Wyoming Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Cathleen D Parker
Case #: 2:24-bk-20470
Case Filed:Nov 25, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Mar 19, 2025
Claims Deadline:Jun 02, 2025
Converted:Feb 14, 2025
Discharge Objection Deadline:Mar 03, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Electrical Connections Inc.
2214 Upland St Unit A
Rock Springs, WY 82901-4082
Represented By
Clark D. Stith
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Paul Arthur Jordan Trustee
Np3 Llcompany 5 Tamarade Drive
Littleton, CO 80127
Trustee
David L. Miller
David L. Miller PC PO Box 9
Farmington, UT 84025
Represented By
Brian J. Porter
Mckay, Burton & Thurman, P.C.
contact info
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
308 West 21st Street, 2nd Floor
Cheyenne, WY 82001
Represented By
Paul Arthur Jordan Trustee
contact info
Daniel J. Morse
Assistant U.S. Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 12:31 PM MDT
Monday, November 25, 2024
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Mon 11/25 8:46 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-20470 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A2600545. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 43 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 11/25 8:20 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Electrical Connections Inc. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 02/24/2025. (Stith, Clark)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs court Corp/Ptnr Resolution Mon 11/25 8:49 PM
Corporation/Partnership Resolution Filed. Filed by Electrical Connections Inc. (Stith, Clark)
Related: [-]
3 3 3 pgs misc Cash Flow Statement Mon 11/25 8:49 PM
Cash Flow Statement for Small Business. Filed by Electrical Connections Inc. (Stith, Clark)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Statement of Operations Mon 11/25 8:51 PM
Statement of Operations for Small Business. Filed by Electrical Connections Inc. (Stith, Clark)
Related: [-]