Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Rossie D Alston, Jr
Referred: William B Porter
Case #: 1:24-cv-02122
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:0706 Judicial Review of Agency Action
Case Filed:Nov 26, 2024
Terminated:Apr 02, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Jan 11, 2025 7:21 AM EST
Defendant
Darryl K. Gentry
Defendant
Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Plaintiff
Hanna Wubneh
Represented By
Abigail M. Russo
Murray Osorio
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order Wed 04/02 9:00 PM
ORDER in re8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Hanna Wubneh. Accordingly, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), the action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 4/2/2025. (Dest)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 03/27 5:40 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Hanna Wubneh (Russo, Abigail)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 01/22 4:32 PM
ORDER granting6 Joint MOTION to Stay the Proceedings; and it is further ORDERED that the instant action is STAYED until further order of this Court; and it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a status report with this Court one hundred twenty (120) days after Plaintiff's asylum interview; and every sixty (60) days thereafter. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 1/22/2025. (Dest)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
6 6 motion Stay Wed 01/15 3:43 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay the Proceedings by Darryl K. Gentry, Ur Mendoza Jaddou.(Cooper, Christian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/15 3:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christian James Cooper on behalf of Darryl K. Gentry, Ur Mendoza Jaddou (Cooper, Christian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Wed 12/11 4:30 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hanna Wubneh. Darryl K. Gentry served on 11/26/2024, answer due 1/27/2025; Ur Mendoza Jaddou served on 11/26/2024, answer due 1/27/2025. (Russo, Abigail)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued as to USA Tue 11/26 11:19 AM
Summons Issued as to Darryl K. Gentry, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA. (triv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice to Attorney
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Tue 11/26 8:32 AM
Proposed Summons by Hanna Wubneh. (Russo, Abigail)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/26 8:17 AM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9869187.), filed by Hanna Wubneh.(Russo, Abigail)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Form I-589 Receipt Notice.,
Att: 2 Exhibit Biometrics Appointment Notice.,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Tue 11/26 11:12 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr. and US Magistrate Judge William B. Porter. (triv)
Related: [-]