John Catalano et al v. 3M Company et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-06686 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Nov 20, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Jan 05, 2025 5:59 AM EST |
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
individually and as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
13995 Pasteur Boulevard
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418 |
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Catalano
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Catalano
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, November 25, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Mon 11/25 1:30 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 11/20/2024), John Catalano et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-06686-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: District of Maryland (jbin) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jbin) |
|
Wednesday, November 20, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12117251.), filed by John Catalano, Patricia Catalano. Service due by 2/18/2025(jbin) |