Minnesota District Court
Judge:Jeffrey M Bryan
Referred: Shannon G Elkins
Case #: 0:24-cv-04284
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Nov 26, 2024
Case in other court:Scott County District Court, None
Last checked: Saturday Jan 11, 2025 3:47 AM CST
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
Jordan J. Kleist
Jones Day - Minneapolis
contact info
Defendant
Monterey Financial Services, LLC
Represented By
Brendan H Little
Lippes Mathias LLP
contact info
Patrick D Newman
Bassford Remele
contact info
Defendant
National Tax Debt, LLC
Represented By
Garth G Gavenda
Jellum Law, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Timothy Fixsen
Represented By
Mark L Heaney
Heaney Law Firm, LLC
contact info

GPO Mar 10 2025
ORDER DISMISSING Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Jeffrey M. Bryan on 3/10/2025. (LIA)

Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, March 14, 2025
28 28 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Fri 03/14 8:51 AM
ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/11/2025. Pretrial Conference set for 4/18/2025 at 01:00 PM via Zoom Audio-only Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Shannon G. Elkins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shannon G. Elkins on 3/14/2025. (HAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Rule 26(f) Report Template,
Att: 2 Consent Form
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
27 27 notice Notice to Attorney - Retiring MJ Case Reassigned Wed 03/12 11:47 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Shannon G. Elkins. Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung is no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 24-cv-4284 JMB/SGE . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Note: the current hearings and conferences before the magistrate judge in this case will be cancelled unless otherwise indicated by the new MJ courtroom deputy. (CLK)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
26 26 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Parties Mon 03/10 10:57 AM
ORDER DISMISSING Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Jeffrey M. Bryan on 3/10/2025. (LIA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
25 25 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Wed 03/05 12:11 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re24 Stipulation of Dismissal,. (Heaney, Mark)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 03/05 12:07 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of All Claims Against Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Timothy Fixsen. Jointly Signed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc., National Tax Debt, LLC, and Monterey Financial Services, LLC. (Heaney, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
23 23 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 02/10 11:49 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Timothy Fixsen (Heaney, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
22 22 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Wed 01/29 10:59 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re21 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Heaney, Mark)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 01/29 10:56 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of All Claims Against Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Timothy Fixsen. Jointly Signed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Heaney, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/28 5:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Thompson on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Thompson, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Tue 01/28 4:35 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re18 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Heaney, Mark)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 01/28 4:30 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice of All Claims Against Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC by Timothy Fixsen. Jointly Signed by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Heaney, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/13 3:31 PM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by National Tax Debt, LLC. (Gavenda, Garth)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
16 16 discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Fri 12/27 3:00 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or any subsidiaries to report for National Tax Debt, LLC. (Gavenda, Garth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/26 11:52 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Garth G Gavenda on behalf of National Tax Debt, LLC. (Gavenda, Garth)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
14 14 misc Letter to Clerk's Office Mon 12/16 5:51 PM
LETTER TO CLERK'S OFFICE from Mark L. Heaney, Attorney for P;laintif, WITHDRAWL OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST NATIONAL TAX DEBT, LLC. (Heaney, Mark)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Certificate of Service Mon 12/16 10:24 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Timothy Fixsen re12 Declaration,11 Application for Entry of Default on National Tax Debt, LLC (Heaney, Mark)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Declaration Mon 12/16 9:33 AM
DECLARATION of Mark L. Heaney re11 Application for Entry of Default by Timothy Fixsen . (Heaney, Mark)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Application for Entry of Default Mon 12/16 9:32 AM
APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST NATIONAL TAX DEBT, LLC . (Heaney, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
10 10 service Return of Service Executed Fri 12/13 5:13 PM
Return of Service Executed for Summons, Complaint served on National Tax Debt, LLC on 10/31/2024, filed by Timothy Fixsen. (Heaney, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
9 9 discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Tue 12/03 5:17 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for Monterey Financial Services, LLC. (Little, Brendan)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 12/03 5:14 PM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Monterey Financial Services, LLC. (Little, Brendan)
Related: [-]
7 7 discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Tue 12/03 1:03 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Kleist, Jordan)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 12/03 12:56 PM
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Kleist, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
5 5 order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/02 11:56 AM
(Text-Only) ORDER granting4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brendan H. Little for Monterey Financial Services, LLC. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 12/2/2024. (CNO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
4 4 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/27 12:40 PM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brendan H. Little. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-11511449 filed by Monterey Financial Services, LLC. (Newman, Patrick)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Wed 11/27 12:09 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Jeffrey M. Bryan per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 24-cv-04284 (JMB/TNL). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (BTX)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
2 2 service Certificate of Service Tue 11/26 10:27 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Monterey Financial Services, LLC re1 Notice of Removal, (Newman, Patrick)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 11/26 10:20 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Scott County District Court, case number None (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11507848) filed by Monterey Financial Services, LLC. No summons requested. (Newman, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint - State Court,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet