Original Case: 5:24-cv-00079

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv.pr-02167
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Case Filed:Nov 25, 2024
Terminated:Mar 31, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 01, 2025 5:11 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
WALMART INC.
Represented By
Kevin Michael Cleys
LITTLER MENDELSON PC
contact info
Kellie A. Tabor
LITTLER MENDELSON PC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
CLINTON BRINSON
Represented By
Clinton Brinson
contact info

GPO Mar 31 2025
UNPUBLISHED PER CURIAM OPINION filed. Motion disposition in opinion--denying Motion to strike [1001705583-2] Originating case number: 5:24-cv-00079-D-KS. Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. Mailed to: Clinton Brinson. [1001744854] [24-2167]

Docket last updated: 04/01/2025 5:09 AM EDT
Monday, November 25, 2024
1 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:24-cv-00079-D-KS. Case manager: CHalupa. [1001676951] 24-2167 CH [Entered: 11/25/2024 09:27 AM]
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001676955]. Due: 12/09/2024. 24-2167 CH [Entered: 11/25/2024 09:32 AM]
Related: [-]
3 3 12 pgs INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Clinton Brinson, Kellie Tabor. [1001676957] Informal Opening Brief due 12/19/2024. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. 24-2167 CH [Entered: 11/25/2024 09:38 AM]
Related: [-]