Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 0:24-cv-62241
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Nov 25, 2024
Terminated:Nov 26, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jan 11, 2025 5:13 AM EST
Defendant
Ur M Jaddou
Plaintiff
Salar Habibi
Represented By
John Patrick Pratt
Kurzban Kurzban Tetzeli & Pratt, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Forough Yamini


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, February 13, 2025
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Refund/Transfer-Filing Fee (by FINANCIAL SECTION) Thu 02/13 3:53 PM
Clerk's Notice of Filing Fee transferred to 0:24-cv-62243 in the amount of $405.00 on 11/26/2024 re 1 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case,, (Torres, Betsabel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
1 1 order Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE Tue 11/26 7:24 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Case administratively closed - No Initiating Document filed/attached. A second attempt to open a case without incurring a new charge should be made by the next business day, if not - our Financial Department will refund the filing fees within 10 business days. Filing fees will be refunded. Amount $405.00, receipt #AFLSDC-18010375, case filed date: 11/25/2024. No further entries will be made on this case . (bb)
Related: [-]