Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 9:24-bk-10319

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 12
Judge:Ronald A Clifford III
Case #: 9:24-ap-01040
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 25, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Makat Investments, LLC
410 S 9th St, Unit B
Grover Beach, CA 93433
Represented By
Makat Investments, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sandra K. McBeth, Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of 595s7th LLC
Represented By
Michael G D'Alba
Levene, Neale, Bender, Yoo & Golubchik L.L.P.
contact info
Trustee
Elizabeth (ND) F Rojas (TR)
Valley Executive Tower 15260 Ventura Blvd., Suite 830
Sherman Oaks, CA 91403
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (ND)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Sunday, May 04, 2025
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 05/04 9:16 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/04/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 26 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, May 02, 2025
26 26 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Fri 05/02 10:07 AM
Order as to (1) Order to Show Cause why the Court should not issue terminating sanctions and/or monetary sanctions against defendant and defendants counsel, jointly and severally, and (2) Continued status conference (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 5/2/2025 (SM)
Related: [-] 15
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
25 25 court Hearing Held (Other) Thu 04/24 10:19 AM
Hearing Held April 23, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. re: Status Conference (Bk Other) Related [+] - Continued to June 18, 2025, at 9:00 a.m. Defendant shall provide responses to the interrogatories and the deficiencies in the Rule 26 disclosures by or before May 16, 2025, by 5:00 p.m. If the responses are not timely provided, the Court shortens time for a further motion by the Trustee to be heard on May 21, 2025, at 9:00 a.m. The motion shall be filed and served by close of business on May 19, 2025. Any opposition and/or reply may be made orally at the hearing. Discovery cutoff is extended to September 30, 2025.Deadline to hear dipositive motions is extended to October 22, 2025, at 9:00 a.m. The Trustee shall upload a conforming order within 7 days. (SM)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
24 24 court Hearing Held (Other) Thu 04/24 10:02 AM
Hearing Held- The Court orders the following: (1) Counsel for Defendant shall attend two (2) hours of continuing legal education, related to practice management in the next 30 days; and (2) sanctions in the amount of $1,957.50 shall be paid to the Plaintiff by Counsel for Defendant within sixty (60) days of the entry of the order on the OSC. The Trustee shall lodge a conforming order within 7 days. Related [+] (ES9)
Related: [-] 15 Order to Show Cause why the Court should not issue terminating sanctions and/or monetary sanctions against defendant and defendants counsel, jointly and severally
court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Thu 04/24 10:19 AM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Related [+] Status Hearing to be held on 06/18/2025 at 09:00 AM 1415 State Street Courtroom 201Santa Barbara, CA 93101 for1 , (SM)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT filed by Sandra K. McBeth, Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of 595s7th LLC
Thursday, April 10, 2025
23 23 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Thu 04/10 8:49 AM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Other - OSC is scheduled for 4/23/25 at 10:00am not 9:00am as listed in the caption. Please correct declaration and resubmit. Related [+] (ES9)
Related: [-] 21 Declaration filed by Defendant Makat Investments, LLC
22 22 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Thu 04/10 8:48 AM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Document not in compliance with LBR 9011-1 as to Defendant's Submissions page 8. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER SIGNATURES. Related [+] (ES9)
Related: [-] 20 Status report filed by Plaintiff Sandra K. McBeth, Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of 595s7th LLC
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
21 21 misc Declaration Wed 04/09 11:21 PM
Declaration re: DECLARATION OF REED H. OLMSTEAD IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Filed by Defendant Makat Investments, LLC Related [+]. (Olmstead, Reed)
Related: [-] 15 Order to Show Cause (BNC-PDF)
20 20 misc Status report Wed 04/09 3:47 PM
Status report (Joint) Filed by Plaintiff Sandra K. McBeth, Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of 595s7th LLC Related [+]. (D'Alba, Michael)
Related: [-] 11 Status report
Monday, March 31, 2025
19 19 misc Proof of service Mon 03/31 11:47 AM
Proof of service of Declaration Filed by Plaintiff Sandra K. McBeth, Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of 595s7th LLC Related [+]. (D'Alba, Michael)
Related: [-] 18 Declaration
18 18 misc Declaration Mon 03/31 11:42 AM
Declaration re: Declaration Of Michael G. D'Alba Re Expenses Incurred In Compelling Rule 26 Disclosures And In LBR 7016-1 Procedure Filed by Plaintiff Sandra K. McBeth, Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of 595s7th LLC Related [+]. (D'Alba, Michael)
Related: [-] 9 Motion Plaintiff's Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Initial Disclosures And Payment Of Expenses; Declaration Of Michael G. D'Alba In Support Thereof
Sunday, March 30, 2025
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 03/30 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/30/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Order to Show Cause (BNC-PDF)
Saturday, March 29, 2025
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 03/29 9:14 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/29/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order on Generic Motion (BNC-PDF)
Friday, March 28, 2025
15 15 order OSC to appear and show cause (BNC-PDF) Fri 03/28 7:48 AM
Order to Show Cause why the Court should not Issue Terminating Sanctions and/or Monetary Sanctions against Defendant and Defendants Counsel, Jointly and Severally (BNC-PDF) Signed on 3/28/2025. (SM)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Set (Motion) (AP Case) Fri 03/28 7:50 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] Hearing to be held on 04/23/2025 at 10:00 AM 1415 State StreetCourtroom 201Santa Barbara, CA 93101. The hearing judge is Ronald A Clifford III (SM)
Related: [-] 15 Order to Show Cause (BNC-PDF)
Thursday, March 27, 2025
14 14 order X - Order (RE: Generic Motion) (BNC-PDF) Thu 03/27 2:09 PM
Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Initial Disclosures and Payment of Expenses (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 3/27/2025 (SM)
Related: [-] 9
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
13 13 court Hearing Held (Other) Thu 03/27 9:46 AM
Hearing Held March 26, 2025, at 9:00 a.m. re: Status Conference Related [+] - Continued to April 23, 2025, at 10:00 a.m. The Court will issue an order to show cause as to why the Court should not issue terminating sanctions, striking the answer and entering judgment for the Plaintiff, for the Defendants failure to provide its input for the Status Report and to timely provide initial disclosures, and to issue monetary sanctions in the amount of at least $1,500 against the Defendant and the Defendants counsel, jointly and severally. The Plaintiff to submit evidence in support of their request for expenses and fees incurred in bringing the Motion to be filed on or before April 2, 2025. The Court will hold a hearing on the show cause order on April 23, 2025, at 10:00 a.m. (SM)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Sandra K. McBeth, Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of 595s7th LLC
12 12 court Hearing Held (Motion) Thu 03/27 9:05 AM
Hearing Held- Grant the Motion, requiring the Defendant to provide full disclosures as required under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) on or before April 4, 2025. Plaintiff is to upload a conforming order within 7 days. Related [+] (ES9)
Related: [-] 9 Generic Motion filed by Plaintiff Sandra K. McBeth, Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of 595s7th LLC
court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Thu 03/27 9:46 AM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Related [+] Status Hearing to be held on 04/23/2025 at 10:00 AM 1415 State Street Courtroom 201 Santa Barbara, CA 93101 for1 , (SM)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT filed by Sandra K. McBeth, Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of 595s7th LLC
Thursday, March 13, 2025
11 11 misc Status report Thu 03/13 10:43 AM
Status report (Unilateral) Filed by Plaintiff Sandra K. McBeth, Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of 595s7th LLC Related [+]. (D'Alba, Michael)
Related: [-] 5 Status report
Monday, March 03, 2025
10 10 court Hearing Set (Motion) (AP Case) Mon 03/03 11:35 AM
Hearing Set Related [+] The Hearing date is set for 3/26/2025 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 201, 1415 State St., Santa Barbara, CA 93101. The case judge is Ronald A Clifford, III (SM)
Related: [-] 9 Generic Motion filed by Plaintiff Sandra K. McBeth, Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of 595s7th LLC
9 9 motion X - Motion (Generic) (motion) Mon 03/03 10:19 AM
Motion Plaintiff's Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Initial Disclosures And Payment Of Expenses; Declaration Of Michael G. D'Alba In Support Thereof Filed by Plaintiff Sandra K. McBeth, Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of 595s7th LLC (D'Alba, Michael)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 02, 2025
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 02/02 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF)
Friday, January 31, 2025
7 7 order Scheduling Order (BNC-PDF) Fri 01/31 9:54 AM
Status Conference and Scheduling Order pursuant to LBR 7016-1(a)(4) - Status Conference continued to 03/26/2025 at 9:00 a.m.; Joint Status Report due by 03/12/2025. (BNC-PDF) Signed on 1/31/2025. Discovery due by 5/30/2025. (SM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
6 6 court Hearing Held (Other) Wed 01/29 5:20 PM
Hearing Held 01/29/2025 at 9:00 a.m. re: Status Conference (Bk Other) Related [+] - Continued to March 26, 2025, at 9:00 a.m. A joint status report is due 14 days prior to the continued status conference. The Court orders that an initial conference commence via telephone after the Janaury 29, 2025 calendar concludes. Discovery cutoff: May 30, 2025 Last day to hear any dispositive motions: July 9, 2025, at 9:00 a.m. Trustee to upload a conforming scheduling order within 7 days. (SM)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Wed 01/29 5:20 PM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Related [+] Status Hearing to be held on 03/26/2025 at 09:00 AM 1415 State Street Courtroom 201 Santa Barbara, CA 93101 for1 , (SM)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT filed by Sandra K. McBeth, Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of 595s7th LLC
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
5 5 misc Status report Wed 01/22 11:35 AM
Status report (Unilateral) Filed by Plaintiff Sandra K. McBeth, Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of 595s7th LLC Related [+]. (D'Alba, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, December 26, 2024
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 12/26 10:05 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Makat Investments, LLC. (Olmstead, Reed)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 11/26 10:38 AM
Summons Service Executed on Makat Investments, LLC 11/26/2024 (D'Alba, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 11/25 11:20 AM
Summons Issued on Plaintiff, Service to be Made Upon Defendant Makat Investments, LLC - Date Issued 11/25/2024, Answer Due 12/26/2024 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 1/29/2025 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 201, 1415 State St., Santa Barbara, CA 93101. The case judge is Ronald A Clifford, III (KR9)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Sandra K. McBeth, Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of 595s7th LLC
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/25 10:13 AM
Adversary case 9:24-ap-01040. Complaint by Sandra K. McBeth, Chapter 7 Trustee for the Estate of 595s7th LLC against Makat Investments, LLC. ($350.00 Fee Charge To Estate). Nature of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (D'Alba, Michael)
Related: [-]