Texas Western District Court
Judge:Alan D Albright
Case #: 1:24-cv-01463
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - 42:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Nov 26, 2024
Case in other court:200th District Court of Travis County, Texas, D-1-GN-24-008323
Last checked: Saturday Jan 11, 2025 6:08 AM CST
Defendant
Fort Bend Independent School District
16431 Lexington Blvd
Sugar Land, TX 77479
Represented By
Morgan Paige Beam
Thompson & Horton LLP
contact info
Stephanie Anne Hamm
Thompson & Horton LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Oluwatoyin Ikott


Docket last updated: 44 minutes ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
18 18 notice Notice of Filing Mon 05/05 4:56 PM
NOTICE of Filing Defendant's Proposed Scheduling Order [Dkt 8] by Fort Bend Independent School District (Beam, Morgan)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Mon 05/05 4:55 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Fort Bend Independent School District. (Beam, Morgan)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
16 16 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 04/28 11:34 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Oluwatoyin Ikott. Show Cause Response due by 5/12/2025 . Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (cnr)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
order Order Mon 04/21 2:02 PM
ORDER. Within fourteen days, the Parties shall submit a Proposed Amended Scheduling Order that matches Judge Albright's template (available under Austin Division Standing Orders). Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (nnw)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Tue 04/15 3:44 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Alan D Albright for all proceedings. Judge Robert Pitman no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (bot1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
14 14 notice Notice Tue 03/18 10:45 AM
NOTICE of Filing of Defendant's Proposed Scheduling Order by Oluwatoyin Ikott. (cnr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
13 13 service Certificate of Service Wed 03/12 4:06 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fort Bend Independent School District 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Beam, Morgan)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
12 12 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 03/10 12:29 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Fort Bend Independent School District. (Hamm, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
11 11 notice Notice Mon 03/03 11:07 AM
NOTICE Related [+] by Oluwatoyin Ikott. (cnr)
Related: [-] 24-DCV-321570, Copy Request
10 10 notice Notice Mon 03/03 11:05 AM
NOTICE Related [+] by Oluwatoyin Ikott. (cnr)
Related: [-] Proposed Scheduling Order
Monday, February 24, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Filing Mon 02/24 5:11 PM
NOTICE of Filing Defendant's Proposed Scheduling Order [Dkt 8] by Fort Bend Independent School District (Beam, Morgan)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Mon 02/24 5:05 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Fort Bend Independent School District. (Beam, Morgan)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order Fri 02/07 6:24 PM
Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order due to the Court within sixty (60) days after the appearance of any defendant. Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due by 2/21/2025. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (pg)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Wed 02/05 2:01 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert Pitman for all proceedings. Judge Docket II - Austin no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (bot1)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
5 5 misc State Court Records Fri 12/06 6:33 PM
State Court Records Filed.(Beam, Morgan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Original Petition,
Att: 2 Plaintiff's Statement of Inability to Afford Court Costs,
Att: 3 Service Request 1,
Att: 4 Request for Process,
Att: 5 Service Request 2,
Att: 6 First Amended Petition,
Att: 7 FBISD's Original Answer,
Att: 8 41 pgs FBISD's Notice of Filing of Removal,
Att: 9 Return of Service (TEA),
Att: 10 Docket Sheet
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
4 4 misc Supplement to Wed 11/27 9:58 AM
SUPPLEMENT to1 Notice of Removal by Fort Bend Independent School District. (Beam, Morgan)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order Wed 11/27 8:20 AM
ORDER that the removing party, if it has not already done so, shall within ten (10) days from the date of this order supplement the record with state court pleadings. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (kp)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Deficiency Notice Wed 11/27 8:19 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 1 Notice of Removal, the Notice of Removal you filed is deficient because the Supplement to the Civil Cover Sheet is not attached. This form can be located on our website. Please prepare and electronically submit the supplement using Civil Events - Other Filings - Other Documents - Supplement. This form is required for any Notice of Removal filed in the Western District of Texas. (kp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 11/26 4:27 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $405 receipt number ATXWDC-19518146).(Beam, Morgan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 11/27 8:18 AM
Case assigned to Judge Docket II - Austin. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Wed 11/27 8:19 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. (kp)
Related: [-]