Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Robert W Schroeder, III
Case #: 5:24-cv-00179
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Nov 25, 2024
Last checked: Saturday May 24, 2025 4:15 AM CDT
Defendant
DoorDash Essentials, LLC
Represented By
Michael Robert Rueckheim
Winston & Strawn Llp - Redwood City
contact info
Defendant
DoorDash, Inc.
Represented By
Michael Robert Rueckheim
Winston & Strawn Llp - Redwood City
contact info
Plaintiff
Fall Line Patents, LLC
Represented By
Zachariah Harrington
Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP
contact info
Larry Dean Thompson, Jr
Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP
contact info
Matthew J Antonelli
Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP
contact info
Rehan Mohammed Safiullah
Antonelli, Harrington & Thompson LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, March 21, 2025
36 36 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 03/21 4:21 PM
ORDER granting26 MOTION FOR LIMITED VENUE DISCOVERY; granting31 OPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File REPLY BRIEF SUPPORTING FALL LINE'S MOTION FOR LIMITED VENUE DISCOVERY. (Motion(s)26 ,31 terminated). Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/21/2025. (slo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
35 35 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 03/19 4:09 PM
REPLY to Response re31 OPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File REPLY BRIEF SUPPORTING FALL LINE'S MOTION FOR LIMITED VENUE DISCOVERY (DKT. NO. 26) filed by Fall Line Patents, LLC .(Thompson, Larry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ex 1 [Email Chain]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
34 34 respm Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion Tue 03/18 3:54 PM
SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response re26 MOTION for Discovery MOTION FOR LIMITED VENUE DISCOVERY filed by DoorDash, Inc., DoorDash Essentials, LLC . (Rueckheim, Michael)
Related: [-]
33 33 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 03/18 3:50 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re31 OPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File REPLY BRIEF SUPPORTING FALL LINE'S MOTION FOR LIMITED VENUE DISCOVERY (DKT. NO. 26) and in the Alternative Motion for Leave to File A Sur-Reply Brief filed by DoorDash, Inc., DoorDash Essentials, LLC .(Rueckheim, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, March 14, 2025
32 32 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 03/14 3:13 PM
REPLY to Response re26 MOTION for Discovery MOTION FOR LIMITED VENUE DISCOVERY ,31 OPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File REPLY BRIEF SUPPORTING FALL LINE'S MOTION FOR LIMITED VENUE DISCOVERY (DKT. NO. 26) filed by Fall Line Patents, LLC . (Thompson, Larry)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Leave to File Document Fri 03/14 3:09 PM
OPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File REPLY BRIEF SUPPORTING FALL LINE'S MOTION FOR LIMITED VENUE DISCOVERY (DKT. NO. 26) by Fall Line Patents, LLC.(Thompson, Larry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
30 30 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Wed 03/12 4:09 PM
ORDER Before the Court is Plaintiff Fall Line Patents, LLC and Defendants Chili's, Inc. and Brinker International, Inc.'s (collectively "Chili's") Joint Motion to Dismiss the Chili's Defendants Only. Docket No. 56 . In the joint motion, Plaintiff and Chili's seek to dismiss with prejudice all claims against each other with each party bearing its own attorneys' fees and costs. Id. After review, the joint motion (Docket No. 56 ) is GRANTED. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that all claims made by Plaintiff and Chili's against each other in the above-captioned actions are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/12/2025. Associated Cases: 5:24-cv-00167-RWS, 5:24-cv-00089-RWS, 5:24-cv-00090-RWS, 5:24-cv-00091-RWS, 5:24-cv-00092-RWS, 5:24-cv-00094-RWS, 5:24-cv-00095-RWS, 5:24-cv-00096-RWS, 5:24-cv-00169-RWS, 5:24-cv-00170-RWS, 5:24-cv-00172-RWS, 5:24-cv-00173-RWS, 5:24-cv-00174-RWS, 5:24-cv-00175-RWS, 5:24-cv-00176-RWS, 5:24-cv-00177-RWS, 5:24-cv-00178-RWS, 5:24-cv-00179-RWS, 5:24-cv-00180-RWS, 5:24-cv-00181-RWS, 5:24-cv-00182-RWS(psm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Document Tue 03/11 11:43 AM
ORDER granting27 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Seal Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Venue Discovery. It is ORDERED that the Clerk of Court SEAL Defendants' response (Docket No. 28) to Plaintiff's motion for venue discovery. It is further ORDERED that, in accordance with the Local Rules, Defendants SHALL file within seven (7) days of this order a proposed public version that contains all necessary redactions. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/11/2025. (slo)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
28 28 respm Sealed Response to Motion Fri 03/07 8:49 PM
SEALED RESPONSE re26 MOTION for Discovery MOTION FOR LIMITED VENUE DISCOVERY filed by DoorDash, Inc., DoorDash Essentials, LLC.(Rueckheim, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
27 27 motion Seal Document Fri 03/07 8:42 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION to Seal Document Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Venue Discovery by DoorDash, Inc., DoorDash Essentials, LLC.(Rueckheim, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
26 26 motion Discovery Wed 02/26 7:14 PM
MOTION for Discovery MOTION FOR LIMITED VENUE DISCOVERY by Fall Line Patents, LLC.(Harrington, Zachariah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Ex 1 [Introducing DashMart],
Att: 3 Ex 2 [Plano Job Listing],
Att: 4 Ex 3 [Correspondence Excerpt]
Monday, February 24, 2025
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 02/24 4:40 PM
ORDER granting24 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to16 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendants' motion to dismiss is two weeks after the Court issues an order on Plaintiff's forthcoming motion related to limited venue discovery. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 2/24/2025. (slo)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
24 24 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 02/21 5:12 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to16 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss by Fall Line Patents, LLC.(Harrington, Zachariah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 02/18 4:20 PM
ORDER granting22 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to16 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss . It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendants' motion to dismiss is March 7, 2025. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 2/18/2025. (slo)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
22 22 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 02/14 5:11 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to16 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss by Fall Line Patents, LLC.(Harrington, Zachariah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
21 21 4 pgs order Order Wed 02/12 3:52 PM
CONSOLIDATION ORDER. The Court ORDERS that the above-styled cases are consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action (5:24-cv 00167) shall serve as the lead case for the consolidated issues. All future pretrial filings, other than venue motions,shall be filed in the lead case. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 2/12/2025. (slo)
Related: [-]
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Seal Document Wed 02/12 3:26 PM
ORDER granting15 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Seal Document Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. It is ORDERED that the Clerk of Court SEAL Defendants' motion to dismiss (Docket No. 16). It is further ORDERED that Docket No. 18 will remain unsealed and serve as the public version of the sealed motion. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 2/12/2025. (slo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
19 19 notice Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference Tue 02/11 6:33 PM
NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by Fall Line Patents, LLC (Safiullah, Rehan)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
18 18 misc Redacted Document Mon 02/10 3:10 PM
REDACTION to16 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss by DoorDash, Inc., DoorDash Essentials, LLC.(Rueckheim, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit/Declaration In support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Affidavit/Declaration of Michael R. Rueckheim,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Proposed Order
Friday, February 07, 2025
17 17 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Fri 02/07 8:27 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by DoorDash, Inc., DoorDash Essentials, LLC (Rueckheim, Michael)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Sealed Motion Fri 02/07 8:14 PM
SEALED MOTION to Dismiss by DoorDash, Inc., DoorDash Essentials, LLC.(Rueckheim, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit/Declaration In support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Affidavit/Declaration of Michael R. Rueckheim,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Proposed Order
15 15 motion Seal Document Fri 02/07 8:04 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION to Seal Document Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by DoorDash, Inc., DoorDash Essentials, LLC.(Rueckheim, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, January 10, 2025
14 14 text Clerk's Entry re Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Fri 01/10 8:17 AM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted. as to All Defendants. (psm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
13 13 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Wed 01/08 8:45 PM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by DoorDash, Inc., DoorDash Essentials, LLC. Summons originally served on 12/3/2024. Agreed new answer date is 2/7/2025.(Rueckheim, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 12/12 11:44 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fall Line Patents, LLC. DoorDash, Inc. served on 12/3/2024. (Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 12/12 11:43 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fall Line Patents, LLC. DoorDash Essentials, LLC served on 12/3/2024. (Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
10 10 text Clerk's Entry re Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Thu 12/12 8:34 AM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted. DoorDash Essentials, LLC answer is now due 1/23/2025; DoorDash, Inc. answer is now due 1/23/2025. (slo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
9 9 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Wed 12/11 8:08 PM
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by DoorDash, Inc., DoorDash Essentials, LLC. Summons originally served on 12/3/2024. Agreed new answer date is 1/23/2025.(Rueckheim, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Mon 12/02 3:05 PM
NOTICE of Related Cases by Fall Line Patents, LLC (Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
7 7 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Wed 11/27 11:35 AM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by Fall Line Patents, LLC (Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 11/27 8:59 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to DoorDash Essentials, LLC, DoorDash, Inc.(slo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons-DoorDash Essentials, LLC
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 11/26 5:57 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rehan Mohammed Safiullah on behalf of Fall Line Patents, LLC (Safiullah, Rehan)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 11/26 5:35 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zachariah Harrington on behalf of Fall Line Patents, LLC (Harrington, Zachariah)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 11/26 5:18 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Larry Dean Thompson, Jr on behalf of Fall Line Patents, LLC (Thompson, Larry)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
2 2 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Mon 11/25 4:22 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 11/25 4:21 PM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against DoorDash Essentials, LLC, DoorDash, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10517425.), filed by Fall Line Patents, LLC.(Antonelli, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 11/25 4:57 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (slo)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Mon 11/25 4:57 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (slo)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Mon 11/25 4:58 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury. (slo)
Related: [-]