Fall Line Patents, LLC v. Chili's, Inc. et al PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER DOCKET IN THE LEAD CASE AS DIRECTED
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert W Schroeder, III |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00176 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Nov 25, 2024 |
Terminated: | Mar 12, 2025 |
Last checked: Saturday May 24, 2025 4:15 AM CDT |
Defendant
Brinker International, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chili's, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fall Line Patents, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, March 12, 2025 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (psm) |
|
23 | 23
![]() ORDER Before the Court is Plaintiff Fall Line Patents, LLC and Defendants Chili's, Inc. and Brinker International, Inc.'s (collectively "Chili's") Joint Motion to Dismiss the Chili's Defendants Only. Docket No. 56 . In the joint motion, Plaintiff and Chili's seek to dismiss with prejudice all claims against each other with each party bearing its own attorneys' fees and costs. Id. After review, the joint motion (Docket No. 56 ) is GRANTED. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that all claims made by Plaintiff and Chilis against each other in the above-captioned actions are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/12/2025. (psm) |
|
22 | 22
![]() ORDER Before the Court is Plaintiff Fall Line Patents, LLC and Defendants Chili's, Inc. and Brinker International, Inc.'s (collectively "Chili's") Joint Motion to Dismiss the Chili's Defendants Only. Docket No. 56 . In the joint motion, Plaintiff and Chili's seek to dismiss with prejudice all claims against each other with each party bearing its own attorneys' fees and costs. Id. After review, the joint motion (Docket No. 56 ) is GRANTED. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that all claims made by Plaintiff and Chili's against each other in the above-captioned actions are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/12/2025. Associated Cases: 5:24-cv-00167-RWS, 5:24-cv-00089-RWS, 5:24-cv-00090-RWS, 5:24-cv-00091-RWS, 5:24-cv-00092-RWS, 5:24-cv-00094-RWS, 5:24-cv-00095-RWS, 5:24-cv-00096-RWS, 5:24-cv-00169-RWS, 5:24-cv-00170-RWS, 5:24-cv-00172-RWS, 5:24-cv-00173-RWS, 5:24-cv-00174-RWS, 5:24-cv-00175-RWS, 5:24-cv-00176-RWS, 5:24-cv-00177-RWS, 5:24-cv-00178-RWS, 5:24-cv-00179-RWS, 5:24-cv-00180-RWS, 5:24-cv-00181-RWS, 5:24-cv-00182-RWS(psm) |
|
Wednesday, February 12, 2025 | ||
21 | 21
![]() CONSOLIDATION ORDER. The Court ORDERS that the above-styled cases are consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action (5:24-cv 00167) shall serve as the lead case for the consolidated issues. All future pretrial filings, other than venue motions,shall be filed in the lead case. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 2/12/2025. (slo) |
|
Tuesday, February 11, 2025 | ||
20 | 20
![]() NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Fall Line Patents, LLC (Safiullah, Rehan) |
|
Monday, February 10, 2025 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Chili's, Inc., Brinker International, Inc. identifying Interested Party BlackRock, Inc., Interested Party The Vanguard Group, Inc. for Brinker International, Inc.. (O'Laughlin, Megan) |
|
18 | 18
![]() ANSWER to1 Complaint by Chili's, Inc., Brinker International, Inc..(O'Laughlin, Megan) |
|
Monday, February 03, 2025 | ||
17 | 17
![]() ORDER granting16 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint Brinker International, Inc. answer due 2/10/2025; Chili's, Inc. answer due 2/10/2025. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 2/3/2025. (slo) |
|
16 | 16
![]() UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Chili's, Inc., Brinker International, Inc..(O'Laughlin, Megan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, January 16, 2025 | ||
15 | 15
text
Clerk's Entry re Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Thu 01/16 1:41 PM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted. Brinker International, Inc. answer is now due 2/6/2025; Chili's, Inc. answer is now due 2/6/2025. (Text entry only, no document attached.)(slo) |
|
14 | 14
![]() Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by Chili's, Inc., Brinker International, Inc.. Summons originally served on 12/02/2024. Agreed new answer date is 02/06/2025.(O'Laughlin, Megan) |
|
13 | 13
![]() PLEASE IGNORE. Refiled-See Dkt. 14 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Chili's, Inc., Brinker International, Inc.. (O'Laughlin, Megan) Modified on 1/16/2025 (slo) |
|
Thursday, December 19, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
text
Clerk's Entry re Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Thu 12/19 11:45 AM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted. Brinker International, Inc. answer is now due 1/22/2025; Chili's, Inc. answer is now due 1/22/2025. (psm) |
|
11 | 11
![]() UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Chili's, Inc., Brinker International, Inc.. (O'Laughlin, Megan) |
|
Thursday, December 12, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fall Line Patents, LLC. Brinker International, Inc. served on 12/2/2024. (Antonelli, Matthew) |
|
9 | 9
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fall Line Patents, LLC. Chili's, Inc. served on 12/2/2024. (Antonelli, Matthew) |
|
Monday, December 02, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE of Related Cases by Fall Line Patents, LLC (Antonelli, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, November 27, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Fall Line Patents, LLC (Antonelli, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, November 26, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rehan Mohammed Safiullah on behalf of Fall Line Patents, LLC (Safiullah, Rehan) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zachariah Harrington on behalf of Fall Line Patents, LLC (Harrington, Zachariah) |
|
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Larry Dean Thompson, Jr on behalf of Fall Line Patents, LLC (Thompson, Larry) |
|
3 | 3
![]() SUMMONS Issued as to Brinker International, Inc., Chili's, Inc.(slo) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, November 25, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Antonelli, Matthew) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Brinker International, Inc., Chili's, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10517015.), filed by Fall Line Patents, LLC.(Antonelli, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 11/25 3:41 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (slo) |
||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability
Mon 11/25 3:41 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (slo) |
||
misc
Jury Demand
Mon 11/25 3:42 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury. (slo) |