Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert W Schroeder, III
Case #: 5:24-cv-00177
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Nov 25, 2024
Terminated:Apr 23, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 24, 2025 4:15 AM CDT
Defendant
CBOCS Properties, Inc.
Represented By
Katherine Donald
Alston & Bird
contact info
Robert L Lee
Alston & Bird Llp - Atlanta
contact info
Defendant
CBOCS Texas, LLC
Represented By
Katherine Donald
Alston & Bird
contact info
Robert L Lee
Alston & Bird Llp - Atlanta
contact info
Defendant
Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc.
Represented By
Katherine Donald
Alston & Bird
contact info
Robert L Lee
Alston & Bird Llp - Atlanta
contact info
Plaintiff
Fall Line Patents, LLC
Represented By
Rehan Mohammed Safiullah
Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP
contact info
Matthew J Antonelli
Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP
contact info
Zachariah Harrington
Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP
contact info
Larry Dean Thompson, Jr
Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
CBOCS, Inc.
Terminated: 02/10/2025
Represented By
Katherine Donald
Alston & Bird
contact info
Robert L Lee
Alston & Bird Llp - Atlanta
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
38 38 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Wed 04/23 12:05 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (slo)
Related: [-]
37 37 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 04/23 12:02 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. It is ORDERED that all claims made by Plaintiff and Cracker Barrel against each other in the above-captioned actions are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own attorneys fees and costs. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 4/23/2025. (slo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
36 36 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 03/12 4:09 PM
ORDER Before the Court is Plaintiff Fall Line Patents, LLC and Defendants Chili's, Inc. and Brinker International, Inc.'s (collectively "Chili's") Joint Motion to Dismiss the Chili's Defendants Only. Docket No. 56 . In the joint motion, Plaintiff and Chili's seek to dismiss with prejudice all claims against each other with each party bearing its own attorneys' fees and costs. Id. After review, the joint motion (Docket No. 56 ) is GRANTED. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that all claims made by Plaintiff and Chili's against each other in the above-captioned actions are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/12/2025. Associated Cases: 5:24-cv-00167-RWS, 5:24-cv-00089-RWS, 5:24-cv-00090-RWS, 5:24-cv-00091-RWS, 5:24-cv-00092-RWS, 5:24-cv-00094-RWS, 5:24-cv-00095-RWS, 5:24-cv-00096-RWS, 5:24-cv-00169-RWS, 5:24-cv-00170-RWS, 5:24-cv-00172-RWS, 5:24-cv-00173-RWS, 5:24-cv-00174-RWS, 5:24-cv-00175-RWS, 5:24-cv-00176-RWS, 5:24-cv-00177-RWS, 5:24-cv-00178-RWS, 5:24-cv-00179-RWS, 5:24-cv-00180-RWS, 5:24-cv-00181-RWS, 5:24-cv-00182-RWS(psm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
35 35 4 pgs order Order Wed 02/12 3:52 PM
CONSOLIDATION ORDER. The Court ORDERS that the above-styled cases are consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action (5:24-cv 00167) shall serve as the lead case for the consolidated issues. All future pretrial filings, other than venue motions,shall be filed in the lead case. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 2/12/2025. (slo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
34 34 notice Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference Tue 02/11 6:32 PM
NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Fall Line Patents, LLC (Safiullah, Rehan)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
33 33 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Mon 02/10 11:55 AM
ORDER Before the Court is Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant CBOCS, Inc. pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). After review, the Court ACCEPTS the notice. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff's claims against Defendant CBOCS, Inc. are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 2/10/2025. (psm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
32 32 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Thu 02/06 1:29 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc., CBOCS Properties, Inc., CBOCS, Inc., CBOCS Texas, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc. for Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc.; Corporate Parent CBOCS Texas, LLC for CBOCS Texas, LLC; Corporate Parent CBOCS Properties, Inc. for CBOCS Properties, Inc.. (Lee, Robert)
Related: [-]
31 31 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 02/06 1:15 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, for Patent Infringement by Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc., CBOCS Properties, Inc., CBOCS, Inc., CBOCS Texas, LLC.(Lee, Robert)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 02/06 10:52 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Fall Line Patents, LLC(Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A [Stipulation],
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 02/05 10:04 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice27 Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6). Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 2/5/2025. (slo)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
28 28 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 02/03 2:02 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katherine Donald on behalf of All Defendants (Donald, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
27 27 motion Dismiss Fri 01/31 3:27 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION to Dismiss Complaint without prejudice by CBOCS, Inc..(Lee, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, January 16, 2025
26 26 text Clerk's Entry re Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Thu 01/16 1:34 PM
Unopposed Applications for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint are granted. CBOCS Properties, Inc. answer is now due 2/6/2025; CBOCS Texas, LLC answer is now due 2/6/2025; CBOCS, Inc. answer is now due 2/6/2025; Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc. answer is now due 2/6/2025. (Text entry only, no document attached.)(slo)
Related: [-]
25 25 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Thu 01/16 11:50 AM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc. Summons originally served on 12/03/2024. Agreed new answer date is 02/06/2025.(Lee, Robert)
Related: [-]
24 24 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Thu 01/16 11:45 AM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by CBOCS Texas, LLC. Summons originally served on 12/02/2024. Agreed new answer date is 02/06/2025.(Lee, Robert)
Related: [-]
23 23 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Thu 01/16 11:40 AM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by CBOCS Properties, Inc. Summons originally served on 12/03/2024. Agreed new answer date is 02/06/2025.(Lee, Robert)
Related: [-]
22 22 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Thu 01/16 11:34 AM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by CBOCS, Inc. Summons originally served on 12/02/2024. Agreed new answer date is 02/06/2025.(Lee, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
21 21 text Clerk's Entry re Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Thu 12/19 3:34 PM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted. CBOCS Texas, LLC answer is now due 1/22/2025. (psm)
Related: [-]
20 20 text Clerk's Entry re Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Thu 12/19 3:33 PM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted. CBOCS Properties, Inc. answer is now due 1/22/2025. (psm)
Related: [-]
19 19 text Clerk's Entry re Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Thu 12/19 3:32 PM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted. CBOCS, Inc. answer is now due 1/22/2025. (psm)
Related: [-]
18 18 text Clerk's Entry re Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Thu 12/19 3:30 PM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted. Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc. answer is now due 1/22/2025. (psm)
Related: [-]
17 17 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Thu 12/19 3:05 PM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by CBOCS Texas, LLC. Summons originally served on 12/02/2024. Agreed new answer date is 01/22/2025.(Lee, Robert)
Related: [-]
16 16 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Thu 12/19 3:03 PM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by CBOCS Properties, Inc.. Summons originally served on 12/03/2024. Agreed new answer date is 01/22/2025.(Lee, Robert)
Related: [-]
15 15 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Thu 12/19 3:01 PM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by CBOCS, Inc.. Summons originally served on 12/02/2024. Agreed new answer date is 01/22/2025.(Lee, Robert)
Related: [-]
14 14 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Thu 12/19 2:58 PM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc.. Summons originally served on 12/03/2024. Agreed new answer date is 01/22/2025.(Lee, Robert)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 12/19 2:52 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert L Lee on behalf of All Defendants (Lee, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 12/12 11:30 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fall Line Patents, LLC. CBOCS, Inc. served on 12/2/2024. (Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 12/12 11:29 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fall Line Patents, LLC. CBOCS Texas, LLC served on 12/2/2024. (Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 12/12 11:28 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fall Line Patents, LLC. CBOCS Properties, Inc. served on 12/3/2024. (Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 12/12 11:27 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fall Line Patents, LLC. Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc. served on 12/3/2024. (Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
8 8 3 pgs notice Notice (Other) Mon 12/02 3:03 PM
NOTICE of Related Cases by Fall Line Patents, LLC (Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
7 7 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Wed 11/27 11:33 AM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Fall Line Patents, LLC (Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 11/26 5:55 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rehan Mohammed Safiullah on behalf of Fall Line Patents, LLC (Safiullah, Rehan)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 11/26 5:34 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zachariah Harrington on behalf of Fall Line Patents, LLC (Harrington, Zachariah)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 11/26 5:17 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Larry Dean Thompson, Jr on behalf of Fall Line Patents, LLC (Thompson, Larry)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 11/26 4:55 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to CBOCS Properties, Inc., CBOCS Texas, LLC, CBOCS, Inc., Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc..(slo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons-CBOCS, Inc.,
Att: 2 Summons-CBOCS Texas, LLC,
Att: 3 Summons-CBOCS, Inc.
Monday, November 25, 2024
2 2 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Mon 11/25 3:25 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 11/25 3:24 PM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against CBOCS Properties, Inc., CBOCS Texas, LLC, CBOCS, Inc., Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10517123.), filed by Fall Line Patents, LLC.(Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 11/25 4:09 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (slo)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Mon 11/25 4:09 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (slo)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Mon 11/25 4:10 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury. (slo)
Related: [-]