Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Michael J Newman
Referred: Peter B Silvain, Jr
Case #: 3:24-cv-00304
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause29:2617 Family and Medical Leave Act
Case Filed:Nov 26, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jan 11, 2025 6:54 AM EST
Defendant
Rocking Horse Children's Health Center
Represented By
Douglas Paul Holthus
Freeman, Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Shonda Wallace
Represented By
Kyle Anderson
Luper, Neidenthal & Logan
contact info

GPO Jan 27 2025
ORDER: (1) REQUIRING THE PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER; (2) REQUIRING THE PARTIES TO FILE THEIR FED. R. CIV. P. 26(f) REPORT ON OR BEFORE FEBRUARY 13, 2025; AND (3) REQUIRING THE PARTIES TO MAKE INITIAL DISCLOSURES UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 26(a)(1) ON OR BEFORE FEBRUARY 6, 2025. Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 1/27/2025. (srb)

Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
17 17 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 05/13 11:11 AM
ANSWER to15 Amended Complaint Answer of Defendants Rocking Horse Children's Health Center dba Rocking Horse Community Health Center and Yamini Teegala to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Rocking Horse Children's Health Center, Yamini Teegala. (Holthus, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
16 16 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 04/30 1:55 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Yamini Teegala on 4/25/2025, answer due 6/24/2025. (Anderson, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
15 15 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 04/21 1:10 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rocking Horse Children's Health Center, and Yamini Teegala, filed by Shonda Wallace. (srb)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Mon 04/21 1:06 PM
ORDER: (1) GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE HER FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (Doc. No.5 ); (2) ACCEPTING PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (Doc. No 5-1); AND INSTRUCTING THE CLERK TO SEPARATELY DOCKET THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 4/21/2025. (srb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
13 13 17 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Fri 03/28 9:03 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr. on 3/28/2025. (srb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
12 12 misc Stipulation Wed 03/26 2:45 PM
STIPULATION Agreed Protective Order by Defendant Rocking Horse Children's Health Center. (Holthus, Douglas)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Protective Order Wed 03/26 2:44 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order Joint Motion for Review and Entry of Stipulation and Order by Defendant Rocking Horse Children's Health Center. (Holthus, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
order Order Fri 03/21 11:42 AM
NOTATION ORDER re10 Stipulated Protective Order: The parties are hereby notified that the Court cannot approve the proposed protective order as filed. The parties are directed to refile with an accompanying motion requesting the Court review and approve the stipulated protective order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter B. Silvain, Jr. on 3/21/2025. (lk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
10 10 misc Stipulation Thu 03/20 3:42 PM
STIPULATION Agreed Protective Order by Defendant Rocking Horse Children's Health Center. (Holthus, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
9 9 order Dayton Preliminary Pretrial Order Wed 03/12 2:21 PM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: 1. Motions to amend the pleadings or to add parties: February 28, 2025 (Completed) Motion to Amend pending. 2. Motions to seek a protective order or clawback agreement: March 28, 2025. 3. Status conference with Magistrate Judge Silvain: To be set by Magistrate Judge Silvain. 4. Primary expert designations: August 8, 2025. 5. Rebuttal expert designations: October 7, 2025. 6. Discovery cut-off: October 10, 2025. 7. Dispositive motions (i.e., summary judgment motions): December 3, 2025. Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 3/12/2025. (srb)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
8 8 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 02/21 1:37 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re5 MOTION to Amend/Correct First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Shonda Wallace. (Anderson, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
7 7 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 02/14 4:36 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re5 MOTION to Amend/Correct First Amended Complaint Defendant Rocking Horse Children's Health Center dba Rocking Horse Community Health Center's Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Rocking Horse Children's Health Center. (Holthus, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
6 6 misc Rule 26(f) Report Wed 02/12 4:17 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendant Rocking Horse Children's Health Center. (Holthus, Douglas)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Amend/Correct Wed 02/12 12:22 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct First Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Shonda Wallace. (Anderson, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - First Amended Complaint
Monday, January 27, 2025
4 4 2 pgs order Order Mon 01/27 9:36 AM
ORDER: (1) REQUIRING THE PARTIES TO MEET AND CONFER; (2) REQUIRING THE PARTIES TO FILE THEIR FED. R. CIV. P. 26(f) REPORT ON OR BEFORE FEBRUARY 13, 2025; AND (3) REQUIRING THE PARTIES TO MAKE INITIAL DISCLOSURES UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 26(a)(1) ON OR BEFORE FEBRUARY 6, 2025. Signed by Judge Michael J. Newman on 1/27/2025. (srb)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/30 3:15 PM
Defendant Rocking Horse Childrens Health Center dba Rocking Horse Community Health Center's ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Rocking Horse Children's Health Center. (Holthus, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
2 2 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 11/26 3:42 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Rocking Horse Children's Health Center on 11/26/2024, answer due 1/27/2025. (Anderson, Kyle)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/26 11:28 AM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Rocking Horse Children's Health Center ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-10267530), filed by Shonda Wallace. (Anderson, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet