Washington Western District Court
Judge:Robert S Lasnik
Case #: 2:24-cv-01948
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Anti-trust
Case Filed:Nov 25, 2024
Terminated:Feb 03, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Jan 11, 2025 3:12 AM PST
Defendant
Oakland Management Corp
Defendant
Dalton Management Inc
Defendant
Envole Communities LLC
Represented By
Erin Munger
King & Spalding Llp (ga)
contact info
Jeffrey S Cashdan
King & Spalding Llp (ga)
contact info
Paul R Taylor
Byrnes Keller Cromwell LLP
contact info
Lohr A Beck
King & Spalding Llp (ga)
contact info
Defendant
FPI Management Inc
Represented By
Jenna M Poligo
Stoel Rives Llp (wa)
contact info
Defendant
Greystar Management Services LLC
Represented By
Bryn Resser Pallesen
Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe (wa)
contact info
Defendant
Grubb Properties LLC
Represented By
Kristin Mariko Asai
Holland & Knight (or)
contact info
Defendant
HNN Associates LLC
Represented By
Tiffany L Lee
Perkins Coie (sea)
contact info
Defendant
KRE Group Inc
Defendant
LumaCorp Inc
Represented By
Kevin McCulloch
Mcculloch Kleinman Law
contact info
Charles D Lee
Lee Schwalb Llc (ks)
contact info
Defendant
Manco Abbott Inc
Represented By
Mathew L Harrington
Stokes Lawrence Ps (seattle)
contact info
Valerie A Walker
Stokes Lawrence Ps (seattle)
contact info
Defendant
McWhinney Property Management LLC
Represented By
Kristin Mariko Asai
Holland & Knight (or)
contact info
Defendant
Morguard Management Company Inc
Defendant
Calibrate Property Management LLC
Defendant
PRG Real Estate Management Inc
Represented By
Eric S Fisher
Barnes & Thornburg Llp (ga)
contact info
Defendant
RAM Partners LLC
Defendant
RD Merrill Real Estate Holdings LLC
Defendant
RPM Living LLC
Defendant
Singh Management Co LLC
Defendant
Summit Management Services Inc
Represented By
Todd A Bowers
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani Llp (seattle)
contact info
Mark A. Horey
Mark A Horey
contact info
Defendant
Towne Properties Asset Management Company Ltd
Represented By
Callie A Castillo
Ballard Spahr Llp (sea)
contact info
Defendant
Tribridge Residential LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey L. Mapen
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough (ga)
contact info
Joel B Ard
Ard Law Group PLLC
contact info
Peter L. Munk
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough (ga)
contact info
Annefloor Josephine De Groot
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough (ga)
contact info
Defendant
Walton Communities LLC
Defendant
Yardi Systems Inc
Represented By
Dailey Koga
Ballard Spahr Llp (sea)
contact info
Aaron Schaer
Ballard Spahr Llp (sea)
contact info
Defendant
Willow Bridge Property Company National
Represented By
Becky L. Caruso
Greenberg Traurig Llp (nj)
contact info
Gregory J Casas
Greenberg Traurig Llp (austin)
contact info
Jessica B Jensen
Ogden Murphy Wallace Pllc (sea)
contact info
Emily W. Collins
Greenberg Traurig Llp (austin)
contact info
Defendant
Banyan Living Ohio LLC
Defendant
Continental Realty Corporation
Defendant
Creekwood Property Corporation
Defendant
Edward Rose & Sons
Defendant
Guardian Real Estate Services LLC
Defendant
John Does 1-100
Defendant
Western National Securities
Defendant
Balaciano Group
Represented By
Jeremy E Roller
Arete Law Group PLLC
contact info
Defendant
10 Federal Mgmt LLC
Defendant
AJ Dwoskin & Associates Inc
Defendant
Alco Management Inc
Defendant
Ardmore Residential Inc
Defendant
Asset Living LLC
Defendant
Avenue5 Residential LLC
Defendant
Balke Brown Transwestern Inc
Represented By
Cameron N. Regnery
Freeman Mathis & Gary Llp (ga)
contact info
Andrea Holburn Bernarding
Freeman Mathis & Gary Llp (sea)
contact info
Scott Eric Anderson
Freeman Mathis & Gary Llp (ga)
contact info
George B. Green, Jr
Freeman Mathis & Gary Llp (ga)
contact info
Defendant
Bridge Property Management LC
Plaintiff
Madison Shewmaker
Represented By
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Wilson Daniel Miles, III
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles
contact info
Rebecca D Gilliland
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles PC
contact info
Paul W Evans
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles
contact info
Plaintiff
Jamaar Faison
Represented By
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Wilson Daniel Miles, III
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles
contact info
Rebecca D Gilliland
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles PC
contact info
Paul W Evans
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles
contact info
Plaintiff
Cynthia Beevers
Represented By
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Wilson Daniel Miles, III
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles
contact info
Rebecca D Gilliland
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles PC
contact info
Paul W Evans
Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, February 03, 2025
115 115 order Consolidation Order - for Member cases only ~Util - Terminate Case Mon 02/03 2:46 PM
ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED ACTIONS. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a), the following actions will be consolidated for all purposes: (1) Duffy et al. v. Yardi Systems, Inc. et al. , No. 2:24-cv-01391-RSL (W.D. Wash.); (2) Shewmaker et al. v. Yardi Systems, Inc. et al. , No. 2:24-cv-01948-RSL (W.D. Wash.); and (3) Frank et al. v. Yardi Systems, Inc. et al ., No. 2:24-cv-02053-RSL (W.D. Wash.). All documents filed in the future regarding these matters shall be filed under cause number 2:24-cv-01391-RSL. The Clerk of Court is directed file a copy of this order in cause numbers 2:24-cv-01948-RSL and 2:24-cv-02053-RSL and to terminate those cases. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (MJV)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
114 114 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 01/27 12:35 PM
ORDER re111 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Michael Anthony Cedrone for Defendant KRE Group Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (CDA)
Related: [-]
113 113 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 01/27 11:00 AM
ORDER re110 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Joseph E Wolfson for Defendant KRE Group Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (CDA)
Related: [-]
112 112 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 01/27 9:58 AM
ORDER denying108 Unopposed MOTION to Waive Geographic Requirement in LCR 83.1. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (MJV)
Related: [-]
utility Notice to PHV and Local Counsel Unable to Process Application Mon 01/27 11:01 AM
Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice111 by attorney Michael Cedrone will not be processed at this time. The Pro Hac attorney must submit a Pro Hac Vice access request via[LINK:Manage My Account] on PACER, under the Maintenance tab. See page 2 of the[LINK:Pro Hac Vice Application Guide] for detailed instructions. Please contact the Attorney Admissions Clerk at 206-370-8400 or[LINK:WAWD_Admissions@wawd.uscourts.gov] with additional questions. (Ad hoc Attorney Michael Cedrone) (CDA)
Related: [-]