo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference Tue 02/11 6:26 PM
NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Fall Line Patents, LLC (Safiullah, Rehan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Thu 02/06 7:40 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Fall Line Patents, LLC by AutoZone, Inc..(Doan, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
14 14 text Clerk's Entry re Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Mon 12/16 2:35 PM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted. AutoZone, Inc. answer is now due 2/6/2025. (psm)
Related: [-]
13 13 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Mon 12/16 2:10 PM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by AutoZone, Inc.. Summons originally served on 12/2/2024. Agreed new answer date is 2/6/2025.(Doan, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 12/16 12:44 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Haleigh Ann Hashem on behalf of AutoZone, Inc. (Hashem, Haleigh)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 12/16 12:42 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Haltom Doan on behalf of AutoZone, Inc. (Doan, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 12/12 10:52 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fall Line Patents, LLC. AutoZone, Inc. served on 12/2/2024. (Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Mon 12/02 2:59 PM
NOTICE of Related Cases by Fall Line Patents, LLC (Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
8 8 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Wed 11/27 11:30 AM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Fall Line Patents, LLC (Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 11/26 5:51 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rehan Mohammed Safiullah on behalf of Fall Line Patents, LLC (Safiullah, Rehan)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 11/26 5:31 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zachariah Harrington on behalf of Fall Line Patents, LLC (Harrington, Zachariah)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 11/26 5:13 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Larry Dean Thompson, Jr on behalf of Fall Line Patents, LLC (Thompson, Larry)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 11/26 4:00 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to AutoZone, Inc. (slo)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
3 3 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Mon 11/25 4:01 PM
CORRECTED Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Mon 11/25 2:36 PM
See 3 Corrected Notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Antonelli, Matthew) Modified on 11/25/2024 (slo)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 11/25 2:35 PM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against AutoZone, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10516732.), filed by Fall Line Patents, LLC.(Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 11/25 3:32 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (slo)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Mon 11/25 3:32 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (slo)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Mon 11/25 3:33 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury. (slo)
Related: [-]