California Central District Court
Judge:Michael W Fitzgerald
Referred: Alka Sagar
Case #: 2:24-cv-10219
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Nov 26, 2024
Terminated:Feb 03, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Jan 11, 2025 2:17 AM PST
Defendant
Airdraulics, Inc.
Represented By
Brian Edward Koegle
Koegle Law Group, Apc
contact info
Lucas E Rowe
Koegle Law Group, Apc
contact info
Defendant
Dan John William Tracey
Represented By
Brian Edward Koegle
Koegle Law Group, Apc
contact info
Lucas E Rowe
Koegle Law Group, Apc
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Cesar Acevedo
Represented By
Kevin Hyunjong Hong
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, February 07, 2025
23 23 notice Settlement Fri 02/07 11:56 AM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by plaintiff Cesar Acevedo. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
22 22 stip Dismiss Case Mon 02/03 11:40 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) - No Court Order Needed filed by Plaintiff Cesar Acevedo.(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Mon 02/03 11:05 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Defendants have filed an Answer to the complaint, therefore rule 41(a) is not applicable. A proposed order for the Court's review is needed. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iv)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
20 20 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Fri 01/31 12:23 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by PLAINTIFF Cesar Acevedo. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
19 19 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 01/27 2:35 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cesar Acevedo, upon Defendant Dan John William Tracey served on 1/16/2025, answer due 2/6/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon DAN JOHN WILLIAM, DEFENDANT in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 01/27 10:23 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Cesar Acevedo, upon Defendant Airdraulics, Inc. served on 1/15/2025, answer due 2/5/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon DEVIN J TRACEY, AS AGENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
17 17 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Thu 01/09 1:01 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Scheduling Conference set for 2/24/2025 at 11:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (smom)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
16 16 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Wed 01/08 8:33 AM
The hearing on the MOTIONS to Dismiss the Fourth Amended Complaint 134 ; MOTION to Strike the Class Action 135 , scheduled for January 6, 2025 at 1:30 P.M., are hereby VACATED and taken off calendar. No appearances are necessary. The matters stands submitted, and will be decided upon without oral argument. An order will issue.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
15 15 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 01/07 5:43 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Airdraulics, Inc., Dan John William Tracey, identifying Cesar Acevedo, Airdraulics, Inc. Dan John William Tracey, as Trustee. (Rowe, Lucas)
Related: [-]
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 01/07 5:38 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendants Airdraulics, Inc., Dan John William Tracey.(Attorney Lucas E Rowe added to party Airdraulics, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Lucas E Rowe added to party Dan John William Tracey(pty:dft))(Rowe, Lucas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
13 13 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Tue 12/17 2:35 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) DECLINING TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFF'S STATE LAW CLAIMS by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. In light of the foregoing, the Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's state claims asserted in the Complaint. The Court therefore dismisses any such claims without prejudice. (smom)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
12 12 misc Response Mon 12/16 10:14 AM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Cesar Acevedoto Order to Show Cause,11 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Plaintiff,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Counsel
Monday, December 02, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 12/02 2:55 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) TO SHOW CAUSE RE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Plaintiff is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE in writing as to why this Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim and the other state law claims alleged by Plaintiff. The Response shall be filed on or before DECEMBER 16, 2024. (smom)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Mon 12/02 2:53 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) RE PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court finds that there is good cause to institute a limited scheduling order concerning basic case prosecution for cases filed by the So. Cal. Firm. (smom)
Related: [-]
9 9 adr Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) Mon 12/02 2:31 PM
NOTICE to Parties Re (ADR-20) ADA Disability Access Litigation/Application for Stay and Early Mediation: PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED to serve the ADA Packet on Defendant(s) at the same time the summons and complaint are served, if possible. If, upon receipt of this Notice to Parties, Plaintiff has already served Defendant(s), Plaintiff must serve the ADA Packet no later than fourteen (14) days after this Notice to Parties is filed by the Court. Within three (3) days of serving Defendant(s), Plaintiff must file with the Court a proof of service indicating that the ADA Packet was served on Defendant(s). *See Notice for further details.* (smom)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 11/26 5:04 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Airdraulics, Inc., Dan John William Tracey. (et)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 11/26 4:48 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 11/26 4:48 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 11/26 4:47 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (et)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Summons Request Tue 11/26 12:01 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Cesar Acevedo. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 11/26 11:59 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 11/26 11:58 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Cesar Acevedo. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 11/26 11:58 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38654622 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Cesar Acevedo(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]