Mississippi Southern District Court
Judge:Taylor B Mcneel
Referred: Robert P Myers, Jr
Case #: 1:24-cv-00363
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Nov 25, 2024
Terminated:Dec 27, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jan 11, 2025 4:29 AM CST
Defendant
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro, LLP
Defendant
John and Jane Doe A, B, and C
Plaintiff
Walter L. Nixon
Represented By
Christopher C Van Cleave
Van Cleave Law, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, December 23, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 12/23 2:56 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Walter L. Nixon (Van Cleave, Christopher)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Mon 12/23 1:06 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #3: This entry was filed incorrect and will be disregarded. Incorrect pdf document was attached. Attorney is advised to refile attaching the correct pdf document, Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (RLW)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Fri 12/27 9:58 AM
Remark: Case terminated pursuant to4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (PKS)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 12/20 8:55 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Walter L. Nixon (Van Cleave, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 11/25 4:01 PM
Summons Issued as to Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro, LLP. (RLW)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 11/25 3:46 PM
COMPLAINT, with jury demand, against Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro, LLP, John and Jane Doe A, B, and C (Filing fee $405.00, receipt number 5555227), filed by Walter L. Nixon (RLW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Contract,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Contract,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Remark Mon 11/25 4:03 PM
Remark: Original issued summonses for service and return were emailed to attorney. (RLW)
Related: [-]