North Dakota District Court
Judge:Peter D Welte
Referred: Alice R Senechal
Case #: 3:24-cv-00235
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Nov 25, 2024
Terminated:Feb 20, 2025
Case in other court:Richland County, 39-02024-CV-00341
Last checked: Saturday Jan 11, 2025 3:57 AM CST
Defendant
Biersch, INC
Represented By
Nicholas Mino
Nilles Law Firm
contact info
Mark R. Hanson
Nilles Law Firm
contact info
Christopher R. Hedican
Baird Holm LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Matthew Boyington
Represented By
Lee M. Grossman
Severson, Wogsland & Liebl, P.C.
contact info
Adam D. Wogsland
Severson, Wogsland & Liebl, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Premiere Ag Manufacturing LLC
Represented By
Lee M. Grossman
Severson, Wogsland & Liebl, P.C.
contact info
Adam D. Wogsland
Severson, Wogsland & Liebl, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Premiere Shortline USA, LLC
Represented By
Lee M. Grossman
Severson, Wogsland & Liebl, P.C.
contact info
Adam D. Wogsland
Severson, Wogsland & Liebl, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, February 20, 2025
44 44 order Judgment - Clerk Thu 02/20 2:33 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT.(sl)
Related: [-]
43 43 9 pgs order Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Order on Motion for Hearing Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Motion to Stay Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 02/20 2:03 PM
ORDER by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte granting10 Motion to Dismiss; and denying5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 7 Motion for Hearing; denying8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 12 Motion to Stay; and denying25 Motion for Hearing. (KT)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
42 42 service Certificate of Service Fri 01/03 5:00 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Premiere Ag Manufacturing LLC, Premiere Shortline USA, LLC, Matthew Boyington re41 Reply to Response to Motion,40 Reply to Response to Motion on Opposing Counsel (Grossman, Lee)
Related: [-]
41 41 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 01/03 4:59 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Antisuit Injunction filed by Premiere Ag Manufacturing LLC, Premiere Shortline USA, LLC, Matthew Boyington. (Grossman, Lee)
Related: [-]
40 40 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 01/03 4:59 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Oral Argument filed by Premiere Ag Manufacturing LLC, Premiere Shortline USA, LLC, Matthew Boyington. (Grossman, Lee)
Related: [-]
39 39 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 01/03 3:14 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Stay or, in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer , 12 MOTION to StayMOTION to Transfer In Further Support of Motion filed by Biersch, INC. (Hanson, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
38 38 service Certificate of Service Mon 12/23 11:36 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Premiere Ag Manufacturing LLC, Premiere Shortline USA, LLC, Matthew Boyington re37 Response to Motion on Opposing Counsel (Grossman, Lee)
Related: [-]
37 37 respm Response to Motion Mon 12/23 11:33 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re25 MOTION for Hearing filed by Premiere Ag Manufacturing LLC, Premiere Shortline USA, LLC, Matthew Boyington. (Grossman, Lee)
Related: [-]
utility Docket Correction Mon 12/23 11:28 AM
DOCKET CORRECTION re:23 Response to Motion. Clerk's office added 'Exhibit 1' to docket entry for Attachment 1, removed duplicative 'Exhibit' text from docket entry for Attachment 2, and cleaned up docket text;25 Motion for Hearing (oral argument). Clerk's office corrected document numbers in docket text as to linked documents;26 Response to Motion. Clerk's office removed 'Exhibit' reference;34 Affidavit Declaration of Corey A. Staas. Clerk's office added more complete descriptions of Exhibits 1 and 2;35 Affidavit Declaration of Zachary Brashears. Clerk's office replaced Exhibits 3 and 4 to display legible headers;36 Affidavit Declaration of Dean Bierschenk. Clerk's office replaced Exhibit 7 to display legible headers and added more complete descriptions to Exhibits 1, 2, and 5. (jb)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
36 36 misc Affidavit Fri 12/20 5:13 PM
AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Dean Bierschenk re28 Response to Motion by Biersch, INC.(Hanson, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Record of trademarks,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Record of trademarks,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Warning,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Employment Agreement,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Agreement,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 -Letter dated 2-19-24,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Text Messages from dealer
35 35 misc Affidavit Fri 12/20 5:04 PM
AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Zachary Brashears re28 Response to Motion by Biersch, INC.(Hanson, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Drawing No. 80504,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Attachments to 1-25-23 email,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 -Text Message,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Text Message and Photos,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Email
34 34 misc Affidavit Fri 12/20 5:00 PM
AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Corey A. Staas re28 Response to Motion by Biersch, INC.(Hanson, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 -Spreadsheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Spreadsheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3- Searches Spreadsheet
33 33 misc Affidavit Fri 12/20 4:56 PM
AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Prashanth Ramaswamy re28 Response to Motion by Biersch, INC.(Hanson, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proprietary Information
32 32 misc Affidavit Fri 12/20 4:53 PM
AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Ed Hert re28 Response to Motion by Biersch, INC. (Hanson, Mark)
Related: [-]
31 31 misc Affidavit Fri 12/20 4:52 PM
AFFIDAVIT Declaration of George R. Wandling, Sr. re28 Response to Motion by Biersch, INC. (Hanson, Mark)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Affidavit Fri 12/20 4:50 PM
AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Riley McDaniel re28 Response to Motion by Biersch, INC. (Hanson, Mark)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Affidavit Fri 12/20 4:46 PM
AFFIDAVIT Declaration of Brian Roed re28 Response to Motion by Biersch, INC.(Hanson, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - E-mails Exchange
28 28 respm Response to Motion Fri 12/20 4:28 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Oral Argument In Opposition to filed by Biersch, INC. (Hanson, Mark)
Related: [-]
27 27 4 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Fri 12/20 4:01 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re25 MOTION for HearingMOTION to Dismiss filed by Biersch, INC. (Hanson, Mark)
Related: [-]
26 26 respm Response to Motion Fri 12/20 3:47 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Antisuit Injunction in Opposition of filed by Biersch, INC.(Hanson, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Morio
25 25 motion Hearing Dismiss Fri 12/20 3:15 PM
MOTION for Hearing (oral argument) on Motion for Preliminary Injunction 10 and MOTION to Dismiss5 , and MOTION for Preliminary Antisuit Injunction8 by Biersch, INC. (Hanson, Mark) Modified on 12/20/2024 to correct motion relief (lf)
Related: [-]
24 24 service Certificate of Service Fri 12/20 2:58 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Premiere Ag Manufacturing LLC, Premiere Shortline USA, LLC, Matthew Boyington re23 Response to Motion,, (Grossman, Lee)
Related: [-]
23 23 respm Response to Motion Fri 12/20 2:54 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Stay or, in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer , 12 MOTION to StayMOTION to Transfer Memorandum in Response filed by Premiere Ag Manufacturing LLC, Premiere Shortline USA, LLC, Matthew Boyington.(Grossman, Lee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 First Supplemental Declaration of Matthew Boyington,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to First Supplemental Declaration of Matthew Boyington - 02.19.2024 Matthew Boyington letter from Universal Industries
utility Docket Correction Fri 12/20 3:56 PM
DOCKET CORRECTION re:25 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion to Dismiss. Wrong motion relief selected. Clerk's office corrected motion relief at the request of filer. (lf)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
22 22 order Order Fri 12/13 1:23 PM
(Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. As discussed at the 12/13/2024 Status Conference, a Scheduling Conference Order will not be filed until after the three pending motions are decided. (CT)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Order Fri 12/13 1:22 PM
(Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. As discussed at the 12/13/2024 Status Conference, a brief on the motion for a hearing on the pending motions is due by 12/20/2024 and a responsive brief is due by 12/24/2024. Neither brief shall exceed five pages. (CT)
Related: [-]
20 20 minutes Status Conference Fri 12/13 12:54 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Status Conference held on 12/13/2024. (DR #241213-000 JS Chambers Recorder) (le)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
19 19 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 12/10 5:05 PM
(Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Status Conference is set for 12/13/2024 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Plaintiff shall initiate the call. The telephone number for chambers is 701-297-7000. (CT)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Order Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 12/10 2:23 PM
(Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. The17 stipulation is adopted. Responses due by 12/20/2024. Replies due by 1/3/2025. (CT) Modified on 12/10/2024 to correct date responses are due by. NEF regenerated (bl)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
17 17 misc Stipulation Mon 12/09 3:12 PM
STIPULATION (Joint) Regarding Deadlines and Briefing Schedule by Biersch, INC. (Hanson, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 12/05 2:41 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Premiere Shortline USA, LLC, Premiere Ag Manufacturing LLC, Matthew Boyington. Biersch, INC served on 12/4/2024, answer due 12/26/2024 (Grossman, Lee)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/04 8:46 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Mino on behalf of Biersch, INC (Mino, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
14 14 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 12/03 4:05 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Biersch, INC. (Hanson, Mark)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/03 4:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark R. Hanson on behalf of Biersch, INC (Hanson, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
utility Docket Correction Mon 12/02 12:03 PM
DOCKET CORRECTION re:10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Multiple relief document filed. Clerk's Office filed Motion to Stay and MOTION (Miscellaneous) to Transfer at 12 . Re:11 MEMORANDUM in Support. Clerk's Office added link to additional motion relief filed and added more complete attachment descriptions. (sl)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 29, 2024
12 12 motion Stay Miscellaneous Relief Mon 12/02 11:53 AM
MOTION to Stay or MOTION to Transfer in the Alternative by Biersch, INC. See Document10 . (sl)
Related: [-]
11 11 8 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Fri 11/29 4:30 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Stay or, in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer filed by Biersch, INC.(Hedican, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - T. Morio Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Morio Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Morio Declaration
10 10 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Fri 11/29 4:24 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Stay or, in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer by Biersch, INC. (Hedican, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
9 9 service Certificate of Service Wed 11/27 3:04 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Premiere Ag Manufacturing LLC, Premiere Shortline USA, LLC, Matthew Boyington re8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Antisuit Injunction on Opposing Counsel (Grossman, Lee)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Preliminary Injunction Wed 11/27 3:00 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Antisuit Injunction by Premiere Ag Manufacturing LLC, Premiere Shortline USA, LLC, Matthew Boyington.(Grossman, Lee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Preliminary Antisuit Injunction Motion,
Att: 2 Memorandum in Support of Preliminary Antisuit Injunction Motion,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 to Memorandum - Premiere Ag Register of Actions Richland County
utility Docket Correction Wed 11/27 2:13 PM
DOCKET CORRECTION re:5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Clerk's Office removed duplicative exhibit language and clarified attachment descriptions. Multiple relief document filed. Clerk's Office filed Motion for Hearing at 7 . (sl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
7 7 motion Hearing Wed 11/27 2:12 PM
MOTION for Hearing by Premiere Ag Manufacturing LLC, Premiere Shortline USA, LLC, and Matthew Boyington. See Document at5 . (sl)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Certificate of Service Tue 11/26 4:52 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Premiere Ag Manufacturing LLC, Premiere Shortline USA, LLC, Matthew Boyington re5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Oral Argument on Opposing Counsel (Grossman, Lee)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Preliminary Injunction Tue 11/26 4:51 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Oral Argument by Premiere Ag Manufacturing LLC, Premiere Shortline USA, LLC, Matthew Boyington.(Grossman, Lee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Motion for Preliminary Injunction,
Att: 2 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Memorandum in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction - Order Granting Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order and Notice of Entry of Order
4 4 service Certificate of Service Tue 11/26 3:44 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Premiere Ag Manufacturing LLC, Premiere Shortline USA, LLC, Matthew Boyington re3 Corporate Disclosure Statement,2 Notice of Appearance on Opposing Counsel (Grossman, Lee)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 11/26 3:42 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Premiere Ag Manufacturing LLC, Premiere Shortline USA, LLC, Matthew Boyington. (Grossman, Lee)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/26 3:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lee M. Grossman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Grossman, Lee)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 11/25 4:19 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Biersch, INC from District Court Southeast Judicial District, County of Richland, case number 39-2024-CV-00341. Filing fee $ 405 receipt number 300001042 filed by Biersch, INC.(bl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Summons and complaint from district court,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Notice of filing of removal from district court